Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/01/2020 at 07:26:31 (UTC).

Abrams et al v. City of Niagara Falls et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2020 Abrams filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City of Niagara Falls. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeremiah J. McCarthy and Frank P. Geraci, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00137

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jeremiah J. McCarthy

Presiding Judge

Frank P. Geraci, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Eric P. Abrams

Aisha Carr Whiteside-Hands

Queenie Blue

Tonya (Dye) Brown

Paul Carella, Jr.

Johnny C. Carr

Mary Elizabeth Wolfisch

Darren Robert Graff

William D. Gray

Nicole Barr

Thomas Lee Cook

Audrey Dubuc

Ida B. Elder

Defendants

Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc.

Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc.

Scott Lawn Yard, Inc.

Cecos International, Inc.

Conestoga-Rovers & Associates

OP-Tech Environmental Services

Occidental Chemical Corporation

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter A. Kraus

Attorney at Waters & Kraus, LLP

3141 Hood Street, Suite 720

Dallas, TX 75219

Caitlyn Silhan

Attorney at Waters & Kraus, LLP

3141 Hood Street, Suite 720

Dallas, TX 75219

Charles S. Siegel

Attorney at Waters & Kraus, LLP

3141 Hood Street, Suite 720

Dallas, TX 75219

Leslie C. MacLean

Attorney at Waters & Kraus, LLP

3141 Hood Street, Suite 720

Dallas, TX 75219

Steven J. Phillips

Attorney at Phillips & Paolicelli, LLP

747 Third Avenue, 6Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Defendant Attorneys

Joel A Blanchet

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

One Canalside, 125 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14203-2887

Andrew P. Devine

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

One Canalside, 125 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14203-2887

Kevin M. Hogan

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

One Canalside, 125 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14203-2887

Lisa L. Smith

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

One Canalside, 125 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14203-2887

Douglas E. Fleming, III

Attorney at Dechert LLP

Three Bryant Park, 1095 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Deena Katherine Mueller-Funke

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

One Canalside, 125 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14203-2887

Sheila L. Birnbaum

Attorney at Dechert LLP

Three Bryant Park, 1095 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Brian F. Sutter

Attorney at Sugarman Law Firm LLP

1600 Rand Building, 14 Lafayette Square

Buffalo, NY 14203

Zackary Knaub

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

54 State Street, 6Th Floor

Albany, NY 12207

Jeffrey C. Stravino

Attorney at Hodgson Russ LLP

The Guaranty Building, Suite 100, 140 Pearl Street

Buffalo, NY 14202-4040

Jeffrey D. Schulman

Attorney at Pillinger Miller Tarallo, LLP

507 Plum Street, Suite 120

Syracuse, NY 13204

Other Attorneys

Agnieszka Anna Wilewicz

Attorney at Hurwitz & Fine, P.C.

1300 Liberty Building

Buffalo, NY 14202

Patricia Rauh

Attorney at Hurwitz & Fine, P.C.

1300 Liberty Building

Buffalo, NY 14202

Thomas J. DeBoy

Attorney at City of Niagara Falls

P.O. Box 69

Niagara Falls, NY 14302

Robert E. Knoer

Attorney at The Knoer Group, PLLC

424 Main Street, Suite 1820

Buffalo, NY 14202

10 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#36

(#36) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cecos International, Inc.. (Knaub, Zackary) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

#35

(#35) NOTICE of Appearance by Zackary Knaub on behalf of Cecos International, Inc. (Knaub, Zackary) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#32

(#32) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven C. Russo on behalf of Cecos International, Inc. (Russo, Steven) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#31

(#31) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter A. Kraus on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kraus, Peter) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#30

(#30) NOTICE of Appearance by Agnieszka Anna Wilewicz on behalf of Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc. (Wilewicz, Agnieszka) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#29

(#29) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles S. Siegel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Siegel, Charles) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

2 #16

Exhibit 16 - HP FYRR

2 #15

Exhibit 15 - HP OM&M

2 #14

Exhibit 14 - HP ROD

2 #13

Exhibit 13 - HP Consent Judgment

2 #12

Exhibit 12 - S-Area 5 Year Review

2 #11

Exhibit 11 - SA OM&M

2 #6

Exhibit 6 - 102 OM&M

2 #5

Exhibit 5 - 102 Amended ROD

2 #2

Exhibit 2 -Map of CERCLA Sites

2 #1

Exhibit 1- Amended Complaint

#2

(#2) CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Notice of Removal Civil Cover Sheet, Addendum plus Exhibits. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 -Map of CERCLA Sites, #3 Exhibit 3 - 12 ROD, #4 Exhibit 4 - 102 Consent Decree, #5 Exhibit 5 - 102 Amended ROD, #6 Exhibit 6 - 102 OM&M, #7 Exhibit 7 - 102 5 Year Review, #8 Exhibit 8 - SA Amended Complaint, #9 Exhibit 9 - SA Consent Judgment, #10 Exhibit 10 - SA ROD, #11 Exhibit 11 - SA OM&M, #12 Exhibit 12 - S-Area 5 Year Review, #13 Exhibit 13 - HP Consent Judgment, #14 Exhibit 14 - HP ROD, #15 Exhibit 15 - HP OM&M, #16 Exhibit 16 - HP FYRR)(Mueller-Funke, Deena) (Entered: 02/01/2020)

#1

(#3) CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Notice of Removal State Court Index and State Court Pleadings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings (1-50), #2 Exhibit State Court Pleadings (51-88))(Mueller-Funke, Deena) (Entered: 02/01/2020)

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cecos International, Inc.. (Knaub, Zackary) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Appearance by Zackary Knaub on behalf of Cecos International, Inc. (Knaub, Zackary) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • Docket(#34) TEXT ORDER: In accordance with today's conference, the February 7, 2020 "Consented to Motions Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaints" are granted. As agreed to by counsel, plaintiffs' motion to remand (on procedural and subject matter jurisdiction grounds) shall be filed by March 16, 2020, and so long as plaintiffs' motion is filed by that deadline, defendants waive any challenge (before this court or on appeal) to the timeliness of that motion. Defendants' response shall be filed by April 30, 2020; plaintiffs' reply, if any, shall be filed by May 20, 2020; and oral argument of the motion is scheduled for May 28, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. Counsel may appear in person or participate by telephone. For those electing to participate by telephone, dial (703) 724-3100, enter access code 4100030#, and then pin 9999# sufficiently in advance of the conference. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 2/21/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00136-FPG-JJM et al.(DAZ) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketCALENDAR EVENT : Oral Argument set for 5/28/2020 at 02:00 PM before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00136-FPG-JJM et al.(DAZ) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • Docket(#33) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy: Status Conference held on 2/21/2020. Discussion regarding remand motion to be filed by March 16, 2020; responses on or before April 30, 2020; replies on or before May 20, 2020 and oral argument set for May 28, 2020 at 2:00 PM. APPEARANCES: Charles S. Siegel (via telephone), Melissa L. Stewart (via telephone) for plaintiff; Jeffrey F. Baase for defendant Niagara Falls Water Board; Deena Katherine Mueller-Funke, Douglas E. Fleming, III (via telephone), Kevin M. Hogan for defendants Glenn Springs, Miller Springs and Occidental Chemical; Jeffrey C. Stravino for defendant Conestoga-Rovers; Zackary Knaub (via telephone) for defendant CECOS; Jeffrey D. Schulman (via telephone) for defendant OP-Tech; Alice J. Cunningham for defendant Roy's Plumbing; Mariana Murray for defendant Scott Lawn Yard; Agnes Wilewicz (via telephone) for defendant Sevenson. (FTR GOLD) Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00136-FPG-JJM et al.(DAZ) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven C. Russo on behalf of Cecos International, Inc. (Russo, Steven) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketVerified admission to the Western District of New York for Attorney Mara Gonzalez. (CGJ) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter A. Kraus on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kraus, Peter) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE of Appearance by Agnieszka Anna Wilewicz on behalf of Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc. (Wilewicz, Agnieszka) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles S. Siegel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Siegel, Charles) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Joel A Blanchet on behalf of Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation (Blanchet, Joel) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew P. Devine on behalf of Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation (Devine, Andrew) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Occidental Chemical Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Occidental Petroleum Corporation for Occidental Chemical Corporation.. (Mueller-Funke, Deena) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Oxy USA Inc., Corporate Parent Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc. for Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc... (Mueller-Funke, Deena) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Oxy USA Inc. for Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc... (Mueller-Funke, Deena) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Deena Katherine Mueller-Funke on behalf of Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation (Mueller-Funke, Deena) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Hogan on behalf of Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation (Hogan, Kevin) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Notice of Removal State Court Index and State Court Pleadings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings (1-50), #2 Exhibit State Court Pleadings (51-88))(Mueller-Funke, Deena) (Entered: 02/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Notice of Removal Civil Cover Sheet, Addendum plus Exhibits. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 -Map of CERCLA Sites, #3 Exhibit 3 - 12 ROD, #4 Exhibit 4 - 102 Consent Decree, #5 Exhibit 5 - 102 Amended ROD, #6 Exhibit 6 - 102 OM&M, #7 Exhibit 7 - 102 5 Year Review, #8 Exhibit 8 - SA Amended Complaint, #9 Exhibit 9 - SA Consent Judgment, #10 Exhibit 10 - SA ROD, #11 Exhibit 11 - SA OM&M, #12 Exhibit 12 - S-Area 5 Year Review, #13 Exhibit 13 - HP Consent Judgment, #14 Exhibit 14 - HP ROD, #15 Exhibit 15 - HP OM&M, #16 Exhibit 16 - HP FYRR)(Mueller-Funke, Deena) (Entered: 02/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from NY State Court County of Niagara, case number E152334/2014. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3725488), filed by All Defendants.(Mueller-Funke, Deena) (Entered: 02/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OP-Tech Environmental Services is a litigant