This case was last updated from PACER on 04/30/2019 at 07:33:57 (UTC).

Abrahamson v. Smith et al

Case Summary

On 03/01/2019 Abrahamson filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Smith. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ralph R. Beistline. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00054

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alaska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ralph R. Beistline

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Richard Abrahamson

Wasilla, AK 99654

Respondents

Dale Marie Cale

Jack Smith

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) JUDGMENT Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 3/20/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#2

(#2) ADDITIONAL RELATED DOCUMENT by Richard Abrahamson re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER DISMISSING PETITION: The Petition at docket #1 is DISMISSED without prejudice. A certificate of appealability shall not issue. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 3/20/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), filed by Richard Abrahamson.(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) JUDGMENT Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 3/20/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER DISMISSING PETITION: The Petition at docket #1 is DISMISSED without prejudice. A certificate of appealability shall not issue. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 3/20/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ADDITIONAL RELATED DOCUMENT by Richard Abrahamson re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), filed by Richard Abrahamson.(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.