This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/08/2021 at 08:36:24 (UTC).

Abraham v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 Abraham filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ramon E. Reyes, Jr and Eric N. Vitaliano. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01265

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ramon E. Reyes, Jr

Presiding Judge

Eric N. Vitaliano

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Georgina Abraham

Defendants

Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency d/b/a FedLoan Servicing

Equifax Information Services LLC

TransUnion, LLC

Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency doing business as FedLoan Servicing

Not Classified By Court

Kenneth Plevan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel Zemel

Attorney at Zemel Law, LLC

660 Broadway

Patterson, NJ 07514

Defendant Attorneys

Adam B. Michaels

Attorney at Hand Baldachin & Amburgey

8 West 40Th Street, 12Th Floor

New York, NY 10018

Camille Renee Nicodemus

Attorney at Schuckit & Associates, P.C.

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit Summons and Complaint

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketSELECTION OF MEDIATOR: Kenneth Plevan selected as Mediator. The first mediation session will take place on TBD. Fourteen days on or before the session date, counsel shall file with the Mediator their client's mediation statement summarizing the facts, legal issues, particulars of any prior settlement discussions, and the name and title of the client or client representative with full settlement authority who will attend the mediation in person. Attendance in person is required of the trial attorney, insurance adjuster, and client or client representative with full settlement authority. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned via e-mail nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov or fax (718) 613-2333. Contact information for the Mediator is on the docket sheet. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session. Report of Mediation due by TBD. (Priftakis, Tina) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #8 Motion for Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint by 5/14/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 4/30/2021. (Vertus, Miriam) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency. (Michaels, Adam) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketMEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS for Counsel are available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Counsel are to select a mediator, schedule the first mediation session, and file the name of the mediator, date, time and place of the first mediation session via CM/ECF using the event Selection of Mediator. For a list of the EDNY Mediators and their qualifications, see the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/displayAll.cfm. EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1)[formerly EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.11(f)(1)]. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants, including the mediator, and sent via email to Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Confidentiality Stipulation is available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session. (Priftakis, Tina) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation shall be completed by 8/3/2021. Selection of Mediator due by 4/19/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 4/5/2021. (Vertus, Miriam) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Trans Union, LLC ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by TransUnion, LLC. (Nicodemus, Camille) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TransUnion, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Trans Union LLC, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for TransUnion, LLC. (Nicodemus, Camille) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Camille Renee Nicodemus on behalf of TransUnion, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Nicodemus, Camille) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketThis case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency d/b/a FedLoan Servicing (Michaels, Adam) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency d/b/a FedLoan Servicing from New York State Supreme Court, County of Queens, case number 703591/2021. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-14263039) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint) (Michaels, Adam) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION ASSISTANCE AGENCY is a litigant

Latest cases where TransUnion Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Zemel