This case was last updated from PACER on 11/11/2019 at 08:57:41 (UTC).

Abraham v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 Abraham filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James P. Jones, Pamela Meade Sargent and Norman K. Moon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00036

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Pamela Meade Sargent

Presiding Judges

James P. Jones

Norman K. Moon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lorraine Abraham

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeff Thomas Seldomridge

Attorney at Miller Firm LLC

108 Railroad Avenue

Orange, VA 22960

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B. North, Jr.

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP

201 17Th Street Nw, Suite 1700

Atlantic, GA 30363

Philip Marshall Busman

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP

101 Constitution Ave. Nw., Suite 900

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ORDER granting #18 Joint Motion to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines. Discovery and all pretrial deadlines are hereby STAYED until November 15, 2019. The parties are further DIRECTED to submit a status report to the Court no later than November 22, 2019. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on September 30, 2019. (sfc)

18 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#18

(#18) Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and all Pretrial Deadlines by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Busman, Philip)

#17

(#17) Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent C.R. Bard, Inc. for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated; Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson & Company for C R Bard Incorporated. (Busman, Philip)

#16

(#16) ORDER granting #15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard B. North, Jr. terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 9/20/19. (flc)

15 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#15

(#15) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Richard B. North by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Busman, Philip)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Marshall Busman on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Busman, Philip)

13 #1

Judge Moon Standard Pretrial Order

#13

(#13) ORDER directing parties to submit Proposed Pretrial Order, due by 10/9/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/19/19. (Attachments: #1 Judge Moon Standard Pretrial Order)(mka)

10 #32

Docket Entry 16343

10 #31

Docket Entry 15176

10 #28

Docket Entry 12971

10 #27

Docket Entry 12853

10 #26

Docket Entry 12830

10 #25

Docket Entry 12598

10 #24

Docket Entry 12595

10 #23

Docket Entry 12593

152 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER granting #18 Joint Motion to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines. Discovery and all pretrial deadlines are hereby STAYED until November 15, 2019. The parties are further DIRECTED to submit a status report to the Court no later than November 22, 2019. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on September 30, 2019. (sfc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and all Pretrial Deadlines by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Busman, Philip)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent C.R. Bard, Inc. for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated; Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson & Company for C R Bard Incorporated. (Busman, Philip)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER granting #15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard B. North, Jr. terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 9/20/19. (flc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Richard B. North by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Busman, Philip)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Marshall Busman on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Busman, Philip)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER directing parties to submit Proposed Pretrial Order, due by 10/9/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/19/19. (Attachments: #1 Judge Moon Standard Pretrial Order)(mka)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • (#11) Minute Order. This case is hereby transferred to the Honorable Norman K. Moon, Senior United States District Judge. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 9/13/2019. (JPJ)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MDL Lead - Certified Docket with Attachments - PART 3 - (Attachments: #1 Docket Entry 10947, #2 Docket Entry 11011, #3 Docket Entry 11041, #4 Docket Entry 11064, #5 Docket Entry 11073, #6 Docket Entry 11080, #7 Docket Entry 11082, #8 Docket Entry 11256, #9 Docket Entry 11313, #10 Docket Entry 11320, #11 Docket Entry 11321, #12 Docket Entry 11659, #13 Docket Entry 11871, #14 Docket Entry 12007, #15 Docket Entry 12061, #16 Docket Entry 12202, #17 Docket Entry 12357, #18 Docket Entry 12507, #19 Docket Entry 12508, #20 Docket Entry 12533, #21 Docket Entry 12589, #22 Docket Entry 12590, #23 Docket Entry 12593, #24 Docket Entry 12595, #25 Docket Entry 12598, #26 Docket Entry 12830, #27 Docket Entry 12853, #28 Docket Entry 12971, #29 Docket Entry 13329, #30 Docket Entry 15098, #31 Docket Entry 15176, #32 Docket Entry 16343, #33 Docket Entry 16992, #34 Docket Entry 17008, #35 Docket Entry 17285, #36 Docket Entry 17386, #37 Docket Entry 17401, #38 Docket Entry 17494, #39 Docket Entry 17513, #40 Docket Entry 17582, #41 Docket Entry 18038)(flc) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MDL Lead - Certified Docket with Attachments - PART 2 - (Attachments: #1 Docket Entry 5770, #2 Docket Entry 5881, #3 Docket Entry 5883, #4 Docket Entry 6227, #5 Docket Entry 6799, #6 Docket Entry 8113, #7 Docket Entry 8315, #8 Docket Entry 8871, #9 Docket Entry 8872, #10 Docket Entry 8874, #11 Docket Entry 9415, #12 Docket Entry 9428, #13 Docket Entry 9432, #14 Docket Entry 9433, #15 Docket Entry 9434, #16 Docket Entry 9770, #17 Docket Entry 9771, #18 Docket Entry 9772, #19 Docket Entry 9773, #20 Docket Entry 9775, #21 Docket Entry 9861, #22 Docket Entry 9881, #23 Docket Entry 9991, #24 Docket Entry 10051, #25 Docket Entry 10052, #26 Docket Entry 10072, #27 Docket Entry 10075, #28 Docket Entry 10230, #29 Docket Entry 10231, #30 Docket Entry 10235, #31 Docket Entry 10258, #32 Docket Entry 10323, #33 Docket Entry 10348, #34 Docket Entry 10382, #35 Docket Entry 10403, #36 Docket Entry 10404, #37 Docket Entry 10438, #38 Docket Entry 10486, #39 Docket Entry 10489, #40 Docket Entry 10497, #41 Docket Entry 10524, #42 Docket Entry 10587, #43 Docket Entry 10819, #44 Docket Entry 10920, #45 Docket Entry 10922)(flc) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MDL Lead - Certified Docket with Attachments - PART 1 - (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Submission, #2 Docket Entry 248, #3 Docket Entry 249, #4 Docket Entry 269, #5 Docket Entry 303-2, #6 Docket Entry 314, #7 Docket Entry 363, #8 Docket Entry 364, #9 Docket Entry 365, #10 Docket Entry 366, #11 Docket Entry 372, #12 Docket Entry 401, #13 Docket Entry 519, #14 Docket Entry 699, #15 Docket Entry 927, #16 Docket Entry 1108, #17 Docket Entry 1153-1, #18 Docket Entry 1153-2, #19 Docket Entry 1259, #20 Docket Entry 1319, #21 Docket Entry 1485, #22 Docket Entry 1662, #23 Docket Entry 1663, #24 Docket Entry 2238, #25 Docket Entry 2239, #26 Docket Entry 2813, #27 Docket Entry 3214, #28 Docket Entry 3215, #29 Docket Entry 3272, #30 Docket Entry 3312, #31 Docket Entry 3313, #32 Docket Entry 3314, #33 Docket Entry 3372, #34 Docket Entry 3398, #35 Docket Entry 3685, #36 Docket Entry 4015, #37 Docket Entry 4016, #38 Docket Entry 4141, #39 Docket Entry 4311, #40 Docket Entry 4335, #41 Docket Entry 4339, #42 Docket Entry 4865, #43 Docket Entry 4866, #44 Docket Entry 5007, #45 Docket Entry 5285)(flc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-03240. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Remark: Transferring Case to the Western District of Virginia via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re: #5 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19.(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.] (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Document for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.] (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • (#4) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-3240-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(LSP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Lorraine Abraham. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13426869 filed by Lorraine Abraham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.