This case was last updated from PACER on 04/26/2021 at 09:29:57 (UTC).

30531 Midtown Court Land Trust, By Abpaymar, LLC v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 30531 Midtown Court Land Trust, By Abpaymar, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joel B. Toomey and Timothy J. Corrigan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00185

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joel B. Toomey

Presiding Judge

Timothy J. Corrigan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Abpaymar, LLC

30531 Midtown Court Land Trust, By Abpaymar, LLC

Defendants

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2005-3, Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2005-3,

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lee Segal

Attorney at Segal & Schuh Law Group, PL

18167 Us Hwy 19 N Ste 100

Clearwater, FL 33764

Defendant Attorneys

Kimberly Held Israel

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC

Suite 200, 10407 Centurion Parkway N.

Jacksonville, FL 32256

William Lee Grimsley

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC-Jacksonville

Suite 200, 10407 Centurion Pkwy N

Jacksonville, FL 32256

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #5 Defendant's Motion to Quash Service of Process, to Set Aside Clerk's Default and to Dismiss. On or before June 16, 2021, Plaintiff must serve Defendant and file proof thereof. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 4/16/2021. (RLS) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#10

(#10) Joint CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Segal, Lee) Modified to edit text on 4/6/2021 (KKH). (Entered: 04/05/2021)

9 #1

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) Supplemental NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company (Israel, Kimberly) Modified to eit text on 3/25/2021 (KKH). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/25/2021: #1 Exhibit A) (KKH). (Entered: 03/24/2021)

8 #1

Motion to Consolidate Cases

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Filing by 30531 Midtown Court Land Trust, By Abpaymar, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Segal, Lee) Modified to edit text on 3/17/2021 (KKH). (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Israel, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company re #5 MOTION to Quash Service of Process, to Set Aside Clerk's Default and to Dismiss (Israel, Kimberly) (Modified on 3/10/2021 to edit docket text) (JDR). (Entered: 03/10/2021)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

State Court Other Documents

1 #2

State Court Docket Sheet

1 #1

State Court COMPLAINT

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Baker County Circuit Court, case number 02-2020-CA-00115 filed in State Court on 10/14/2020. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 113A-17930405 filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2005-3, Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2005-3,. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Israel, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #5 Defendant's Motion to Quash Service of Process, to Set Aside Clerk's Default and to Dismiss. On or before June 16, 2021, Plaintiff must serve Defendant and file proof thereof. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 4/16/2021. (RLS) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Segal, Lee) Modified to edit text on 4/6/2021 (KKH). (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Supplemental NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company (Israel, Kimberly) Modified to eit text on 3/25/2021 (KKH). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/25/2021: #1 Exhibit A) (KKH). (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Filing by 30531 Midtown Court Land Trust, By Abpaymar, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Segal, Lee) Modified to edit text on 3/17/2021 (KKH). (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Israel, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company re #5 MOTION to Quash Service of Process, to Set Aside Clerk's Default and to Dismiss (Israel, Kimberly) (Modified on 3/10/2021 to edit docket text) (JDR). (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Quash Service of Process, to Set Aside Clerk's Default and to Dismiss by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Israel, Kimberly) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MD) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Deutsche Bank National Trust Company with Jury Demand, originally filed in the Eighth Judicial Circuit, Baker County, on 10/14/20 filed by 30531 Midtown Court Land Trust, By Abpaymar, LLC.(KKH) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:21-cv-0185-TJC-JBT. (SJB) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Baker County Circuit Court, case number 02-2020-CA-00115 filed in State Court on 10/14/2020. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 113A-17930405 filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2005-3, Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2005-3,. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Israel, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABPAYMAR LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Lee Grimsley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kimberly Held Israel