This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/08/2022 at 08:23:01 (UTC).

Abouem v. Ally Financial, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/09/2021 Abouem filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Ally Financial, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles A. Pannell, Jr and Alan J. Baverman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04645

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles A. Pannell, Jr

Referral Judge

Alan J. Baverman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dana Abouem

Defendant

Ally Financial, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John A. Love

Attorney at Love Consumer Law

2500 Northwinds Parkwaysuite 330

Alpharetta, GA 30009

Defendant Attorney

Kimberly Delk Eason

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

222 Central Park Avesuite 2000

Virginia Beach, VA 23462

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer or, in the Alternative to Compel Defendant to File An Amended Answer MOTION to Compel filed by Ally Financial, Inc.. (Eason, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#16

(#16) AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ally Financial, Inc.. (Eason, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#15

(#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Re: Plaintiff's Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, and Request for Production of Documents to Defendant by Dana Abouem.(Love, John) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. The deadline for Defendant to file an Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike is EXTENDED to January 7, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 12/31/2021. (tcc) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#13

(#13) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Amended Answer by Ally Financial, Inc.. (Eason, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Supplemental Initial Disclosures by Dana Abouem.(Love, John) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Dana Abouem.(Love, John) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

10 #1

Brief Memorandum in Support

#10

(#10) Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer or, in the Alternative to Compel Defendant to File An Amended Answer with Brief In Support by Dana Abouem. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support)(Love, John) Added MOTION to Compel on 12/15/2021 (jra). Modified on 12/15/2021 to edit text(jra). (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Ally Financial, Inc.. Discovery ends on 5/12/2022.(Eason, Kimberly) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. The deadline for Ally Financial, Inc. to respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is EXTENDED nunc pro tunc to December 13, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 12/13/2021. (tcc) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by Ally Financial, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eason, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interested Persons by Ally Financial, Inc.. (Eason, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Delk Eason on behalf of Ally Financial, Inc. (Eason, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#4

(#4) Return of Service Executed by Dana Abouem. All Defendants. (Love, John) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Dana Abouem. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11384829) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/09/2021)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer or, in the Alternative to Compel Defendant to File An Amended Answer MOTION to Compel filed by Ally Financial, Inc.. (Eason, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ally Financial, Inc.. (Eason, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Re: Plaintiff's Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, and Request for Production of Documents to Defendant by Dana Abouem.(Love, John) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. The deadline for Defendant to file an Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike is EXTENDED to January 7, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 12/31/2021. (tcc) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Amended Answer by Ally Financial, Inc.. (Eason, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Supplemental Initial Disclosures by Dana Abouem.(Love, John) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Dana Abouem.(Love, John) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer or, in the Alternative to Compel Defendant to File An Amended Answer with Brief In Support by Dana Abouem. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support)(Love, John) Added MOTION to Compel on 12/15/2021 (jra). Modified on 12/15/2021 to edit text(jra). (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Ally Financial, Inc.. Discovery ends on 5/12/2022.(Eason, Kimberly) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. The deadline for Ally Financial, Inc. to respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is EXTENDED nunc pro tunc to December 13, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 12/13/2021. (tcc) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by Ally Financial, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eason, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Notation re: #6 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Chief Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 11/24/2021. (cmb) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interested Persons by Ally Financial, Inc.. (Eason, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Delk Eason on behalf of Ally Financial, Inc. (Eason, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Return of Service Executed by Dana Abouem. All Defendants. (Love, John) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Notation re: #3 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Chief Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 11/12/2021. (cmb) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons by Dana Abouem. (Love, John) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Ally Financial, Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Dana Abouem. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11384829) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ally Financial Inc. is a litigant