This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/08/2022 at 10:15:28 (UTC).

Linet Aboolian v. Target Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2022 Linet Aboolian filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Target Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and Gail J. Standish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-06466

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Gail J. Standish

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Linet Aboolian

Defendants

TARGET CORPORATION

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott Evan Braybrooke

Attorney at Voss Silverman and Braybrooke LLP

4640 Admiralty Way Suite 800

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

David C Voss, Jr

Attorney at Voss Silverman and Braybrooke LLP

4640 Admiralty Way Suite 800

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292-6602

Defendant Attorney

David G Halm

Attorney at Quintairos Prieto Wood and Boyer PA

500 North Brand Boulevard Suite 1650

Glendale, CA 91203

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than April 28, 2023. (jre) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

#16

(#16) ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2023, at 9:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 6/27/2023, at 9:00 AM. (jre) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

#15

(#15) MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Amended Pleadings due by 11/29/2022. Discovery cut-off 3/29/2023. Motions due by 4/12/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2023 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Jury Trial set for 6/27/2023 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (jre) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #12 filed by Defendant Target Corporation.(Halm, David) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#13

(#13) ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish re Stipulation for Protective Order #11 . See Order for details. (es) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#12

(#12) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Linet Aboolian amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Linet Aboolian(Attorney David C Voss, Jr added to party Linet Aboolian(pty:pla))(Voss, David) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Halm, David) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#10

(#10) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Defendant Target Corporation.. (Halm, David) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/17/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 10/24/2022, at 09:00 AM. (jre) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant TARGET CORPORATION, identifying Target Corporation. (Halm, David) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - Answer

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A Summons and Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than April 28, 2023. (jre) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2023, at 9:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 6/27/2023, at 9:00 AM. (jre) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Amended Pleadings due by 11/29/2022. Discovery cut-off 3/29/2023. Motions due by 4/12/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2023 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Jury Trial set for 6/27/2023 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (jre) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #12 filed by Defendant Target Corporation.(Halm, David) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish re Stipulation for Protective Order #11 . See Order for details. (es) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Linet Aboolian amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Linet Aboolian(Attorney David C Voss, Jr added to party Linet Aboolian(pty:pla))(Voss, David) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Halm, David) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Defendant Target Corporation.. (Halm, David) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/17/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 10/24/2022, at 09:00 AM. (jre) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Target Corporation. Filed in State Court on 9/8/2022 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Target Corporation. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Linet Aboolian. Filed in State Court on 7/26/2022 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant TARGET CORPORATION, identifying Target Corporation. (Halm, David) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant TARGET CORPORATION. (Halm, David) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant TARGET CORPORATION.. (Halm, David) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 22STCV24000 Receipt No: ACACDC-33958392 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant TARGET CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Answer) (Attorney David G Halm added to party TARGET CORPORATION(pty:dft))(Halm, David) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David G Halm