This case was last updated from PACER on 10/06/2021 at 06:18:19 (UTC).

Abogabal et al v. Marriott International, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2019 Abogabal filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Marriott International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paula Xinis and Paul W. Grimm. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-01026

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Paula Xinis

Paul W. Grimm

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Denee Delnay

Eric Mitchell

Teresa Tobin

Jacquelyn Cauble

Scott Farkas

Michael Rubin

Robert Baker

Raven Hall

Joseph Tobin

Leon Meyer

Tom Abogabal

W. Gregory Smith

Defendants

Marriott International, Inc.

Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

E David Hoskins

Attorney at The Law Offices of E David Hoskins LLC

16 E. Lombard Street, Suite 400

Baltimore, MD 21202

Gary F Lynch

Attorney at Carlson Lynch, LLP

1133 Penn Avenue, 5Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel R Warren

Attorney at Baker and Hostetler LLP

Cleveland, Oh 44114

Cleveland, OH 44114

Gilbert S Keteltas

Attorney at Baker and Hostetler LLP

1050 Connecticut Ave. Nw Ste. 1100

Washington, DC 20036

Lisa M Ghannoum

Attorney at Baker and Hostetler LLP

Cleveland, Oh 44114

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#791

(#31) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Amanda Arnold, Edward Baker, Brad Barringer, Kiana Belcher, Kevin Berry, Susan Beverley, Douglas Blake, Michael Blicher, Carol Blood, Robert Bluestone, Tanesha Boradgiak, Michael Bunker, Brenda Burr, Yvette Butler, Shelia Canipe, Deana Cannon, Catherine Carlberg, Ruthanne Carpenter, Cheryl Castor, Michael Castor, Crystal Chambers, Kathleen Christensen, Prudence Concert-White, Curtis Cummings, Mary Ellen Davey, Christopher Davies, Dorothy Davis, Karen Davis, Kenneth Davis, Graves De Armond, Cynthia Deese, May Desrochers, Scott Dias, Sami Difuntorum, Jonathan Dodart, Julie Duchsherer, Mark Duffey, Gretchen Ehle, Vance Edward Eichelberger, Carla Engle, Barbara Erickson, Michelle Featherstone, Ronald Michael Feschak, Nathan Finney, Janice Frazier-Scott, Lisa Frederickson, Michael Freeland, Lisa Fritz, Marlon Gaines, Steve Gajewski, Laurene Gallway, Eric Gault, Betsy Gentry, Scott Gideon, John Gilliland, Jon Goldberg, Angela Gresh, Latausha Griffin, Jernard Griggs, Edward Hanley, Charles Hanson, Sheila Harrison, Danielle Hayes, Phyllis Hecker, Amber Helton, Jeri Holt-Minter, Virginia Howell, Donna Hughes, Patricia Huizar, Tamika Jackson, Kyle Jaski, Monica Johnson, Nikole Jordan, Mary Jo Jurey, Robert Kaiser, Lucy Karl, Jeffrey Kemp, Linda Kite, Joan Knudson, Sarah Korwan, Ronald Kotz, Ellen Kowitt, Maretta Leitka, Rik Lewis, Beverly Louk, Anthony Malfi, Patrice Matthews, Olivia May, Susan Mcintosh, David Melendez, Holger Meyer, Debra Michaud, Jack Milam, Judy Mills, Chalise Morris, Chris Morris, David Moyer, Susan Mullins, Dorothy Odie, Jeffrey Oelhafen, Christina Olsen, Carol Ostapchuk, Steven Owens, Asim Padh, Justin Palmer, Darrel Parris, Janlisa Parris, Curtis Payne, Lawrence Perlmutter, Jeninne Pitts, Christopher Pratt, Burnease Ragin, Jeffrey Rahn, Michael Raimondi, Karen Rambat, Michael Rapp, Kumar Rashad, Beverly Ricks, Selma Rodriguez, Ruth Patricia Rosados, Andrew Rose, Joel Rosson, Mark Rotondi, Deidrinelle Rouse, Karen Russell, Rick Sabath, Bruce Sanders, Anne Santo, Anne Savarese, Vincent Savarese, Sonja Scott, David Secrist, Shawn Seeley, Tonekia Showell, Tamika Simmonds, John Simmons, Edward Siperstein, Lee Slagle, Dale Smith, Shane Somerville, Angela Sonnier, David Sparks, Kent Spence, Jody Stephens, Rhonda Stevens, Theresa Sykes, Debra Talley, Peter Tapling, Joe Taylor, Gordon Thomas, Joseph Throneberry, Beverly Tookey, Ricardo Vaquer, Edgar Vaynshteyn, Vickie Vetter, Felicia Wallace, John Waller, Kevin Walls, Jean Waskiewicz, Curtis Weaver, Ira Weintraub, Janet Wender, Marjorie Wheeler, Doreen Whelan, Debra Whiddon, Melissa White, Charles Williams, Gerald Williams, Linda Winsey, Stacey Wollman, Dennis Wooldridge, Maria Wooten, Ronzella Wright-Loftly, Jason Young, Julie Young, Melissa Yurkanin, Shaun YurtkuranAssociated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Lai, Erica) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

#58

(#30) LETTER ORDER adopting with modifications (704) Report and Recommendations of Special Master regarding paragraph 11 and Protective Order against subpoenas. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/22/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

#58

(#29) NOTICE of Change of Address by Tina Wolfson Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Wolfson, Tina) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#654

(#28) STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by City of ChicagoAssociated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Richman, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

40 #5

Verification

40 #4

Verification

40 #3

Exhibit

40 #2

Exhibit

40 #1

Exhibit

#6

(#6) ORDER transferring this case to MDL 2879. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 4/5/2019. (kns, Deputy Clerk)(c/e-m as directed 4/5/19) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#5

(#5) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC (Keteltas, Gilbert) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#4

(#4) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC identifying Other Affiliate Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC for Marriott International, Inc..(Keteltas, Gilbert) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Gilbert S Keteltas on behalf of Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC (Keteltas, Gilbert) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#2

(#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Tom Abogabal, Robert Baker, Jacquelyn Cauble, Denee Delnay, Scott Farkas, Raven Hall, Leon Meyer, Eric Mitchell, Michael Rubin, W. Gregory Smith, Joseph Tobin, Teresa Tobin (Hoskins, E) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

1 #3

Summons-Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC

1 #2

Summons-Marriott International Inc.

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7934726.), filed by Michael Rubin, W. Gregory Smith, Jacquelyn Cauble, Eric Mitchell, Tom Abogabal, Robert Baker, Teresa Tobin, Denee Delnay, Scott Farkas, Raven Hall, Leon Meyer, Joseph Tobin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons-Marriott International Inc., #3 Summons-Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC)(Hoskins, E) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Amanda Arnold, Edward Baker, Brad Barringer, Kiana Belcher, Kevin Berry, Susan Beverley, Douglas Blake, Michael Blicher, Carol Blood, Robert Bluestone, Tanesha Boradgiak, Michael Bunker, Brenda Burr, Yvette Butler, Shelia Canipe, Deana Cannon, Catherine Carlberg, Ruthanne Carpenter, Cheryl Castor, Michael Castor, Crystal Chambers, Kathleen Christensen, Prudence Concert-White, Curtis Cummings, Mary Ellen Davey, Christopher Davies, Dorothy Davis, Karen Davis, Kenneth Davis, Graves De Armond, Cynthia Deese, May Desrochers, Scott Dias, Sami Difuntorum, Jonathan Dodart, Julie Duchsherer, Mark Duffey, Gretchen Ehle, Vance Edward Eichelberger, Carla Engle, Barbara Erickson, Michelle Featherstone, Ronald Michael Feschak, Nathan Finney, Janice Frazier-Scott, Lisa Frederickson, Michael Freeland, Lisa Fritz, Marlon Gaines, Steve Gajewski, Laurene Gallway, Eric Gault, Betsy Gentry, Scott Gideon, John Gilliland, Jon Goldberg, Angela Gresh, Latausha Griffin, Jernard Griggs, Edward Hanley, Charles Hanson, Sheila Harrison, Danielle Hayes, Phyllis Hecker, Amber Helton, Jeri Holt-Minter, Virginia Howell, Donna Hughes, Patricia Huizar, Tamika Jackson, Kyle Jaski, Monica Johnson, Nikole Jordan, Mary Jo Jurey, Robert Kaiser, Lucy Karl, Jeffrey Kemp, Linda Kite, Joan Knudson, Sarah Korwan, Ronald Kotz, Ellen Kowitt, Maretta Leitka, Rik Lewis, Beverly Louk, Anthony Malfi, Patrice Matthews, Olivia May, Susan Mcintosh, David Melendez, Holger Meyer, Debra Michaud, Jack Milam, Judy Mills, Chalise Morris, Chris Morris, David Moyer, Susan Mullins, Dorothy Odie, Jeffrey Oelhafen, Christina Olsen, Carol Ostapchuk, Steven Owens, Asim Padh, Justin Palmer, Darrel Parris, Janlisa Parris, Curtis Payne, Lawrence Perlmutter, Jeninne Pitts, Christopher Pratt, Burnease Ragin, Jeffrey Rahn, Michael Raimondi, Karen Rambat, Michael Rapp, Kumar Rashad, Beverly Ricks, Selma Rodriguez, Ruth Patricia Rosados, Andrew Rose, Joel Rosson, Mark Rotondi, Deidrinelle Rouse, Karen Russell, Rick Sabath, Bruce Sanders, Anne Santo, Anne Savarese, Vincent Savarese, Sonja Scott, David Secrist, Shawn Seeley, Tonekia Showell, Tamika Simmonds, John Simmons, Edward Siperstein, Lee Slagle, Dale Smith, Shane Somerville, Angela Sonnier, David Sparks, Kent Spence, Jody Stephens, Rhonda Stevens, Theresa Sykes, Debra Talley, Peter Tapling, Joe Taylor, Gordon Thomas, Joseph Throneberry, Beverly Tookey, Ricardo Vaquer, Edgar Vaynshteyn, Vickie Vetter, Felicia Wallace, John Waller, Kevin Walls, Jean Waskiewicz, Curtis Weaver, Ira Weintraub, Janet Wender, Marjorie Wheeler, Doreen Whelan, Debra Whiddon, Melissa White, Charles Williams, Gerald Williams, Linda Winsey, Stacey Wollman, Dennis Wooldridge, Maria Wooten, Ronzella Wright-Loftly, Jason Young, Julie Young, Melissa Yurkanin, Shaun YurtkuranAssociated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Lai, Erica) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) LETTER ORDER adopting with modifications (704) Report and Recommendations of Special Master regarding paragraph 11 and Protective Order against subpoenas. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/22/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Change of Address by Tina Wolfson Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Wolfson, Tina) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by City of ChicagoAssociated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Richman, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) (FILED IN ERROR) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Edmund Alves. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Verification, #5 Verification)Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(O Connell, Andrew) Modified on 8/25/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) STATUS REPORT /Joint Status Report by Construction Laborers Pension Trust for Southern CaliforniaAssociated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Villegas, Carol) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER Canceling Status Conference. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 3/16/2020. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Andrea Durkee, Nathan Esquerra Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Johnsgard, Amy) Modified on 3/2/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER in Consumer Actions granting in part and denying in part (450) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (451) Motion to Dismiss in case 8:19-md-02879-PWG. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/21/2020 Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MEMORANDUM OPINION in Consumer Actions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/21/2020 Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE by Amanda Arnold, Edward Baker, Brad Barringer, Kiana Belcher, Kevin Berry, Susan Beverley, Douglas Blake, Michael Blicher, Carol Blood, Robert Bluestone, Tanesha Boradgiak, Michael Bunker, Brenda Burr, Yvette Butler, Shelia Canipe, Deana Cannon, Catherine Carlberg, Ruthanne Carpenter, Cheryl Castor, Michael Castor, Crystal Chambers, Kathleen Christensen, Prudence Concert-White, Curtis Cummings, Mary Ellen Davey, Christopher Davies, Dorothy Davis, Karen Davis, Kenneth Davis, Graves De Armond, Cynthia Deese, May Desrochers, Scott Dias, Sami Difuntorum, Jonathan Dodart, Julie Duchsherer, Mark Duffey, Gretchen Ehle, Vance Edward Eichelberger, Carla Engle, Barbara Erickson, Michelle Featherstone, Ronald Michael Feschak, Nathan Finney, Janice Frazier-Scott, Lisa Frederickson, Michael Freeland, Lisa Fritz, Marlon Gaines, Steve Gajewski, Laurene Gallway, Eric Gault, Betsy Gentry, Scott Gideon, John Gilliland, Jon Goldberg, Angela Gresh, Latausha Griffin, Jernard Griggs, Edward Hanley, Charles Hanson, Sheila Harrison, Danielle Hayes, Phyllis Hecker, Amber Helton, Jeri Holt-Minter, Virginia Howell, Donna Hughes, Patricia Huizar, Tamika Jackson, Kyle Jaski, Monica Johnson, Nikole Jordan, Mary Jo Jurey, Robert Kaiser, Lucy Karl, Jeffrey Kemp, Linda Kite, Joan Knudson, Sarah Korwan, Ronald Kotz, Ellen Kowitt, Maretta Leitka, Rik Lewis, Beverly Louk, Anthony Malfi, Patrice Matthews, Olivia May, Susan Mcintosh, David Melendez, Holger Meyer, Debra Michaud, Jack Milam, Judy Mills, Chalise Morris, Chris Morris, David Moyer, Susan Mullins, Dorothy Odie, Jeffrey Oelhafen, Christina Olsen, Carol Ostapchuk, Steven Owens, Asim Padh, Justin Palmer, Darrel Parris, Janlisa Parris, Curtis Payne, Lawrence Perlmutter, Jeninne Pitts, Christopher Pratt, Burnease Ragin, Jeffrey Rahn, Michael Raimondi, Karen Rambat, Michael Rapp, Kumar Rashad, Beverly Ricks, Selma Rodriguez, Ruth Patricia Rosados, Andrew Rose, Joel Rosson, Mark Rotondi, Deidrinelle Rouse, Karen Russell, Richard Ryans, Rick Sabath, Bruce Sanders, Anne Santo, Anne Savarese, Vincent Savarese, Sonja Scott, David Secrist, Shawn Seeley, Tonekia Showell, Tamika Simmonds, John Simmons, Edward Siperstein, Lee Slagle, Dale Smith, Shane Somerville, Angela Sonnier, David Sparks, Kent Spence, Jody Stephens, Rhonda Stevens, Theresa Sykes, Debra Talley, Peter Tapling, Joe Taylor, Gordon Thomas, Joseph Throneberry, Beverly Tookey, Ricardo Vaquer, Edgar Vaynshteyn, Vickie Vetter, Felicia Wallace, John Waller, Kevin Walls, Jean Waskiewicz, Curtis Weaver, Ira Weintraub, Janet Wender, Marjorie Wheeler, Doreen Whelan, Debra Whiddon, Melissa White, Charles Williams, Gerald Williams, Linda Winsey, Stacey Wollman, Dennis Wooldridge, Maria Wooten, Ronzella Wright-Loftly, Jason Young, Julie Young, Melissa Yurkanin, Shaun Yurtkuran Plaintiffs' Interim Coordinating Counsel's Proposed CMO Regarding Model Leadship Applications for the Consumer Track Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Pizzirusso, James) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued 21 days as to Marriott International, Inc. and Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Cases associated: Create association to 8:19-md-02879-PWG. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER transferring this case to MDL 2879. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 4/5/2019. (kns, Deputy Clerk)(c/e-m as directed 4/5/19) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Case Reassigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. Judge Paula Xinis no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC (Keteltas, Gilbert) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC identifying Other Affiliate Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC for Marriott International, Inc..(Keteltas, Gilbert) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Gilbert S Keteltas on behalf of Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC (Keteltas, Gilbert) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Tom Abogabal, Robert Baker, Jacquelyn Cauble, Denee Delnay, Scott Farkas, Raven Hall, Leon Meyer, Eric Mitchell, Michael Rubin, W. Gregory Smith, Joseph Tobin, Teresa Tobin (Hoskins, E) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7934726.), filed by Michael Rubin, W. Gregory Smith, Jacquelyn Cauble, Eric Mitchell, Tom Abogabal, Robert Baker, Teresa Tobin, Denee Delnay, Scott Farkas, Raven Hall, Leon Meyer, Joseph Tobin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons-Marriott International Inc., #3 Summons-Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC)(Hoskins, E) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Marriott International Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer E David Hoskins

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary F. Lynch