This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:06:53 (UTC).

Able Home Health, LLC v. TT Medical, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Able Home Health, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against TT Medical, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Marvin E. Aspen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03811

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marvin E. Aspen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Able Home Health, LLC

Defendants

Lawrence Treystman

John Does 1-10

TT Medical, Inc.

Larry Treystman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel A. Edelman

Attorney at Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin LLC

20 South Clark Street, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

Heather A. Kolbus

Attorney at Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin, LLC

20 South Clark Street, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

Cathleen M. Combs

Attorney at Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin LLC

20 South Clark Street, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Able Home Health, LLC regarding statement #6 Plaintiff's Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Kolbus, Heather) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#13

(#13) Notice of Settlement by Able Home Health, LLC (Kolbus, Heather) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Class Action filed by Able Home Health, LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15906271.(Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#10

(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Initial status hearing is set for 8/15/2019 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#5

(#5) Local Rule 3.2 STATEMENT by Able Home Health, LLC (Kolbus, Heather) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Able Home Health, LLC by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Able Home Health, LLC as to Lawrence Treystman on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Kolbus, Heather) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#6

(#6) Fed. R. CIV. P. 7.1 Disclosure STATEMENT by Able Home Health, LLC (Kolbus, Heather) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Able Home Health, LLC as to TT Medical, Inc. on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Kolbus, Heather) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Able Home Health, LLC by Cathleen M. Combs (Combs, Cathleen) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Able Home Health, LLC regarding statement #5 Plaintiff's Local Rule 3.2 Statement (Kolbus, Heather) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Able Home Health, LLC by Heather A. Kolbus (Kolbus, Heather) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Notice of Settlement by Able Home Health, LLC (Kolbus, Heather) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Able Home Health, LLC as to Lawrence Treystman on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Kolbus, Heather) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Able Home Health, LLC as to TT Medical, Inc. on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Kolbus, Heather) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Initial status hearing is set for 8/15/2019 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants TT Medical, Inc., Lawrence Treystman (dal, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Able Home Health, LLC regarding statement #6 Plaintiff's Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Kolbus, Heather) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Able Home Health, LLC regarding statement #5 Plaintiff's Local Rule 3.2 Statement (Kolbus, Heather) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Able Home Health, LLC by Cathleen M. Combs (Combs, Cathleen) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Fed. R. CIV. P. 7.1 Disclosure STATEMENT by Able Home Health, LLC (Kolbus, Heather) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Local Rule 3.2 STATEMENT by Able Home Health, LLC (Kolbus, Heather) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Able Home Health, LLC by Heather A. Kolbus (Kolbus, Heather) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Able Home Health, LLC by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Class Action filed by Able Home Health, LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15906271.(Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.