This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/10/2021 at 08:55:58 (UTC).

Able et al v. Foxbrook Homeowners' Association, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 Able filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Foxbrook Homeowners' Association, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven D. Merryday and Julie S. Sneed. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-01913

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Merryday

Referral Judge

Julie S. Sneed

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Douglas Able

Christina Able

Defendants

Foxbrook Homeowners' Association, Inc.

Dana Relyea

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Leland Wilson

Attorney at Denali Law Group PA

12600 World Plaza Lane #63Fort Myers

Fort Myers, FL 33907

Defendant Attorneys

Karen M. Nissen

Attorney at Vernis & Bowling of Palm Beach, PA

884 Us Hwy 1

North Palm Beach, FL 33408

J Marcos Martinez

Attorney at Luks & Santaniello, LLC

150 W Flagler Streetsuite 2600

Miami, FL 33130

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

#3

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER re #10--notice; dismissing the action; denying as moot #9--motion for an extension of time; directing the clerk to close the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/15/2021. (GG) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE by Christina Able, Douglas Able Notice of Pending Settlement (Wilson, Leland) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Foxbrook Homeowners' Association, Inc.. (Nissen, Karen) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Karen M. Nissen on behalf of Foxbrook Homeowners' Association, Inc. (Nissen, Karen) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by J Marcos Martinez on behalf of Dana Relyea (Martinez, J) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Dana Relyea re #5 Notice of appearance (Martinez, J) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by J Marcos Martinez on behalf of Foxbrook Homeowners' Association, Inc. (Martinez, J) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c) and Local Rule 3.02(a)(2): -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GSO) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Foxbrook Homeowners' Association, Inc., Dana Relyea. (CTR) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:21-cv-1913-SDM-JSS. (SJB) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18575539) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Wilson, Leland) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karen M. Nissen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonlyn M Martinez