This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/04/2021 at 07:17:14 (UTC).

Abkco Music, Inc. et al v. Sagan et al

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 Abkco Music, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Sagan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sharon Johnson Coleman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01812

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sharon Johnson Coleman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

W Chappell Music Corp.

EMI Robbins Catalog Inc.

EMI Unart Catalog Inc.

EMI Consortium Music Publishing, Inc. doing business as EMI Full Keel Music Co.

PSO Limited

EMI Blackwood Music Inc.

EMI Algee Music Corp.

Peermusic III, Ltd.

Colgems-EMI Music Inc.

Peermusic Ltd.

EMI Feist Catalog Inc.

Towser Tunes, Inc.

Rodgers & Hammerstein Holdings, LLC

Peer International Corporation

Songs of Peer, Ltd.

Jobete Music Co., Inc.

WB Music Corp.

Screen-Gems-EMI Music Inc.

Abkco Music, Inc.

Defendant

William Sagan

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robin Valentina Waters

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb LLP

321 N. Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Citation to Discover Assets to Third Party (Waters, Robin) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CITATION to Discover Assets issued 1 Original and 1 copy as to Third Party: The Northern Trust Company (No Notice). (gcy, ) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. (gcy, ) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Abkco Music, Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Robbins Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Jobete Music Co., Inc., PSO Limited, Peer International Corporation, Peermusic III, Ltd., Peermusic Ltd., Rodgers & Hammerstein Holdings, LLC, Screen-Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Peer, Ltd., Spirit Catalog Holdings, S.A.R.L., Spirit Two Music, Inc., Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Towser Newco Ltd., Towser Tunes, Inc., W Chappell Music Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. by Robin Valentina Waters (Waters, Robin) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cl, ) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Waters, Robin) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MISCELLANEOUS CASE by Abkco Music, Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Robbins Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Jobete Music Co., Inc., PSO Limited, Peer International Corporation, Peermusic III, Ltd., Peermusic Ltd., Rodgers & Hammerstein Holdings, LLC, Screen-Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Peer, Ltd., Spirit Catalog Holdings, S.A.R.L., Spirit Two Music, Inc., Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Towser Newco Ltd., Towser Tunes, Inc., W Chappell Music Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. Registration of Foreign Judgment Filing fee $ 49, receipt number 0752-18089901. (Attorneys' Fees Judgment) (Waters, Robin) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Towser Tunes, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Rodgers & Hammerstein Holdings, LLC is a litigant