This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/04/2021 at 07:06:24 (UTC).

ABKCO Music, Inc. et al v. Sagan et al

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 ABKCO Music, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Sagan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kandis A. Westmore. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-MC-80074

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kandis A. Westmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

W Chappell Music Corp.

EMI Robbins Catalog Inc.

EMI Unart Catalog Inc.

PSO Limited

EMI Blackwood Music Inc.

EMI Algee Music Corp.

Peermusic III, Ltd.

Colgems-Emi Music Inc.

Peermusic Ltd.

Spirit Catalog Holdings S.A.R.L.

EMI Feist Catalog Inc.

Towser Tunes, Inc.

EMI Consortium Music Publishing, Inc. doing business as EMI Full Keel Music

Rodgers & Hammerstein Holdings, LLC

Peer International Corporation

Songs of Peer, Ltd.

Jobete Music Co., Inc.

WB Music Corp.

Screen-Gems-EMI Music Inc.

ABKCO Music, Inc.

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Aaron Grossman

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb LLP

10100 Santa Monica Blvd., Suite 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4164

 

Court Documents

#1

#3

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Abstract of Judgment issued against William Sagan, Norton LLC, and Bill Graham Archives, LLC in the amount of $2,420,226.00. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2021) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Abstract of Judgment by ABKCO Music, Inc.. (Grossman, David) (Filed on 5/25/2021) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2021) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) REGISTRATION OF JUDGMENT (Attorneys' Fees Judgment) against Bill Graham Archives, LLC, Norton LLC, William Sagan ( Filing fee $ 49, receipt number 0971-15794280.). Filed by W Chappell Music Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Spirit Two Music, Inc., Towser Newco Ltd., Towser Tunes, Inc., Spirit Catalog Holdings S.A.R.L., Songs of Peer, Ltd., Peermusic III, Ltd., Peermusic Ltd., PSO Limited, Peer International Corporation, Rodgers & Hammerstein Holdings, LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Stone Agate Music, Screen-Gems-EMI Music Inc., Jobete Music Co., Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., EMI Robbins Catalog Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Algee Music Corp., Colgems-Emi Music Inc., ABKCO Music, Inc.. (Grossman, David) (Filed on 4/5/2021) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Towser Tunes, Inc. is a litigant