This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/08/2021 at 07:51:25 (UTC).

ABKCO Music Inc. et al v. Roblox Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 ABKCO Music Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Roblox Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Ronald S.W. Lew and Maria A. Audero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04705

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald S.W. Lew

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

Peer International Corporation

Panther Music Corp.

Polygram Publishing, Inc.

Downtown Music Publishing LLC

Peermusic III, Ltd.

Hipgnosis SFH I Limited

Universal Music Z Tunes LLC

Universal Music Publishing, Inc.

MPL Communications, Inc.

Universal Music Corp.

Cherio Corporation

Reservoir Media Management, Inc.

ABKCO Music Inc.

Kobalt Music Publishing America, Inc.

Concord Music Group, Inc.

Spirit Music Holdings, Inc.

Songs of Peer, Ltd.

Rodgers & Hammerstein Holdings LLC

Roblox Corporation

Boosey & Hawkes, Inc.

Petitioner and Defendant

Roblox Corporation

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

David A. Steinberg

Attorney at Mitchell Silberberg and Knupp LLP

2049 Century Park East 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3120

Alexandra Leigh Anfuso

Attorney at Mitchell Silberberg and Knupp

2049 Century Park East 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3120

Leo Martin Lichtman

Attorney at Mitchell Silberberg and Knupp LLP

437 Madison Avenue 25Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Christine Lepera

Attorney at Mitchell Silberberg and Knupp LLP

437 Madison Avenue 25Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Jeffrey M. Movit

Attorney at Mitchell Silberberg and Knupp LLP

437 Madison Avenue 25Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Michael Gass

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

505 Montgomery Street Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111-6538

Allison L. Stillman

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

1271 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Colleen Bal

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati APC

One Market Plaza, Spear Tower Suite 3300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Elana Nightingale Dawson

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh Street Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Gary Richard Greenstein

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich and Rosati PC

1700 K Street Nw 5Th Floor

Washington, DC 20006

John Paul Flynn

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich and Rosati PC

One Market Plaza, Spear Tower Suite 3300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Joseph Richard Wetzel

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

505 Montgomery Street Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Josh Alec Baskin

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich and Rosati

1 Market Plaza Spear Tower Suite 3300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Lisa D Zang

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich and Rosati PC

633 West Fifth Street Suite 1550

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2027

Robert James Ellison

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Steffen N. Johnson

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich and Rosati PC

1700 K Street Nw 5Th Floor

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#40

39 #1

Proposed Order

39 #39

Main Document

#38

#37

#36

24 #2

Proposed Order

24 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

24 #24

Main Document

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Defendant Roblox Corporation.(Gass, Andrew) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Joint STIPULATION for Order Extending Time to Respond to Initial Complaint and Setting Schedule for Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Roblox Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gass, Andrew) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gary R. Greenstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Roblox Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31584650) #24 filed by Defendant Roblox Corporation. (Greenstein, Gary) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gary Richard Greenstein on behalf of Defendant Roblox Corporation (Greenstein, Gary) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: GRANTING #23 Non-Resident Attorney Steffen N. Johnson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant, Roblox Corporation, designating Lisa D. Zang as local counsel. (shb) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE OF LODGING filed re APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steffen N. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Roblox Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31584572) #23 , Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form,,, #33 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Zang, Lisa) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney John Paul Flynn on behalf of Defendant Roblox Corporation (Attorney John Paul Flynn added to party Roblox Corporation(pty:dft))(Flynn, John) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steffen N. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Roblox Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31584572) #23 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gary R. Greenstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Roblox Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31584650) #24 by Clerk of Court. The document is accepted as filed. Lodging of the missing Ce1iificate of Good Standings for eve1y state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted, not previously provided, pursuant to Local Rule 83- 2.1.3.3( d), to be filed on or before August 15, 2021.. (shb) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: granting #19 Non-Resident Attorney Allison L Stillman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Roblox Corporation, designating Robert J Ellison as local counsel. (pj) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: granting #20 Non-Resident Attorney Nightingale Dawson, Elana APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Roblox Corporation, designating Robert J Ellison as local counsel. (pj) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey M. Movit. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Christine Lepera. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Roblox Corporation. (car) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (car) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by ABKCO Music Inc., Big Machine Music, LLC, Boosey & Hawkes, Inc., Cherio Corporation, Concord Music Group, Inc., Concord Music Publishing LLC, Downtown Music Publishing LLC, Hipgnosis SFH I Limited, Hipgnosis Songs Group, LLC, Kobalt Music Publishing America, Inc., MPL Communications, Inc., MPL Music Publishing, Inc., Panther Music Corp., Peer International Corporation, Peermusic III, Ltd., Peermusic Ltd., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Pulse 2.0, LLC, Reservoir Media Management, Inc., Rodgers & Hammerstein Holdings LLC, Songs of Peer, Ltd., Songs of Universal, Inc., Southern Music Publishing Co. Inc., Spirit Music Holdings, Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing, Inc., Universal Musica, Inc.. (Steinberg, David) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Statement and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying ABKCO Music Inc. Big Machine Music, LLC Boosey & Hawkes, Inc. Cherio Corporation Concord Music Publishing LLC Concord Music Group, Inc. Downtown Music Publishing LLC Hipgnosis SFH I Limited Hipgnosis Songs Group, LLC Kobalt Music Publishing America, Inc. MPL Communications, Inc. MPL Music Publishing, Inc. Panther Music Corp. Peer International Corporation Peermusic Ltd. Peermusic III, Ltd. Polygram Publishing, Inc. Rodgers & Hammerstein Holdings LLC Pulse 2.0, LLC Reservoir Media Management, Inc. Songs of Peer, Ltd. Songs of Universal, Inc. Southern Music Publishing Co. Inc. Spirit Music Holdings, Inc. Universal Music MGB NA LLC Universal Music Z Tunes LLC Universal Music Corp. Universal Music Publishing, Inc. Universal Musica, Inc.. (Steinberg, David) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs ABKCO Music Inc., Big Machine Music, LLC, Boosey & Hawkes, Inc., Cherio Corporation, Concord Music Group, Inc., Concord Music Publishing LLC, Downtown Music Publishing LLC, Hipgnosis SFH I Limited, Hipgnosis Songs Group, LLC, Kobalt Music Publishing America, Inc., MPL Communications, Inc., MPL Music Publishing, Inc., Panther Music Corp., Peer International Corporation, Peermusic III, Ltd., Peermusic Ltd., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Pulse 2.0, LLC, Reservoir Media Management, Inc., Rodgers & Hammerstein Holdings LLC, Songs of Peer, Ltd., Songs of Universal, Inc., Southern Music Publishing Co. Inc., Spirit Music Holdings, Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing, Inc., Universal Musica, Inc.. (Steinberg, David) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movants ABKCO Music Inc., Big Machine Music, LLC, Boosey & Hawkes, Inc., Cherio Corporation, Concord Music Group, Inc., Concord Music Publishing LLC, Downtown Music Publishing LLC, Hipgnosis SFH I Limited, Hipgnosis Songs Group, LLC, Kobalt Music Publishing America, Inc., MPL Communications, Inc., MPL Music Publishing, Inc., Panther Music Corp., Peer International Corporation, Peermusic III, Ltd., Peermusic Ltd., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Pulse 2.0, LLC, Reservoir Media Management, Inc., Rodgers & Hammerstein Holdings LLC, Songs of Peer, Ltd., Songs of Universal, Inc., Southern Music Publishing Co. Inc., Spirit Music Holdings, Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing, Inc., Universal Musica, Inc.. (Steinberg, David) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31436018 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs MPL Communications, Inc., Songs of Peer, Ltd., Downtown Music Publishing LLC, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Polygram Publishing, Inc., Big Machine Music, LLC, Songs of Universal, Inc., ABKCO Music Inc., Rodgers & Hammerstein Holdings LLC, Southern Music Publishing Co. Inc., Peermusic III, Ltd., Panther Music Corp., Universal Musica, Inc., Universal Music Corp., Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Concord Music Group, Inc., Universal Music Publishing, Inc., Boosey & Hawkes, Inc., Hipgnosis Songs Group, LLC, MPL Music Publishing, Inc., Reservoir Media Management, Inc., Peer International Corporation, Peermusic Ltd., Hipgnosis SFH I Limited, Cherio Corporation, Spirit Music Holdings, Inc., Pulse 2.0, LLC, Kobalt Music Publishing America, Inc., Concord Music Publishing LLC. (Attorney David A. Steinberg added to party ABKCO Music Inc.(pty:bkmov), Attorney David A. Steinberg added to party Big Machine Music, LLC(pty:bkmov), Attorney David A. Steinberg added to party Boosey & Hawkes, Inc.(pty:bkmov), Attorney David A. Steinberg added to party Cherio Corporation(pty:bkmov), Attorney David A. Steinberg added to party Concord Music Group, Inc.(pty:bkmov), Attorney David A. Steinberg added to party Concord Music Publishing LLC(pty:bkmov), Attorney David A. Steinberg added to party Downtown Music Publishing LLC(pty:bkmov), Attorney David A. Steinberg added to party Hipgnosis SFH I Limited(pty:bkmov), Attorney David A. Steinberg added to party Hipgnosis Songs Group, LLC(pty:bkmov), Attorney David A. Steinberg added to party Kobalt Music Publishing America, Inc.(pty:bkmov), Attorney David A. Steinberg added to party MPL Communications, Inc.(pty:bkmov), Attorney David A. Steinberg added to party MPL Music Publishing, Inc.(pty:bkmov), Attorney David A. Steinberg added to party Panther Music Corp.(pty:bkmov), Attorney David A. Steinberg added to party Peer International Corporation(pty:bkmov), Attorney David A. Steinberg added to party Peermusic III, Ltd.(pty:bkmov), Attorney David A. Steinberg added to party Peermusic Ltd.(pty:bkmov), Attorney David A. Steinberg added to party Polygram Publishing, Inc.(pty:bkmov), Attorney David A. Steinberg added to party Pulse 2.0, LLC(pty:bkmov), Attorney David A. Steinberg added to party Reservoir Media Management, Inc.(pty:bkmov), Attorney David A. Steinberg added to party Rodgers & Hammerstein Holdings LLC(pty:bkmov), Attorney David A. Steinberg added to party Songs of Peer, Ltd.(pty:bkmov), Attorney David A. Steinberg added to party Songs of Universal, Inc.(pty:bkmov), Attorney David A. Steinberg added to party Southern Music Publishing Co. Inc. (pty:bkmov), Attorney David A. Steinberg added to party Spirit Music Holdings, Inc.(pty:bkmov), Attorney David A. Steinberg added to party Universal Music MGB NA LLC(pty:bkmov), Attorney David A. Steinberg added to party Universal Music Z Tunes LLC(pty:bkmov), Attorney David A. Steinberg added to party Universal Music Corp.(pty:bkmov), Attorney David A. Steinberg added to party Universal Music Publishing, Inc.(pty:bkmov), Attorney David A. Steinberg added to party Universal Musica, Inc.(pty:bkmov))(Steinberg, David) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Downtown Music Publishing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MPL Communications, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Rodgers & Hammerstein Holdings, LLC is a litigant