This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/30/2022 at 09:54:18 (UTC).

ABIRA MEDICAL LABORATORIES, LLC v. TRANSPORTATION INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/31/2022 ABIRA MEDICAL LABORATORIES, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against TRANSPORTATION INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01241

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABIRA MEDICAL LABORATORIES, LLC doing business as GENESIS DIAGNOSTICS

Defendant

TRANSPORTATION INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID W. GHISALBERT

Attorney at Law Office of David W. Ghisalbert

5907 Bonita Creek

Missouri City, TX 77459

Defendant Attorney

MELISSA A. CORNIBE

Attorney at CNA COVERAGE LITIGATION GROUP

Three Radnor Corporate Center, 100 Matsonford Road

Radnor, PA 19087

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #3

Case Management Track Form

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to TRANSPORTATION INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.. (rf, ) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#4

(#4) ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND #3 , IT IS ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT SHALL RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN JUNE 17, 2022. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 5/13/22.5/16/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/14/2022 09:00 AM IN Judge's Chambers ROOM 9400, BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE; AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 5/13/22. 5/16/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/14/2022 09:00 AM IN Judge's Chambers ROOM 9400, BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE; AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 5/13/22. 5/16/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND #3 , IT IS ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT SHALL RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN JUNE 17, 2022. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 5/13/22.5/16/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by TRANSPORTATION INSURANCE COMPANY, INC... (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CORNIBE, MELISSA) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to TRANSPORTATION INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.. (rf, ) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against TRANSPORTATION INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15827354.), filed by Abira Medical Laboratories, LLC d/b/a Genesis Diagnostics. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(GHISALBERT, DAVID) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Abira Medical Laboratories, LLC d/b/a Genesis Diagnostics is a litigant

Latest cases where TRANSPORTATION INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melissa A. Cornibe Esq.