This case was last updated from PACER on 05/04/2021 at 07:18:46 (UTC).

Abhyanker v. Nextdoor, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 Abhyanker filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Nextdoor, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William H. Orrick and Edward M. Chen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01586

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

William H. Orrick

Edward M. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Raj Abhyanker

Mountain View, CA 94040

Defendant

Nextdoor, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Raj Vasant Abhyanker

Attorney at Raj Abhyanker, PC

1580 W El Camino Real, Suite 13

Mountain View, CA 94040

Wensheng Ma

Attorney at LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C.

1580 W. El Camino Real, Suite 10

Mountain View, CA 94040

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel John Emam

Attorney at Fenwick West

1191 Second Avenue, Suite 100

Seattle, WA 98101

Kevin X. McGann

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

902 Broadway, Suite 14

New York, NY 10010

Laurence F. Pulgram

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

555 California Street, Suite 1200

San Francisco, CA 94104

Matthew Berman Becker

Attorney at Fenwick and West LLP

555 California Street, 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) ORDER granting #26 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/9/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021) (Entered: 04/11/2021)

#27

(#27) ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of all claims by Raj Abhyanker (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 4/7/2021) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

25 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#25

(#25) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15806253.) filed by Nextdoor, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Emam, Daniel) (Filed on 4/7/2021) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

15 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Standing

#15

(#24) ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

8 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#22

RESTRICTED

#23

(#23) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 4/1/2021 re 524 MOTION to Enforce Settlement and for Immediate Interim Relief filed by Nextdoor, Inc. Court takes matter under submission. Total Time in Court: 1 Hour; 23 Minutes (time includes sealed hearing: 1 Hour; 13 Minutes) Court Reporter: Ruth Ekhaus. Plaintiff Attorneys: Laurence Pulgram, Kevin McGann, Matthew Becker,Dan Emam. Defendant Attorney: Raj Abhyanker, pro per. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/1/2021) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#6

(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Raj Abhyanker.. (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 3/5/2021) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#5

(#5) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 3/5/2021) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 3/5/2021) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#3

(#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding U.S. Pat. Nos. 8,863,245 | 8,965,409 | 9,037,516 | 9,064,288 | 9,071,367 | 9,098,545 (cc: form mailed to register). (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 3/5/2021) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet by Raj Abhyanker . (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 3/5/2021) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement of U.S. Pat. Nos. 8,863,245 | 8,965,409 | 9,037,516 | 9,064,288 | 9,071,367 | 9,098,545 against Nextdoor, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15662068.). Filed byRaj Abhyanker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 3/5/2021) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER granting #26 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/9/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021) (Entered: 04/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of all claims by Raj Abhyanker (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 4/7/2021) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15806253.) filed by Nextdoor, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Emam, Daniel) (Filed on 4/7/2021) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/01/2021, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RMR, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, Telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 4/20/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/30/2021. (rreS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 4/1/2021 re 524 MOTION to Enforce Settlement and for Immediate Interim Relief filed by Nextdoor, Inc. Court takes matter under submission. Total Time in Court: 1 Hour; 23 Minutes (time includes sealed hearing: 1 Hour; 13 Minutes) Court Reporter: Ruth Ekhaus. Plaintiff Attorneys: Laurence Pulgram, Kevin McGann, Matthew Becker,Dan Emam. Defendant Attorney: Raj Abhyanker, pro per. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/1/2021) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to (524 in 3:12-cv-05667-EMC) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order [Nextdoor, Inc.'s Notice of Motion to Enforce Settlement and For Immediate Interim Relief]. Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2021) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • Docket(#21) CLERKS NOTICE SETTING MOTION HEARING 524 AS ZOOM HEARING. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/.< /p< (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2021) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to (524 in 3:12-cv-05667-EMC) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order [Nextdoor, Inc.'s Notice of Motion to Enforce Settlement and For Immediate Interim Relief]. Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2021) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 complaint)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2021) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Nextdoor, Inc. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2021) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 6/1/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/8/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2021) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • Docket(#7) Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2021) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Raj Abhyanker.. (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 3/5/2021) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 3/5/2021) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 3/5/2021) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding U.S. Pat. Nos. 8,863,245 | 8,965,409 | 9,037,516 | 9,064,288 | 9,071,367 | 9,098,545 (cc: form mailed to register). (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 3/5/2021) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet by Raj Abhyanker . (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 3/5/2021) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement of U.S. Pat. Nos. 8,863,245 | 8,965,409 | 9,037,516 | 9,064,288 | 9,071,367 | 9,098,545 against Nextdoor, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15662068.). Filed byRaj Abhyanker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 3/5/2021) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEXTDOOR.COM INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Berman Becker

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin X. McGann, Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laurence F. Pulgram Esquire