This case was last updated from PACER on 08/25/2020 at 10:33:57 (UTC).

Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari et al v. Victory Park Capital Advisors, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/26/2020 Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Victory Park Capital Advisors, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Maria A. Audero and Percy Anderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-05734

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

 

Party Details

Defendants

Bacon-Up Corp.

Capitol City Escrow, Inc.,

QIC US Management Services, Inc.

Rick Pak

Ted Cutting

United Business Bank

Elias Nakhleh

Brookfield Properties, Inc

Paul Koren

Elite Restaurant Group, Inc.

Cutting Concepts Corporation

JC & Associates, Inc.

Preferred Bank

Donna Grady

Michael Nakhleh

Victory Park Capital Advisors, Inc.

Slater's 50/50 Franchise, LLC

Mazyar Yaghoubian

Maninder Singh

MUFG Union Bank, N.A., a national association,

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Allison Lenore Jones

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

633 West Fifth Street 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Kimberly Diane Howatt

Attorney at Gordon Rees Sccully Mansukhani LLP

101 West Broadway Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

Other Attorneys

Kevin John Mirch

Attorney at Mirch Law Firm LLP

701 B Street Suite 2500

San Diego, CA 92101

Marie C Mirch

Attorney at Mirch Law Firm LLP

750 B Street No 2500

San Diego, CA 92101

Jing Hua

Attorney at Snell and Wilmer LLP

600 Anton Boulevard Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-7689

Christopher M Egleson

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 West Fifth Street Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CS 90013

Sean A Commons

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 West Fifth Street Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90013-1010

William S O'Hare, Jr

Attorney at Snell and Wilmer LLP

600 Anton Boulevard Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-7689

Elizabeth M Weldon

Attorney at Snell and Wilmer LLP

600 Anton Boulevard Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

#115

(#115) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Donya Entertainment, Inc., Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, upon Defendant Mazyar Yaghoubian served on 8/23/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mazyar Yaghoubian - individual defendant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mirch, Marie) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

114 #2

Proposed Order

114 #1

Declaration

#114

(#114) STIPULATION to Continue hearing on motions to dismiss from September 14, 2020 to September 21, 2020 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 8(A)(2), 12(B)(1), AND 12(B)(6) #103 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 8(A)(2), 12(B)(1), AND 12(B)(6) #104 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 8(A)(2), 12(B)(1), AND 12(B)(6) #100 filed by Plaintiffs Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Mirch, Marie) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

104 #2

Proof of Service

104 #1

Proposed Order

103 #2

Proof of Service

103 #1

Proposed Order

100 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc.. (Mirch, Kevin) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#8

(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc.. (Mirch, Kevin) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#7

(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc.. (Mirch, Kevin) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#6

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc.. (Mirch, Kevin) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc.. (Mirch, Kevin) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc.. (Mirch, Kevin) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc.. (Mirch, Kevin) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#2

(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc.. (Mirch, Kevin) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#1

(#111) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Christine Pham answer now due 9/18/2020; Rancho Mall, LLC answer now due 9/18/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Christine Pham; Rancho Mall, LLC.(Attorney Elizabeth M Weldon added to party Christine Pham(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth M Weldon added to party Rancho Mall, LLC(pty:dft))(Weldon, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

123 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#115) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Donya Entertainment, Inc., Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, upon Defendant Mazyar Yaghoubian served on 8/23/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mazyar Yaghoubian - individual defendant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mirch, Marie) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#114) STIPULATION to Continue hearing on motions to dismiss from September 14, 2020 to September 21, 2020 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 8(A)(2), 12(B)(1), AND 12(B)(6) #103 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 8(A)(2), 12(B)(1), AND 12(B)(6) #104 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 8(A)(2), 12(B)(1), AND 12(B)(6) #100 filed by Plaintiffs Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Mirch, Marie) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#113) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Allison Lenore Jones counsel for Defendants Elite Restaurant Group, Inc., Elias Nakhleh, Slaters 50 50 Franchise, LLC. Adding Allison L. Jones as counsel of record for SLATERS 50/50 FRANCHISE, LLC, ELIAS NAKHLEH, and ELITE RESTAURANT GROUP, INC. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants SLATERS 50/50 FRANCHISE, LLC, ELIAS NAKHLEH, and ELITE RESTAURANT GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Allison Lenore Jones added to party Elite Restaurant Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Lenore Jones added to party Elias Nakhleh(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Lenore Jones added to party Slaters 50 50 Franchise, LLC(pty:dft))(Jones, Allison) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#112) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to MUFG Union Bank, N.A. answer now due 9/14/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 9/14/20 filed by Defendant MUFG Union Bank, N.A..(Attorney Christopher M Egleson added to party MUFG Union Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Egleson, Christopher) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#111) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Christine Pham answer now due 9/18/2020; Rancho Mall, LLC answer now due 9/18/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Christine Pham; Rancho Mall, LLC.(Attorney Elizabeth M Weldon added to party Christine Pham(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth M Weldon added to party Rancho Mall, LLC(pty:dft))(Weldon, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#110) NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Donya Entertainment, Inc., Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, upon Defendant Rancho Mall, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 7/31/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Kendra Newman, Counsel for Defendant Rancho Mall, LLC. (Mirch, Marie) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#109) NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Donya Entertainment, Inc., Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, upon Defendant Christine Pham acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 7/31/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Christine Pham, Defendant. (Mirch, Marie) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Donya Entertainment, Inc., Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, upon Defendant MUFG Union Bank, N.A. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 7/10/2020, answer due 7/31/2020. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Christopher Egleson, Counsel for Defendant MFUG Union Bank. (Mirch, Marie) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#107) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Elite Restaurant Group, Inc., identifying Slaters 50 50 Franchise, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Howatt, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Elias Nakhleh, (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Howatt, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
95 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc.. (Mirch, Kevin) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc.. (Mirch, Kevin) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc.. (Mirch, Kevin) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc.. (Mirch, Kevin) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc.. (Mirch, Kevin) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc.. (Mirch, Kevin) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc.. (Mirch, Kevin) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc.. (Mirch, Kevin) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Donya Entertainment, Inc.. (Mirch, Kevin) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: CCACDC-26977825 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Donya Entertainment, Inc., Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari. (Attorney Kevin John Mirch added to party Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin John Mirch added to party Donya Entertainment, Inc.(pty:pla))(Mirch, Kevin) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED BUSINESS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Cutting Concepts Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Slater's 50/50 Franchise, LLC is a litigant