This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2020 at 08:19:05 (UTC).

Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari et al v. Elias Nakhleh et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Elias Nakhleh. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Maria A. Audero and Percy Anderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-08367

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Noureen Entertainment, Inc.,

Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari

Noureen Entertainment, Inc.

Defendants

Elias Nakhleh

Elite Restaurant Group, Inc.,

Michael Nakhleh

Slater's 50/50 Franchise, LLC,

Does 1-10

Slaters 50/50 Franchise, LLC

Elite Restaurant Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin John Mirch

Attorney at Mirch Law Firm LLP

1180 Rosecrans Street No 104-552

San Diego, CA 92106

Marie C Mirch

Attorney at Mirch Law Firm LLP

1180 Rosecrans Street No 104-552

San Diego, CA 92106

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Elias Nakhleh. (mrgo) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#21

(#21) CORRECTED 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Michael Nakhleh. (mrgo) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#20

(#20) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Michael Nakhleh. (mrgo) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#19

(#19) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (iv) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#18

(#18) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-05734 PA(MAAx). Case transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson to Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-08367 PA(MAAx). Signed by Judge Percy Anderson (rn) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#17

(#17) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice (Other) #4 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Noureen Entertainment, Inc.. (Mirch, Kevin) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#16

(#16) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice (Other) #4 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Noureen Entertainment, Inc.. (Mirch, Kevin) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#15

(#15) 21-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Slater's 50/50 Franchise, LLC. (gk) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint #1 . The following error(s) was found: The name of the defendant on the face of the Complaint is Michael Nakhleh. On the summons, in the section, "To: (Defendant's name and address)," the defendant is shown as Michael Nahkleh. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (gk) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#9

(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice (Other) #4 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Noureen Entertainment, Inc.. (Mirch, Marie) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#8

(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice (Other) #4 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Noureen Entertainment, Inc.. (Mirch, Marie) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Noureen Entertainment, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:20-cv-05734-PA-MAA (Mirch, Marie) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#4

(#16) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice (Other) #4 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Noureen Entertainment, Inc.. (Mirch, Kevin) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Plaintiffs Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Noureen Entertainment, Inc., identifying NONE as Corporate Parent. (Mirch, Kevin) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Noureen Entertainment, Inc.,. (Mirch, Kevin) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#1

(#13) 21-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Elite Restaurant Group, Inc. (gk) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Elias Nakhleh. (mrgo) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CORRECTED 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Michael Nakhleh. (mrgo) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Michael Nakhleh. (mrgo) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (iv) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-05734 PA(MAAx). Case transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson to Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-08367 PA(MAAx). Signed by Judge Percy Anderson (rn) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice (Other) #4 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Noureen Entertainment, Inc.. (Mirch, Kevin) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice (Other) #4 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Noureen Entertainment, Inc.. (Mirch, Kevin) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) 21-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Slater's 50/50 Franchise, LLC. (gk) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint #1 . The following error(s) was found: The name of the defendant on the face of the Complaint is Michael Nakhleh. On the summons, in the section, "To: (Defendant's name and address)," the defendant is shown as Michael Nahkleh. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (gk) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) 21-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Elite Restaurant Group, Inc. (gk) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice (Other) #4 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Noureen Entertainment, Inc.. (Mirch, Marie) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice (Other) #4 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Noureen Entertainment, Inc.. (Mirch, Marie) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice (Other) #4 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Noureen Entertainment, Inc.. (Mirch, Marie) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Noureen Entertainment, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:20-cv-05734-PA-MAA (Mirch, Marie) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits to Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Noureen Entertainment, Inc.,. (Mirch, Marie) (Entered: 09/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Plaintiffs Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Noureen Entertainment, Inc., identifying NONE as Corporate Parent. (Mirch, Kevin) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Noureen Entertainment, Inc.,. (Mirch, Kevin) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28052907 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari, Noureen Entertainment, Inc.,. (Attorney Kevin John Mirch added to party Seyed Zia Eddin Ahmadi Abhari(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin John Mirch added to party Noureen Entertainment, Inc.,(pty:pla))(Mirch, Kevin) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Slater's 50/50 Franchise, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin J. Mirch