This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2020 at 09:13:46 (UTC).

Abernathy v. Commissioner of Correction et al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2020 Abernathy filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Commissioner of Correction. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Victor A. Bolden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00628

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Victor A. Bolden

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eddie Abernathy

Cheshire, CT 06410

Defendants

Warden

John Doe

Commissioner of Correction

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Envelope

#12

(#12) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Eddie Abernathy.Responses due by 7/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

#10

RESTRICTED

9 #1

Envelope

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eddie Abernathy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. For the reasons stated in the attached order, the #3 motion to appoint counsel is DENIED. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/8/2020. (Garcia, A.) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 05/6/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

#5

(#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 05/6/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 05/6/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

#3

(#3) PRISCS - MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Eddie Abernathy. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

#2

(#2) PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eddie Abernathy. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Correction, John Doe, Warden, filed by Eddie Abernathy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Eddie Abernathy.Responses due by 7/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 6/8/20. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Eddie Abernathy. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eddie Abernathy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis. You must submit the attached Prisoner's IFP application which is being sent to you via U.S.mail. Also, you must submit a ledger sheet showing the past six months transactions. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 6/1/2020 Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 5/11/20.(Payton, R.) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. For the reasons stated in the attached order, the #3 motion to appoint counsel is DENIED. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/8/2020. (Garcia, A.) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 05/6/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 05/6/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 05/6/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRISCS - MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Eddie Abernathy. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eddie Abernathy. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Correction, John Doe, Warden, filed by Eddie Abernathy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less