This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2020 at 10:35:22 (UTC).

Aberg v. VA Medical Center of Fayetteville NC

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 Aberg filed an Other lawsuit against VA Medical Center of Fayetteville NC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James C. Dever, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00502

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Dever, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniel A Aberg

Sanford, NC 27332

Defendant

VA Medical Center of Fayetteville NC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Neal Fowler

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office - EDNC

150 Fayetteville Street, Suite 2100

Raleigh, NC 27601

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. VA Medical Center of Fayetteville NC answer due 12/2/2020. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 11/4/2020. Sent to Daniel A Aberg at 30 East Landing Sanford, NC 27332 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#9

(#9) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by VA Medical Center of Fayetteville NC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

7 #1

Envelope

#7

(#7) Notice of Self-Representation filed by Daniel A Aberg (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. VA Medical Center of Fayetteville NC answer due 11/2/2020. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/1/2020. Copy sent via US Mail to Daniel A Aberg 30 East Landing, Sanford, NC 27332. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#5

(#5) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to file a Notice of Appearance and a Notice of Self Representation mailed via Daniel A. Aberg30 East Landing Sanford, NC 27332 mailed via US Mail on September 28, 20209 along with a blank notice of self representation and a blank financial disclosure statement. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#4

(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by VA Medical Center of Fayetteville NC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#3

(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by Neal Fowler on behalf of VA Medical Center of Fayetteville NC. (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice filed by VA Medical Center of Fayetteville NC regarding #1 Notice of Removal, (Omitted Attachment - Summons & Complaint - Cumberland County). (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

1 #3

Letter to the Clerk of Cumberland County

1 #2

Supplement Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by VA Medical Center of Fayetteville NC from District Court Division - Small Claims - Cumberland County, case number 20 CVM 3948., filed by VA Medical Center of Fayetteville NC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet, #3 Letter to the Clerk of Cumberland County) (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. VA Medical Center of Fayetteville NC answer due 12/2/2020. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 11/4/2020. Sent to Daniel A Aberg at 30 East Landing Sanford, NC 27332 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by VA Medical Center of Fayetteville NC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Daniel A Aberg. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Self-Representation filed by Daniel A Aberg (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. VA Medical Center of Fayetteville NC answer due 11/2/2020. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/1/2020. Copy sent via US Mail to Daniel A Aberg 30 East Landing, Sanford, NC 27332. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to file a Notice of Appearance and a Notice of Self Representation mailed via Daniel A. Aberg30 East Landing Sanford, NC 27332 mailed via US Mail on September 28, 20209 along with a blank notice of self representation and a blank financial disclosure statement. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by VA Medical Center of Fayetteville NC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by Neal Fowler on behalf of VA Medical Center of Fayetteville NC. (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice filed by VA Medical Center of Fayetteville NC regarding #1 Notice of Removal, (Omitted Attachment - Summons & Complaint - Cumberland County). (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by VA Medical Center of Fayetteville NC from District Court Division - Small Claims - Cumberland County, case number 20 CVM 3948., filed by VA Medical Center of Fayetteville NC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet, #3 Letter to the Clerk of Cumberland County) (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less