This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2019 at 05:10:57 (UTC).

Abedin et al v. Palominos Osorio et al

Case Summary

On 03/11/2019 Abedin filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Palominos Osorio. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian M. Cogan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01391

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian M. Cogan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nargish Begum

MD Miah

Zainul Abedin

N.N.

Defendants

Board of Education of the City School District of the City of New York

City of New York

Gamosse Transport, LLC

Roadtex Transportation Corp.

Mauricio E Palominos Osorio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anthony H. Gair

Attorney at Gair, Gair, Conason, Steigman & Mackauf

80 Pine Street, 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Defendant Attorney

Marie Anne Ladia

Attorney at Gallo Vitucci Klar LLP

100 Crossways Park West, Suite 305

Woodbury, NY 11797

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION Notice of Removal, Rule 7.1 Statement by Gamosse Transport, LLC, Mauricio E Palominos Osorio (Ladia, Marie) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gamosse Transport, LLC (Ladia, Marie) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 2nd Supplemental Bill of Particulars

1 #2

Exhibit Voluntary Stip of Disconinuance

1 #1

Exhibit Pleadings

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gamosse Transport, LLC, Mauricio E Palominos Osorio from Supreme Court Queens County, case number 700110/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Voluntary Stip of Disconinuance, #3 Exhibit 2nd Supplemental Bill of Particulars, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet) (Ladia, Marie) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #1 Notice of Removal. Defendants are ordered to show cause by 3/18/2019 why this case should not be remanded to state court because defendant Roadtex has not consented to removal, and all defendants must consent before an action may be removed to federal court. See Vargas v. Holden, No. 10 CIV. 8567 JGK, 2011 WL 446199, at *2 (S.D.N.Y. Feb. 8, 2011). Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/11/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION Notice of Removal, Rule 7.1 Statement by Gamosse Transport, LLC, Mauricio E Palominos Osorio (Ladia, Marie) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gamosse Transport, LLC (Ladia, Marie) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gamosse Transport, LLC, Mauricio E Palominos Osorio from Supreme Court Queens County, case number 700110/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Voluntary Stip of Disconinuance, #3 Exhibit 2nd Supplemental Bill of Particulars, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet) (Ladia, Marie) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROADTEX TRANSPORTATION CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where N.N. is a litigant