This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 08:35:59 (UTC).

ABEBE v. HEALTH AND HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF MARION COUNTY

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 ABEBE filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against HEALTH AND HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF MARION COUNTY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James R. Sweeney II and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00148

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James R. Sweeney II

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lily Abebe

Defendants

HEALTH AND HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF MARION COUNTY

HEALTH AND HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF MARION COUNTY doing business as ESKENAZI HEALTH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam Lenkowsky

Attorney at ROBERTS LITIGATION GROUP

118 North Delaware Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Defendant Attorneys

Amanda C. Couture

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Theresa Renee Parish

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, filed by HEALTH AND HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF MARION COUNTY.(Parish, Theresa) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/31/2020 10:00 AM in room #234, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/4/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant HEALTH AND HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF MARION COUNTY. (Parish, Theresa) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by HEALTH AND HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF MARION COUNTY. (Parish, Theresa) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda C. Couture on behalf of Defendant HEALTH AND HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF MARION COUNTY. (Couture, Amanda) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Theresa Renee Parish on behalf of Defendant HEALTH AND HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF MARION COUNTY. (Parish, Theresa) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#5

(#5) PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Lenkowsky on behalf of Plaintiff LILY ABEBE. (Lenkowsky, Adam) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#3

(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to HEALTH AND HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF MARION COUNTY. (REO) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

1 #4

Consent to Magistrate

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Appearance

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against HEALTH AND HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF MARION COUNTY, filed by Lily Abebe. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5810901) (Attachments: #1 Appearance, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Consent to Magistrate)(Lenkowsky, Adam) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, filed by HEALTH AND HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF MARION COUNTY.(Parish, Theresa) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/31/2020 10:00 AM in room #234, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/4/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant HEALTH AND HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF MARION COUNTY. (Parish, Theresa) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by HEALTH AND HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF MARION COUNTY. (Parish, Theresa) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda C. Couture on behalf of Defendant HEALTH AND HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF MARION COUNTY. (Couture, Amanda) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Theresa Renee Parish on behalf of Defendant HEALTH AND HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF MARION COUNTY. (Parish, Theresa) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Lenkowsky on behalf of Plaintiff LILY ABEBE. (Lenkowsky, Adam) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to HEALTH AND HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF MARION COUNTY. (REO) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against HEALTH AND HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF MARION COUNTY, filed by Lily Abebe. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5810901) (Attachments: #1 Appearance, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Consent to Magistrate)(Lenkowsky, Adam) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HEALTH AND HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF MARION COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam Lenkowsky