This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/05/2019 at 07:00:32 (UTC).

Abdullah v. Annie's Homegrown, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/06/2019 Abdullah filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Annie's Homegrown, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline Scott Corley and Jon S. Tigar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02441

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Jacqueline Scott Corley

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Saleha Abdullah

Defendants

Annie's Homegrown, Inc.

General Mills, Inc.

Annie's, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Reuben D. Nathan

Attorney at Nathan & Associates, APC

2901 W. Coast Highway, Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92663

Defendant Attorneys

Claudia Maria Vetesi

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-2482

Lucia X. Roibal

Attorney at Morrison Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Spencer McManus

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-2482

Tiffany Cheung

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

18 #1

Declaration of Claudia Vetesi

#18

#17

16 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of service

#16

#15

#14

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

2 #1

Summons

#2

#1

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Jon S. Tigar. Response to First Amended Complaint due by 8/9/2019. Opposition to Annie's Responsive Motion due by 9/20/2019.Annies reply in support of its motion due by 10/11/2019.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Summons on First Amended Complaint Issued as to Defendants Annie's Homegrown, Inc., Annie's, Inc. & General Mills, Inc.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint and Briefing Schedule filed by Annie's Homegrown, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Claudia Vetesi)(Vetesi, Claudia) (Filed on 6/24/2019) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Proposed Summons. (Nathan, Reuben) (Filed on 6/21/2019) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against Annie's Homegrown, Inc., Annie's, Inc. & General Mills, Inc.. Filed by Saleha Abdullah. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of service)(Nathan, Reuben) (Filed on 6/20/2019) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 8/7/2019 by 5:00PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by the Clerk on 6/13/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • (#13) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Annie's Homegrown, Inc... (Vetesi, Claudia) (Filed on 6/12/2019) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Annie's Homegrown, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent General Mills, Inc., Other Affiliate Annie's, Inc., Other Affiliate Annie's Homegrown, Inc. for Annie's Homegrown, Inc.. and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Vetesi, Claudia) (Filed on 6/12/2019) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Claudia Maria Vetesi for Defendant Annie's Homegrown, Inc. (Vetesi, Claudia) (Filed on 6/12/2019) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Sean McManus for Defendant Annie's Homegrown, Inc. (McManus, Spencer) (Filed on 6/12/2019) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Lucia X. Roibal for Defendant Annie's Homegrown, Inc. (Roibal, Lucia) (Filed on 6/12/2019) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany Cheung for Defendant Annie's Homegrown, Inc. (Cheung, Tiffany) (Filed on 6/12/2019) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Saleha Abdullah. Service waived by Annie's Homegrown, Inc. waiver sent on 5/9/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Nathan, Reuben) (Filed on 5/17/2019) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Saleha Abdullah.. (Nathan, Reuben) (Filed on 5/6/2019) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/20/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2019) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Civil Cover Sheet by Saleha Abdullah . (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Nathan, Reuben) (Filed on 5/6/2019) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Annie's Homegrown, Inc., (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13319667). Filed by Saleha Abdullah. (Nathan, Reuben) (Filed on 5/6/2019) Modified on 5/9/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANNIE'S, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ANNIE'S HHOMEGROWN, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GENERAL MILLS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reuben D. Nathan Esquire