Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/17/2020 at 12:03:01 (UTC).

Abdulaziz/Askew v. Payne et al

Case Summary

On 05/18/2020 Abdulaziz/Askew filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Payne. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Beth Deere and James M. Moody Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00529

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Beth Deere

Presiding Judge

James M. Moody Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mu'min Abdulaziz/Askew

Tucker, AR 72168-8713

Defendants

Dexter Payne

Wendy Kelley

Lindsey Fortson

Rodney Ford

Antonio Jackson

Jared Byers

M Cloird

Nate Smith

Pattie Conley

Asa Hutchinson

Dora Ann Blunt

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Robert Thomas James

Attorney at Arkansas Attorney General's Office

Catlett-Prien Tower Building, 323 Center Street, Suite 200

Little Rock, AR 72201-2610

 

Court Documents

#10

No Description Available

#24

(#24) MOTION for Reconsideration re #8 Order by Mu'min Abdulaziz/Askew. (ljb) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#21

(#21) ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare a new summons for Defendant Smith; and directing the Marshal to serve Defendant Smith with a summons and a copy of the #2 complaint and the #9 supplement to the complaint, with any attachments, without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/1/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#20

(#20) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Dora Ann Blunt served on 6/11/2020. (ajt) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#19

No Description Available

#17

No Description Available

#16

No Description Available

#15

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #11 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the linkage to #2 Complaint and #9 Supplement as marked on the document. (jak) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#9

NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #11 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the linkage to #2 Complaint and #9 Supplement as marked on the document. (jak) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#8

(#24) MOTION for Reconsideration re #8 Order by Mu'min Abdulaziz/Askew. (ljb) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#6

(#8) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #6 motion to certify this lawsuit as a class action, to order ADC officials to allow Plaintiff access to the law library, and for copies; directing the Clerk to provide Mr. Abdulaziz/Askew a copy of docket entry #2 , along with a copy of this Order; declining to certify this lawsuit as a class action; granting #7 motion for copies; directing the Clerk to file pages seven and nine of Plaintiff's complaint as a supplement to Mr. Abdulaziz/Askew's complaint; and directing the Clerk to provide Mr. Abdulaziz/Askew copies of those pages, along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/3/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

#5

(#5) PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that Mr. Abdulaziz/Askew's claims regarding the Defendants' failure to properly process his grievances be dismissed, without prejudice. Objections due within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 05/22/2020. (ajt) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summonses for the Defendants; directing the Marshal to serve the Defendants with summonses and copies of #2 complaint with any attachments, without prepayment of fees and costs or security; and directing the Clerk to terminate the duplicative listing of Defendant Kelley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 05/22/2020. (ajt) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#3

(#3) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the Maximum Security Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 5/20/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION #22 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to establish linkage to #9 Supplement to Complaint as marked on the document. (cmn) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER denying #24 Motion for Reconsideration re: #8 Order denying class certification and denying an Order requiring ADC officials to allow access to law library. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/2/2020. (csf) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION for Reconsideration re #8 Order by Mu'min Abdulaziz/Askew. (ljb) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Thomas James on behalf of Dora Ann Blunt, Jared Byers, M Cloird, Rodney Ford, Antonio Jackson, Wendy Kelley(Secretary, ADC), Dexter Payne (James, Robert) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand and Answer to #9 Supplement to Complaint by Dora Ann Blunt, Jared Byers, M Cloird, Rodney Ford, Antonio Jackson, Wendy Kelley(Secretary, ADC), Dexter Payne.(James, Robert) (Docket entry modified on 7/6/2020 to establish linkage.)(cmn) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketSummons Reissued as to Nate Smith and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (jbh) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare a new summons for Defendant Smith; and directing the Marshal to serve Defendant Smith with a summons and a copy of the #2 complaint and the #9 supplement to the complaint, with any attachments, without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/1/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #11 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the filing parties as indicated on the document and pursuant to instruction from chambers. (kbc) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #11 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the linkage to #2 Complaint and #9 Supplement as marked on the document. (jak) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Dora Ann Blunt served on 6/11/2020. (ajt) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUPPLEMENT to #2 Complaint by Mu'min Abdulaziz/Askew. (Docketed pursuant to #8 Order). (jbh) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #6 motion to certify this lawsuit as a class action, to order ADC officials to allow Plaintiff access to the law library, and for copies; directing the Clerk to provide Mr. Abdulaziz/Askew a copy of docket entry #2 , along with a copy of this Order; declining to certify this lawsuit as a class action; granting #7 motion for copies; directing the Clerk to file pages seven and nine of Plaintiff's complaint as a supplement to Mr. Abdulaziz/Askew's complaint; and directing the Clerk to provide Mr. Abdulaziz/Askew copies of those pages, along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/3/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Certify Class, for Order, and for Copies by Mu'min Abdulaziz/Askew. (ljb) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Copies and Request for Correction by Mu'min Abdulaziz/Askew. (llg) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to All Defendants and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (ljb) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that Mr. Abdulaziz/Askew's claims regarding the Defendants' failure to properly process his grievances be dismissed, without prejudice. Objections due within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 05/22/2020. (ajt) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summonses for the Defendants; directing the Marshal to serve the Defendants with summonses and copies of #2 complaint with any attachments, without prepayment of fees and costs or security; and directing the Clerk to terminate the duplicative listing of Defendant Kelley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 05/22/2020. (ajt) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the Maximum Security Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 5/20/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Mu'min Abdulaziz/Askew.(kdr) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mu'min Abdulaziz/Askew. (kdr) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Thomas James