This case was last updated from PACER on 04/08/2019 at 07:34:14 (UTC).

Abdul-Bey v. Parker

Case Summary

On 02/07/2019 Abdul-Bey filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Parker. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian S. Miller. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00101

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian S. Miller

 

Party Details

Appellant

Kwami Abdul-Bey

North Little Rock, AR 72116

Appellee

Maytrine L Parker

Orange, NJ 07050

 

Court Documents

1 #2

BK DE#5, Motion for Default Judgment

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by Kwami Abdul-Bey. Bankruptcy Court case number 4:18-ap-01101. (Attachments: #1 BK DE#1, Complaint, #2 BK DE#5, Motion for Default Judgment, #3 BK DE#8, Hearing Continued, #4 BK Docket Sheet, #5 Transmittal Letter)(cmn) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER dismissing Appellant Kwami Abdul-Bey's appeal and remanding to the bankruptcy court. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/19/2019. (jbh) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#8

(#8) JUDGMENT: Consistent with #7 Order, this case is remanded. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/19/2019. (jbh) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

1 #3

BK DE#8, Hearing Continued

#3

(#3) MOTION to Suspend to Extend Time by Kwami Abdul-Bey (jap) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak). (Entered: 03/06/2019)

1 #4

BK Docket Sheet

#2

(#2) SCHEDULING NOTICE (Bankruptcy Appeals). Appellant's brief is due 3/9/2019. Appellee's brief is due 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 2/7/2019.(cmn) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#6

(#6) Appellant's Opening BRIEF filed by Kwami Abdul-Bey. (fjg) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

3 #1

Main Document - Correct

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #3 MOTION to Extend Time. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office (wrong image format). The correct document was added to docket entry #3 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

1 #5

Transmittal Letter

1 #1

BK DE#1, Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) JUDGMENT: Consistent with #7 Order, this case is remanded. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/19/2019. (jbh) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER dismissing Appellant Kwami Abdul-Bey's appeal and remanding to the bankruptcy court. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/19/2019. (jbh) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Appellant's Opening BRIEF filed by Kwami Abdul-Bey. (fjg) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Extend Time. Petitioner is granted extension to 3/18/19 to file brief. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/11/19. (lp) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #3 MOTION to Extend Time. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office (wrong image format). The correct document was added to docket entry #3 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Suspend to Extend Time by Kwami Abdul-Bey (jap) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak). (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SCHEDULING NOTICE (Bankruptcy Appeals). Appellant's brief is due 3/9/2019. Appellee's brief is due 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 2/7/2019.(cmn) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by Kwami Abdul-Bey. Bankruptcy Court case number 4:18-ap-01101. (Attachments: #1 BK DE#1, Complaint, #2 BK DE#5, Motion for Default Judgment, #3 BK DE#8, Hearing Continued, #4 BK Docket Sheet, #5 Transmittal Letter)(cmn) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.