This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/01/2022 at 07:40:29 (UTC).

ABDO v. COOK INCORPORATED et al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 ABDO filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against COOK INCORPORATED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06649

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELSHADAY ABDO

Defendants

COOK INCORPORATED

COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED

COOK GROUP INCORPORATED

COOK MEDICAL LLC

WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ben C. Martin

Attorney at MARTIN BAUGHMAN, PLLC

3141 Hood Streetsuite 600

Dallas, TX 75219

Paul L. Stoller

Attorney at DALIMONTE RUEB STOLLER, LLP

2425 East Camelback Roadsuite 500

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Defendant Attorneys

Andrea Roberts Pierson

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Streetsuite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Kip S.M. McDonald

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Streetsuite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul L. Stoller on behalf of MDL Plaintiff ELSHADAY ABDO. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06649-RLY-TAB (Stoller, Paul) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#11

(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ELSHADAY ABDO.Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06649-RLY-TAB(Stoller, Paul) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#16

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MED INSTITUTE INCORPORATED, MED INSTITUTE INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, MEDICAL ENGINEERING AND DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, COOK DENMARK INTERNATIONAL APS, COOK DENMARK HOLDING APS, COOK GROUP EUROPE APS, COOK NEDERLAND BV, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06519-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06633-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06643-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06644-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06646-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06647-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06648-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06649-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06650-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06651-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06659-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06660-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06661-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06662-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06663-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06664-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06665-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06666-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06675-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#15

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MED INSTITUTE INCORPORATED, MED INSTITUTE INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, MEDICAL ENGINEERING AND DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, COOK DENMARK INTERNATIONAL APS, COOK DENMARK HOLDING APS, COOK GROUP EUROPE APS, COOK NEDERLAND BV, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06519-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06633-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06643-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06644-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06646-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06647-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06648-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06649-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06650-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06651-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06659-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06660-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06661-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06662-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06663-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06664-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06665-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06666-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06675-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#9

(#9) Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 11/2/2021.(LBT) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#8

(#8) Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:21-cv-03158. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#7

(#7) JPML CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-170) transferring case to Southern District of Indiana to be included in MDL Docket No. 2570. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/2/2021.] (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Elshaday Abdo, filed.(Martin, Ben) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/2/2021.] (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/2/2021.] (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/10/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(RachelWillborgadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/2/2021.] (Entered: 09/29/2021)

3 #3

Proposed Summons

3 #2

Proposed Summons

3 #1

Proposed Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(BrandisIsom, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/2/2021.] (Entered: 09/29/2021)

2 #3

Proposed Summons

2 #2

Proposed Summons

2 #1

Proposed Summons

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Elshaday Abdo, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Martin, Ben) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/2/2021.] (Entered: 09/28/2021)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MED INSTITUTE INCORPORATED, MED INSTITUTE INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, MEDICAL ENGINEERING AND DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, COOK DENMARK INTERNATIONAL APS, COOK DENMARK HOLDING APS, COOK GROUP EUROPE APS, COOK NEDERLAND BV, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06519-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06633-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06643-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06644-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06646-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06647-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06648-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06649-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06650-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06651-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06659-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06660-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06661-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06662-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06663-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06664-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06665-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06666-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06675-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MED INSTITUTE INCORPORATED, MED INSTITUTE INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, MEDICAL ENGINEERING AND DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, COOK DENMARK INTERNATIONAL APS, COOK DENMARK HOLDING APS, COOK GROUP EUROPE APS, COOK NEDERLAND BV, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06519-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06633-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06643-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06644-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06646-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06647-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06648-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06649-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06650-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06651-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06659-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06660-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06661-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06662-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06663-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06664-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06665-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06666-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06675-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul L. Stoller on behalf of MDL Plaintiff ELSHADAY ABDO. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06649-RLY-TAB (Stoller, Paul) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ELSHADAY ABDO.Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06649-RLY-TAB(Stoller, Paul) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • Docket(#10) Remark - Case Transferred In from Southern District of Ohio, Cause No. 1:21-cv-635 on 10/26/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6648-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Southern District of Texas, Cause No. 4:21-cv-3158 on 11/2/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6649-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Western District of Washington, Cause No. 3:21-cv-5695 on 10/26/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6650-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Southern District of West Virginia, Cause No. 3:21-cv-526 on 10/26/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6651-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06648-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06649-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06650-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06651-RLY-TAB(LBT) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 11/2/2021.(LBT) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:21-cv-03158. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketInterdistrict transfer to Southern District of Indiana. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/2/2021.] (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JPML CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-170) transferring case to Southern District of Indiana to be included in MDL Docket No. 2570. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/2/2021.] (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Elshaday Abdo, filed.(Martin, Ben) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/2/2021.] (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/2/2021.] (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/10/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(RachelWillborgadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/2/2021.] (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(BrandisIsom, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/2/2021.] (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Elshaday Abdo, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Martin, Ben) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/2/2021.] (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27115597) filed by Elshaday Abdo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Ben) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/2/2021.] (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COOK GROUP INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where COOK MEDICAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS is a litigant