This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/16/2021 at 11:18:28 (UTC).

Abdellatif et al v. Merchants' Credit Guide Company

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 Abdellatif filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Merchants' Credit Guide Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jorge L. Alonso. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03245

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jorge L. Alonso

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rabha R. Abdellatif

Theresa McCambridge

Laura A. Enriquez

Defendant

Merchants' Credit Guide Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Scott Davidson

Attorney at Law Offices of Joseph P. Doyle, LLC

105 South Roselle Road, Suite 203

Schaumburg, IL 60193

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: A notice of voluntary dismissal has been filed. This case is dismissed with prejudice. Civil case terminated. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Rabha R. Abdellatif, Laura A. Enriquez, Theresa McCambridge (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rabha R. Abdellatif, Theresa McCambridge, Laura A. Enriquez as to Merchants' Credit Guide Company on 6/25/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

5 #3

Exhibit

5 #2

Exhibit

5 #1

Exhibit

#5

(#5) First AMENDED complaint by Rabha R. Abdellatif, Theresa McCambridge, Laura A. Enriquez against Merchants' Credit Guide Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Theresa McCambridge by Joseph Scott Davidson (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Laura A. Enriquez by Joseph Scott Davidson (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rabha R. Abdellatif by Joseph Scott Davidson (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Rabha R. Abdellatif, Theresa McCambridge, Laura A. Enriquez; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18363604. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: A notice of voluntary dismissal has been filed. This case is dismissed with prejudice. Civil case terminated. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Rabha R. Abdellatif, Laura A. Enriquez, Theresa McCambridge (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Rabha R. Abdellatif, Laura A. Enriquez, Theresa McCambridge (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rabha R. Abdellatif, Theresa McCambridge, Laura A. Enriquez as to Merchants' Credit Guide Company on 6/25/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Merchants' Credit Guide Company (cm, ) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First AMENDED complaint by Rabha R. Abdellatif, Theresa McCambridge, Laura A. Enriquez against Merchants' Credit Guide Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, ) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Theresa McCambridge by Joseph Scott Davidson (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Laura A. Enriquez by Joseph Scott Davidson (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rabha R. Abdellatif by Joseph Scott Davidson (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Rabha R. Abdellatif, Theresa McCambridge, Laura A. Enriquez; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18363604. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Merchants Credit Guide Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Scott Davidson