This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/01/2022 at 09:26:41 (UTC).

ABC v. XYZ

Case Summary

On 06/20/2022 ABC filed an Other lawsuit against XYZ. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L. Carter, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-MC-00168

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew L. Carter, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABC

Defendant

XYZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin M Wallace

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP (NYC)

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) MISCELLANEOUS COVER SHEET filed..(Wallace, Kevin) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ***SELECTED PARTIES*** ORDER TO FILE CIVIL CASE UNDER SEAL granting #1 Motion for Leave to File Case Under Seal. Cases sought to be filed under seal for which permission is granted must not be initiated electronically and must be submitted in the traditional manner, on paper. Please see Section 14.2 of the ECF Rules and Instructions. #ECF RULES & INSTRUCTIONS. Plaintiffs Burberry Limited; Gianni Versace, S.r.l.; Herms International; and Louis Vuitton Malletier, having moved to file a new civil case under seal in the traditional manner, in paper form, and the Court having reviewed the application and having found sufficient cause under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(d) to order this case to be filed under seal, it is hereby ORDERED as follows that: This case may be filed under seal (the "Sealed Case"). The parties are directed to proceed in accordance with the instructions for filing under seal found in the court's ECF Rules & Instructions, Rule 6.14, and present the case initiating documents to the Clerk of Court in the traditional manner, in paper form. The Clerk of this Court is directed, pending the hearing of Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction and subject to modification by the judge to whom the case is assigned, to keep and maintain under seal all papers filed in the Sealed Case, and that public scrutiny of such papers shall not be permitted, subject to defendants' rights to access such papers upon presenting the Clerk of this Court with proper identification. The Clerk is directed to restrict access to this order to the selected party viewing level and close this case. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 6/22/2022) (ate) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing. (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CASE UNDER SEAL. Document No. #1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Leave to File Case Under Seal . was reviewed and approved as to form. (vba) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketMISCELLANEOUS CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. This is a Part I Term Assignment matter. (vba) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MISCELLANEOUS COVER SHEET filed..(Wallace, Kevin) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ***EX-PARTE*** MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Leave to File Case Under Seal .Document filed by ABC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Miscellaneous Case Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Kevin M. Wallace, #3 Exhibit Complaint, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wallace, Kevin) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-10 is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin M Wallace