This case was last updated from PACER on 01/10/2020 at 07:45:37 (UTC).

ABC Services Group, Inc. v. Amerihealth Insurance Company of New Jersey

Case Summary

On 11/11/2019 ABC Services Group, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Amerihealth Insurance Company of New Jersey. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas F. McCormick and David O. Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-02180

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Douglas F. McCormick

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABC Services Group, Inc.

Defendants

Amerihealth Insurance Company of New Jersey

Does 1 through 20, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Craig B Garner

Attorney at Garner Health Law Corporation

13274 Fiji Way Suite 250

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

Rochelle J Bioteau

Attorney at Squires Sherman and Bioteau LLP

1901 First Avenue Suite 415

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Amerihealth Insurance Company of New Jersey. (lh) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Garner, Craig) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

#9

(#9) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit

#3

(#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc., identifying ABC Services Group, Inc. and Morningside Recovery, LLC. (Garner, Craig) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

#11

(#11) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. All future filings shall be filed only under the low number case, SA CV 19-0243- DOC (DFMx). Cases associated with Lead Case SACV19-243 DOC(DFMx), Made JS-6. Case Terminated. (twdb) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24761313 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Attorney Craig B Garner added to party ABC Services Group, Inc.(pty:pla))(Garner, Craig) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Garner, Craig) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-00243 DOC(DFMx). Case transferred from Judge James V. Selna to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-02180 DOC(DFMx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (rn) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-00243-DOC-DFM and 8:19-cv-01342-DOC-DFM (Garner, Craig) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. All future filings shall be filed only under the low number case, SA CV 19-0243- DOC (DFMx). Cases associated with Lead Case SACV19-243 DOC(DFMx), Made JS-6. Case Terminated. (twdb) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-00243 DOC(DFMx). Case transferred from Judge James V. Selna to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-02180 DOC(DFMx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (rn) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Amerihealth Insurance Company of New Jersey. (lh) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-00243-DOC-DFM and 8:19-cv-01342-DOC-DFM (Garner, Craig) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Garner, Craig) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc., identifying ABC Services Group, Inc. and Morningside Recovery, LLC. (Garner, Craig) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Garner, Craig) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24761313 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Attorney Craig B Garner added to party ABC Services Group, Inc.(pty:pla))(Garner, Craig) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.