This case was last updated from PACER on 07/27/2020 at 07:31:58 (UTC).

ABC Corporation v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 05/28/2020 ABC Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joan H. Lefkow and Matthew F. Kennelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03151

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Joan H. Lefkow

Matthew F. Kennelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABC Corporation

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

turbosii

wellhf

91running

Shop4690057 Store

Shop5599239 Store

wcy2019

perfect1998

motor-dramas

fgvbsxjtyj

Girl to Queens Store

Car decoration accessories Store

t-autoparts

SOFTBATFY Official Store

Shop5244273 Store

TINMASTER Store

lv liang shi li shi qu rui feng wu jin dian

auto-future2016

PLITI

144 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

RiKaleigh C. Johnson

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Martin Francis Trainor

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#46

(#46) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by H-D U.S.A., LLC as to certain defendants (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#45

(#45) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by H-D U.S.A., LLC as to certain defendants (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#44

(#44) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by H-D U.S.A., LLC as to certain defendant (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#43

(#43) ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#42

(#42) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/25/2020: Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction is granted. The hearing date of 6/29/2020 is vacated. The case is set for a telephonic status hearing on 8/24/2020 at 9:40 AM using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Counsel should wait for the case to be called before announcing themselves. Plaintiff is directed to file a status report on 8/14/2020. (mk) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

41 #1

Declaration of Martin F. Trainor

#41

(#41) SUMMONS Returned Executed by H-D U.S.A., LLC as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 6/24/2020, answer due 7/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin F. Trainor)(Trainor, Martin) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

#40

(#40) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #38 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/29/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

#38

(#38) MOTION by Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ABC Corporation by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#4

(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #3

Exhibit 4

1 #2

Exhibit 3

1 #1

Exhibit 2

#1

(#3) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff ABC Corporation Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER: Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (rc, ) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by H-D U.S.A., LLC as to certain defendants (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by H-D U.S.A., LLC as to certain defendants (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by H-D U.S.A., LLC as to certain defendant (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: benyue Official Store, BestUs Store, Car Tuning Store, Denim Meow Official Store, Girl to Queens Store, PartsMart Store, Shop4681132 Store, Shop5738194 Store, SUP-LIGHT Official Store, TINMASTER Store, YF Factory Store, 4 High Quality Design 2 Store, 4 High Quality Design Store, ANNA car stickers Store, Car decoration accessories Store, Comfortable lifestyle Store, Dayyyum Store, FDLK Store, FORUDESIGNS Outdoor Fun Lifestyle Store, GDD Store, i & FDLK Store, KATELUO Factory Store, Kreatives Leben Store, Lcuinavtaoin Store, margins Store, Outdoor Tin Sign Store, Pan Gu ring Store, Party Supplies Direct Store, Porvitt Trend Store, QZ Trend Store, Retro theme store, ShiningTee Store, Shop4690057 Store, Shop5244273 Store, Shop5260169 Store, Shop5374130 Store, Shop5489043 Store, Shop5584416 Store, Shop5599239 Store, Shop5735288 Store, Shop5778525 Store, Shop5792870 Store, Simsant Official Store, Sleeping month Store, SOFTBATFY Official Store, WholesaleCover Store, WONZOM Official Store, Wubin Store, xiyou 9 Store, YILUGAOGE Store, Bang Yisu, BAPQW, Diamond king co, dkjfh, fgvbsxjtyj, HUIDI NET, JIANGTAOSHOPUS, Lilsis, LinFenJingJiKaiFaQuShangYaDingZhiFuZhuangDian, lv liang shi li shi qu rui feng wu jin dian, PengFeng Lv123us, PLITI, Puppey, sdgfdgjm, ShiQiao Spl, TIANBA, Vendun, wcy2019, WondrousFind, xiao kai bai huo shang hang, Yi-pinhu, yonghuus, YPSMJK, 2014-bicycle, 485moto, 91running, aizoma, auto-future2016, automotive-headlight-us, bboxwill, beyungshu2018, bijiaauto1, blackma17, bolonimotorcycle, cadiamotorcycle, carry-80, cavaliershield, cn-motor, commandomoto, dongvquan, elec-tool, eoug6007, episo-motor, factorysale168, fangzhenauto, g-ison, gkadlltool2018, hungtool2018, imnbw, jacktool-au2018, jazzboxes2011, jianlight68, jiesiqi2014, jkparts_88, jspauto, jyglosstopped2012, lackingone, led-blaze, ledlighting89, luck-stores, magic-tools2014, mofomotorcycle, motoacc-mart, motopart-mall, motor-dramas, motor-riding, mr.carkit, nicexhf, okaymotopart, oumurs-motor, papandavillage, perfect1998, romano-cycle, shengfire, syon-18, tangtools2018, t-autoparts, todparker, top.4u, topqualitycarparts, turbosii, u-kars, unvo5542, vastfire-seller, wellhf, xdfstorees13, x-fromerusa, yopmrslilai2013, yuus644, zhangyunyunbai, zhaohaoting, zouyaxin, ayu0811, Bring you good luck, Grocerystore123, hgjskxiangtao1852, huangxianhui66058, kkstore114, Lduizhang, lmzzz, LYN ONE, NLL655, shiming shop, Sunrise8837, weilunshengmao, Xiaopingmilk, YANGZHIQUANF, growsim.com and PATCH CAFE' **Free Shipping** added to case caption. (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/25/2020: Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction is granted. The hearing date of 6/29/2020 is vacated. The case is set for a telephonic status hearing on 8/24/2020 at 9:40 AM using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Counsel should wait for the case to be called before announcing themselves. Plaintiff is directed to file a status report on 8/14/2020. (mk) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) SUMMONS Returned Executed by H-D U.S.A., LLC as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 6/24/2020, answer due 7/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin F. Trainor)(Trainor, Martin) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #38 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/29/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MEMORANDUM by H-D U.S.A., LLC in support of motion for preliminary injunction #38 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MOTION by Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION by Plaintiff ABC Corporation for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ABC Corporation by Martin Francis Trainor (Trainor, Martin) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ABC Corporation by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ABC Corporation by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ABC Corporation by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff ABC Corporation Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff ABC Corporation Exhibit 1 regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by ABC Corporation; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17061003. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (rc, ) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin Francis Trainor

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RiKaleigh C. Johnson