This case was last updated from PACER on 01/30/2021 at 08:13:05 (UTC).

ABC Corporation I et al v. The Partnership and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 ABC Corporation I filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against The Partnership and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven C. Seeger and Thomas M. Durkin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04806

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Steven C. Seeger

Thomas M. Durkin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ABC Corporation I

ABC Corporation II

Defendants

The Partnership and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

GYROOR US

TOMOLOO-US

TOMOLOO Franchise

Tomoloo DX

Tomoloo INT

EVERCROSS

XPRITINC

Tomoloo TC

TOMOLOO INE

Tomoloo Flagship

Tomoloo Official

3Rd Party Plaintiff

eBay, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam Glenn Kelly

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb LLP

321 North Clark Street, Suite 2300

Chicago, IL 60610

Arthur Tan-chi Yuan

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb Llp

321 N Clark Street, Suite 2300

Chicago, IL 60654

Douglas N. Masters

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb LLP

321 N. Clark Street, Suite 2300

Chicago, IL 60654

Christopher Gerald Binns

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb LLP

345 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10154

Neil Gerard Nandi

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb LLP

Defendant Attorneys

Shen Wang

Attorney at Arch & Lake Llp

203 N Lasalle Street, Suite 2100

Chicago, IL 60601

Diego Fernando Freire

Attorney at Arch & Lake Llp

203 N. Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60601

Stephen Z. Vegh

Attorney at Vegh IP Legal

1240 Rosecrans Ave., Suite 120

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Danielle Sylvia McKinley

Attorney at RM Partners Law LLC

305 N. Peoria Street, Suite 200

Chicago, IL 60607

3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard A. Cederoth

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP (Chicago)

One South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Paul Rogerson

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

1 S Dearborn St.

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

#167

#166

165 #2

Declaration Declaration of Rongqing

165 #1

Declaration Declaration of Vegh

#165

#164

#163

#162

#161

#160

#158

155 #7

Exhibit C - Declaration of Yijun Lui

155 #6

Ex. 3 - Unpublished Decisions

155 #5

Ex. 2 - Requests for Admission

155 #4

Ex. 1 - Expedited Discovery Requests

155 #3

Exhibit B - Declaration of Christopher Binns

155 #2

Exhibit A - Defaulting Defendants List

155 #1

Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Default an

181 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#167) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The motion hearing scheduled for 1/22/2021 is vacated. Pursuant to the stipulation #166 , the motion for default and default judgment #155 is withdrawn without prejudice. Defendant Tomoloo is to file their motion to dismiss or responsive pleading by 2/10/2021. Plaintiffs are to file their response to Defendant Gyroor's pending motion to dismiss #165 and any motion to dismiss filed by Defendant Tomoloo by 3/3/2021. Defendants Gyroor and Tomoloo will file their replies to Plaintiffs' response by 3/10/2021. A telephone status hearing is set for 4/12/2021 at 9:00 a.m. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#166) STIPULATION regarding motion to dismiss #165 , motion for default judgment,, #155 - withdrawing Plaintiffs' Motion for Default without prejudice, and setting briefing schedule on Defendant Tomoloo's anticipated Motion to Dismiss and Defedant Gyroor's pending Motion to Dismiss (Binns, Christopher) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#165) MOTION by Defendant GYROOR US to dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint with Prejudice (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Vegh, #2 Declaration Declaration of Rongqing)(McKinley, Danielle) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#164) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tomoloo INT by Danielle Sylvia McKinley (McKinley, Danielle) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#163) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tomoloo DX by Danielle Sylvia McKinley (McKinley, Danielle) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#162) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tomoloo TC by Danielle Sylvia McKinley (McKinley, Danielle) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#161) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tomoloo Flagship by Danielle Sylvia McKinley (McKinley, Danielle) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#160) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant TOMOLOO-US by Danielle Sylvia McKinley (McKinley, Danielle) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • Docket(#159) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant TOMOLOO Franchise by Danielle Sylvia McKinley (McKinley, Danielle) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#158) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant TOMOLOO INE by Danielle Sylvia McKinley (McKinley, Danielle) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
149 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MAILED SEALED Patent Report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (sxb, ) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, ) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs ABC Corporation I, ABC Corporation II by Arthur Tan-chi Yuan (Yuan, Arthur) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs ABC Corporation I, ABC Corporation II by Douglas N. Masters (Masters, Douglas) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs ABC Corporation I, ABC Corporation II by Adam Glenn Kelly (Kelly, Adam) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kelly, Adam) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs ABC Corporation I, ABC Corporation II Schedule "A" regarding complaint #1 (Kelly, Adam) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs ABC Corporation I, ABC Corporation II Exhibit 2 regarding complaint #1 (Kelly, Adam) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs ABC Corporation I, ABC Corporation II Exhibit 1-1 regarding complaint #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2, #2 Exhibit 1-3, #3 Exhibit 1-4, #4 Exhibit 1-5, #5 Exhibit 1-6, #6 Exhibit 1-7, #7 Exhibit 1-8, #8 Exhibit 1-9, #9 Exhibit 1-10)(Kelly, Adam) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by ABC Corporation I, ABC Corporation II; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17333419. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4)(Kelly, Adam) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GYROOR is a litigant

Latest cases where EBAY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 is a litigant