This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/02/2020 at 07:23:02 (UTC).

ABC Corporation et al v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 ABC Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edmond E. Chang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03286

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmond E. Chang

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GHI Corporation

ABC Corporation

DEF Corporation

Sugartown Worldwide LLC

Defendant

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

RiKaleigh C. Johnson

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Abby Marie Neu

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 S Wacker, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#45

(#45) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 07/27/2020. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#44

(#44) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #39 is granted, in light of the same circumstances that justified the TRO's issuance. Given the answer deadline of 08/14/2020, the status hearing of 07/31/2020 is reset to 08/28/2020 at 8:30 a.m., but to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, if the answer is not filed by 08/14/2020, then Defendants shall be deemed in default, and the Plaintiff shall file the motion for default judgment in a sum certain by 08/21/2020. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#43

(#43) STATUS Report by Sugartown Worldwide LLC (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

42 #1

Declaration of RiKaleigh C. Johnson

#42

(#42) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sugartown Worldwide LLC as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 7/24/2020, answer due 8/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of RiKaleigh C. Johnson)(Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#41

(#41) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #39 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 7/31/2020 at 08:30 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

40 #2

Exhibit 1

40 #1

Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio

#39

(#39) MOTION by Plaintiff Sugartown Worldwide LLC for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #3

Exhibit 8

1 #2

Exhibit 7

1 #1

Exhibit 6

#1

(#7) SCHEDULE A by Plaintiffs ABC Corporation, DEF Corporation, GHI Corporation Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 7/28/2020 (bg, ). (Entered: 06/03/2020)

#14

(#14) ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice (ec, ) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 07/27/2020. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #39 is granted, in light of the same circumstances that justified the TRO's issuance. Given the answer deadline of 08/14/2020, the status hearing of 07/31/2020 is reset to 08/28/2020 at 8:30 a.m., but to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, if the answer is not filed by 08/14/2020, then Defendants shall be deemed in default, and the Plaintiff shall file the motion for default judgment in a sum certain by 08/21/2020. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) STATUS Report by Sugartown Worldwide LLC (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sugartown Worldwide LLC as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 7/24/2020, answer due 8/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of RiKaleigh C. Johnson)(Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" (cp, ) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #39 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 7/31/2020 at 08:30 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MEMORANDUM by Sugartown Worldwide LLC in support of motion for preliminary injunction #39 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MOTION by Plaintiff Sugartown Worldwide LLC for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sugartown Worldwide LLC by Abby Marie Neu (Neu, Abby) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sugartown Worldwide LLC by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs ABC Corporation, DEF Corporation, GHI Corporation by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULE A by Plaintiffs ABC Corporation, DEF Corporation, GHI Corporation Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 7/28/2020 (bg, ). (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs ABC Corporation, DEF Corporation, GHI Corporation Exhibit 5 regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 7/28/2020 (bg, ). (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs ABC Corporation, DEF Corporation, GHI Corporation Exhibit 4 regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 7/28/2020 (bg, ). (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs ABC Corporation, DEF Corporation, GHI Corporation Exhibit 3 regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 7/28/2020 (bg, ). (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs ABC Corporation, DEF Corporation, GHI Corporation Exhibit 2 regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 7/28/2020 (bg, ). (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs ABC Corporation, DEF Corporation, GHI Corporation Exhibit 1 regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 7/28/2020 (bg, ). (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by ABC Corporation, GHI Corporation, DEF Corporation; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17078100. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 8)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice (ec, ) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sugartown Worldwide LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GHI CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where DEF CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant