This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/29/2021 at 09:08:06 (UTC).

ABBS et al v. GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 ABBS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is CLAY D LAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00052

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CLAY D LAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE LINDA R ABBS REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST

MARK BELLAMY

LINDA ABBS

Defendants

GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC

GRP FRANKLIN LLC DBA GRP FRANKLIN I LLC

VEOLIA ENERGY OPERATING SERVICES LLC

JOHN DOE CORPORATION 1-20

GRP FRANKLIN LLC doing business as GRP FRANKLIN I LLC

JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MICHAEL D MCRAE

111 Bridgepoint Plaza, Ste 300

Rome, GA 30161

JOHN NIEDRACH

111 Bridgepoint Plaza Ste 300

Rome, GA 30161

VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN

111 Bridgepoint Plaza, Ste 300

Rome, GA 30161

LINTON STEPHENS JOHNSON, III

111 Bridgepoint Plaza, Ste 300

Rome, GA 30161

JASON B SANKER

111 Bridgepoint Plaza, Ste 300

Rome, GA 30161

Defendant Attorneys

M. Anne Kaufold-Wiggins

30 Ivan Allen Jr. Blvd. Nw, Suite 700

Atlanta, GA 30308-3036

WHITNEY JACOBS DELLA TORRE

801 Broad St Ste 800

Augusta, GA 30901

EDWIN SCHWARTZ

Attorney at SWEETNAM & SCHWARTZ LLC

1200 Ashwood Parkway Ste 190

Atlanta, GA 30338

BRITTANY TEMPLE

30 Ivan Allen Jr Blvd Nw Ste 700

Atlanta, GA 30308

HUGH BROWN MCNATT - DECEASED

602 Church St

Vidalia, GA 30474

M ANNE KAUFOLD-WIGGINS

30 Ivan Allen Jr Blvd Nw Ste 700

Atlanta, GA 30308-3036

HUGH PETERSON, III

602 Church St

Vidalia, GA 30474

JOSEPH ALEXANDER PRESCOTT

3344 Peachtree Rd Ne Ste 2400

Atlanta, GA 30326

STEPHEN J RAPP

Attorney at STE 2400

3344 Peachtree Rd Ne

Atlanta, GA 30326

DAVID A DIAL

3344 Peachtree Rd., Ne, Suite 2400

Atlanta, GA 30326-1382

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - Pleadings

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #3

Exhibit C - Consent to Removal

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#10

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASE If the parties seek to have the actions severed for trial, the parties shall be permitted to file a motion to sever at the appropriate time. The Clerk shall consolidate all of these cases, and the master case number going forward shall be the case number assigned to the case that was first filed. Lead Case # 3:21cv42. Member Case #s 3:21cv43, 3:21cv44, 3:21cv45, 3:21cv46, 3:21cv47, 3:21cv48, 3:21cv49, 3:21cv50, 3:21cv51, 3:21cv52, 3:21cv53, 3:21cv54, 3:21cv55, 3:21cv56, 3:21cv57, 3:21cv58,3:21cv59, 3:21cv60, 3:21cv61, 3:21cv62, 3:21cv63, 3:21cv64, and 3:21cv65. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 5/24/2021. (ggs) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC, GRP FRANKLIN LLC (KAUFOLD-WIGGINS, M) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by VEOLIA ENERGY OPERATING SERVICES LLC identifying Other Affiliate VEOLIA ENERGY NORTH AMERICA HOLDINGS INC for VEOLIA ENERGY OPERATING SERVICES LLC. (Rapp, Stephen) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISREGARD - REFILED CORRECTLY AT TAB 8 - Corporate Disclosure Statement by VEOLIA ENERGY OPERATING SERVICES LLC (Rapp, Stephen) Modified on 5/5/2021 (ggs). (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by VEOLIA ENERGY OPERATING SERVICES LLC ); Document must be re-filed to add corporate parents, subsidiary corporations (i.e. "other affiliates") and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock to the case. This is accomplished during the filing process by responding "Y" to the question inquiring if there are any corporate parents or other affiliates. You will then be prompted to enter the name of the corporate parent or other entity and then select from the drop down box either "corporate parent" or "other affiliate."(ggs) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Jurisdictional Statement by VEOLIA ENERGY OPERATING SERVICES LLC (Rapp, Stephen) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by VEOLIA ENERGY OPERATING SERVICES LLC (Rapp, Stephen) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 5/3/2021. (ggs) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by GRP FRANKLIN LLC, GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC ); TO: VEOLIA ENERGY OPERATING SERVICES LLC Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Additionally, pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. Please file the required corporate disclosures and jurisdictional statement immediately. Please note these are separate documents and are to be filed separately using the applicable events.(ggs) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL MICHAEL D MCRAE, VIRGINIA BARROW HARMAN, LINTON S JOHNSON, JASON B SANKER - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled.(ggs) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCase REASSIGNED to US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND. US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL no longer assigned to the case. (ans) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Jurisdictional Statement by GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC, GRP FRANKLIN LLC DBA GRP FRANKLIN I LLC (Kaufold-Wiggins, M.) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC, GRP FRANKLIN LLC DBA GRP FRANKLIN I LLC (Kaufold-Wiggins, M.) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL against LINDA ABBS, MARK BELLAMY, THE LINDA R ABBS REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3783511, $402 filed by GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC, GRP FRANKLIN LLC DBA GRP FRANKLIN I LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C - Consent to Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaufold-Wiggins, M.) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRP FRANKLIN LLC doing business as GRP FRANKLIN I LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GRP Franklin, LLC is a litigant