This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/21/2020 at 09:42:03 (UTC).

Abbott v. Capital One Services LLC

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 Abbott filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Capital One Services LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam R Cummings. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-02924

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam R Cummings

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Essence Abbott

Defendants

Capital One Services, LLC

Capital One Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

W D Masterson, III

Attorney at Kilgore & Kilgore PLLC

3109 Carlisle, Suite 200

Dallas, TX 75204

Defendant Attorneys

Laura Elizabeth Grubb

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC

8117 Preston Road, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75225

Robyn M Funk

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC

8117 Preston Road, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75225

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Capital One Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent/other Affiliate Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One Services. (Funk, Robyn) Modified Parent Corporation on 11/3/2020 (hml). (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Capital One Services LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Funk, Robyn) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Capital One Services LLC answer due 11/2/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 10/19/2020) (jmg) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Capital One Services LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Laura Elizabeth Grubb added to party Capital One Services LLC(pty:dft) (Grubb, Laura) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Capital One Services LLC; served on 9/28/2020. (mjr) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Capital One Services LLC ; served on 9/28/2020. (Masterson, W) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Capital One Services LLC. (ndt) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Essence Abbott. (Masterson, W) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

1 #2

Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Capital One Services, LLC filed by Essence Abbott. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11197382) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Cover Sheet) (Masterson, W) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Capital One Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent/other Affiliate Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One Services. (Funk, Robyn) Modified Parent Corporation on 11/3/2020 (hml). (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Capital One Services LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Funk, Robyn) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Capital One Services LLC answer due 11/2/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 10/19/2020) (jmg) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Capital One Services LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Laura Elizabeth Grubb added to party Capital One Services LLC(pty:dft) (Grubb, Laura) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Capital One Services LLC; served on 9/28/2020. (mjr) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Capital One Services LLC ; served on 9/28/2020. (Masterson, W) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Capital One Services LLC. (ndt) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Essence Abbott. (Masterson, W) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Capital One Services, LLC filed by Essence Abbott. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11197382) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Cover Sheet) (Masterson, W) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura Elizabeth Grubb

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robyn M. Funk