This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/18/2022 at 10:08:37 (UTC).

Abbot Rapid DX North America, LLC v. EMED, LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 08/19/2022 Abbot Rapid DX North America, LLC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against EMED, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew F. Kennelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-04428

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew F. Kennelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Abbot Rapid DX North America, LLC

Defendants

EMED, LLC

EMED Labs, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rebecca Cauley Fitzpatrick

Gregg F. Locascio

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel R. Lombard

Michael Barry Carlinsky

JAMES D. JUDAH

 

Court Documents

#40

(#40) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Abbot Rapid DX North America, LLC by Gregg F. Locascio (Locascio, Gregg) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#39

(#39) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The minute entry dated 10/13/2022 (dkt. no. 38) contained a scrivener's error and is corrected to read as follows. Telephonic status hearing held on 10/13/2022. The Clerk is directed to put docket entry 36 under seal. The parties are directed to confer and attempt to reach agreement regarding what portions of that submission are appropriately in the public record and are to file an appropriate motion in this regard by 10/20/2022. The parties have leave to file that motion under seal. Case is set for oral argument on 10/28/2022 at 10:00 a.m. The hearing will be held in person in Courtroom 2103. (mk) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#38

(#38) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic status hearing held on 10/13/2022. The Clerk is directed to put docket #36 under seal. Any motion stating regarding the filing of documents is due by 10/20/2022. The parties have leave to file the motion under seal. Case is set for oral argument on 10/28/2022 at 10:00 a.m. The hearing will be held in person in Courtroom 2103. Mailed notice. (mma, ) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#37

(#37) Notice of Compliance by EMED Labs, LLC, EMED, LLC with the Court's Order (Dkt. 34) (Lombard, Daniel) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

#35

(#35) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion to file a 20 page reply brief and for leave to file the reply brief under seal are granted #30 #31 . (mk) (Entered: 10/08/2022)

#34

(#34) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: From a review of CMECF it does not appear that any of the electronic docket entries in this case are being transmitted to defense counsel; they appear to be going only to plaintiff's counsel Rebecca Fitzpatrick. Ms. Fitzpatrick is directed to immediately transmit a copy of this order to defense counsel, and defense counsel is directed to promptly work with the Clerk's office to rectify this problem. (mk) (Entered: 10/08/2022)

#31

RESTRICTED

#30

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Abbot Rapid DX North America, LLC by Gregg F. Locascio (Locascio, Gregg) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The minute entry dated 10/13/2022 (dkt. no. 38) contained a scrivener's error and is corrected to read as follows. Telephonic status hearing held on 10/13/2022. The Clerk is directed to put docket entry 36 under seal. The parties are directed to confer and attempt to reach agreement regarding what portions of that submission are appropriately in the public record and are to file an appropriate motion in this regard by 10/20/2022. The parties have leave to file that motion under seal. Case is set for oral argument on 10/28/2022 at 10:00 a.m. The hearing will be held in person in Courtroom 2103. (mk) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic status hearing held on 10/13/2022. The Clerk is directed to put docket #36 under seal. Any motion stating regarding the filing of documents is due by 10/20/2022. The parties have leave to file the motion under seal. Case is set for oral argument on 10/28/2022 at 10:00 a.m. The hearing will be held in person in Courtroom 2103. Mailed notice. (mma, ) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Notice of Compliance by EMED Labs, LLC, EMED, LLC with the Court's Order (Dkt. 34) (Lombard, Daniel) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) RESPONSE by Defendants EMED Labs, LLC, EMED, LLC To Abbott Rapid DX'S Petition To Compel Arbitration - REDACTED (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Carlinsky, Michael) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion to file a 20 page reply brief and for leave to file the reply brief under seal are granted #30 #31 . (mk) (Entered: 10/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: From a review of CMECF it does not appear that any of the electronic docket entries in this case are being transmitted to defense counsel; they appear to be going only to plaintiff's counsel Rebecca Fitzpatrick. Ms. Fitzpatrick is directed to immediately transmit a copy of this order to defense counsel, and defense counsel is directed to promptly work with the Clerk's office to rectify this problem. (mk) (Entered: 10/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court previously granted defendants' motion for leave to file under seal #22 in part but specifically directed defendants to file redacted versions of the filings in question in the public record. See docket entry 29. It does not appear that defendant has complied with this order. It is directed to do so by no later than 10/11/2022. (mk) (Entered: 10/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) SEALED REPLY by Abbot Rapid DX North America, LLC to sealed response #23 in support of Petition to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P, #2 Exhibit Q, #3 Exhibit R, #4 Exhibit S, #5 Exhibit T)(Fitzpatrick, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Abbot Rapid DX North America, LLC for leave to file Reply under seal (Fitzpatrick, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants EMED Labs, LLC, EMED, LLC (Carlinsky, Michael) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SEALED ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/30/2022. (exr, ) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SEALED ORDER (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SEALED MOTION (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SEALED DOCUMENT (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SEALED MOTION (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SEALED DOCUMENT (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SEALED DOCUMENT (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED DOCUMENT (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SEALED DOCUMENT (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less