This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/07/2020 at 08:52:02 (UTC).

ABATI v. FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/08/2020 ABATI filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ursula Ungaro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-23733

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ursula Ungaro

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ILANIT ZOHAR ABATI

Defendant

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew R. Gelber

501 Ne 5Th Street, Apt 643

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Joseph Benjamin Goldglantz

Attorney at Gold Litigation PA

20401 Ne 30Th Ave, Ste 322

Aventura, FL 33180

Defendant Attorneys

Justin Sblano

Attorney at Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP

400 N. Ashley Dr, Suite 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

Christopher M. Ramey

Attorney at Butler Pappas Weihmuller Katz Craig

777 S Harbour Island Boulevard, One Harbour Place Suite 500

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

15 #1

Exhibit Order on Scheduling Report

#15

(#15) SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by ILANIT ZOHAR ABATI (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order on Scheduling Report)(Goldglantz, Joseph) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#14

(#14) STATUS REPORT by ILANIT ZOHAR ABATI (Goldglantz, Joseph) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Compliance by ILANIT ZOHAR ABATI re #9 Order to Show Cause (Goldglantz, Joseph) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Compliance by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY re #9 Order to Show Cause (Sblano, Justin) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION before Kimberly Sands Mediation Hearing set for 2/23/2021 02:30 PM Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Mediation Hearing. Mediation Hearing set for 02/23/2021 at 2:30 PM. (Goldglantz, Joseph) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 10/30/2020. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#8

(#8) First NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Kimberly Sands as Mediator. (Goldglantz, Joseph) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL: Amended Pleadings due by 11/6/2020. Discovery due by 3/5/2021. Expert Discovery due by 3/5/2021. Fact Discovery due by 3/5/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 11/6/2020. In Limine Motions due by 3/26/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/26/2021. Motions due by 3/26/2021. Pretrial Stipulation due by 4/2/2021. Jury Trial set for 5/24/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Calendar Call set for 5/19/2021 01:00 PM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pretrial Conference set for 5/7/2021 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#5

(#5) Initial Disclosure(s) by ILANIT ZOHAR ABATI (Goldglantz, Joseph) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER ON ZOOM AND OTHER VIDEO-CONFERENCE HEARINGS. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Joint Planning and Scheduling Report due by 11/6/2020, Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 11/20/2020 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13485126, filed by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Sblano, Justin) Text Modified on 9/9/2020 (cds). Answer Filed(See Exh#2)/No Motion to Dismiss Filed. (Entered: 09/08/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by ILANIT ZOHAR ABATI (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order on Scheduling Report)(Goldglantz, Joseph) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STATUS REPORT by ILANIT ZOHAR ABATI (Goldglantz, Joseph) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Compliance by ILANIT ZOHAR ABATI re #9 Order to Show Cause (Goldglantz, Joseph) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Compliance by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY re #9 Order to Show Cause (Sblano, Justin) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION before Kimberly Sands Mediation Hearing set for 2/23/2021 02:30 PM Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Mediation Hearing. Mediation Hearing set for 02/23/2021 at 2:30 PM. (Goldglantz, Joseph) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 10/30/2020. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) First NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Kimberly Sands as Mediator. (Goldglantz, Joseph) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL: Amended Pleadings due by 11/6/2020. Discovery due by 3/5/2021. Expert Discovery due by 3/5/2021. Fact Discovery due by 3/5/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 11/6/2020. In Limine Motions due by 3/26/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/26/2021. Motions due by 3/26/2021. Pretrial Stipulation due by 4/2/2021. Jury Trial set for 5/24/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Calendar Call set for 5/19/2021 01:00 PM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pretrial Conference set for 5/7/2021 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Disclosure(s) by ILANIT ZOHAR ABATI (Goldglantz, Joseph) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER ON ZOOM AND OTHER VIDEO-CONFERENCE HEARINGS. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Joint Planning and Scheduling Report due by 11/6/2020, Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 11/20/2020 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13485126, filed by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Sblano, Justin) Text Modified on 9/9/2020 (cds). Answer Filed(See Exh#2)/No Motion to Dismiss Filed. (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew R. Gelber

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Goldglantz