This case was last updated from PACER on 07/21/2020 at 13:32:45 (UTC).

Robin Abari v. Safeco Insurance Co., et al

Case Summary

On 05/22/2020 Robin Abari filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Safeco Insurance Co . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and Douglas F. McCormick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-00957

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

Douglas F. McCormick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robin Abari

Defendants

Safeco Insurance Company of America

Safeco Insurance Co.

Does 1 to 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sassoon Sales

Attorney at Law Office of Sassoon Sales

16060 Ventura Boulevard Suite 110

Encino, CA 91436

Defendant Attorneys

Nicholas J Boos

Attorney at Maynard Cooper and Gale LLP

600 Montgomery Street Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

Corban James Porter

Attorney at Maynard Cooper and Gale LLP

Transamerica Pyramid Center 600 Montgomery Street Suite 26

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MINUTE ORDER [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER RE SCHEDULING DATES by Judge James V. Selna: The Court has read and considered the parties Rule 26(f) Report and sets the following dates: Jury Trial July 20, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. Final PreTrial Conference July 6, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. Discovery Cut-off January 22, 2021. Expert Discovery Cut-off March 26, 2021. Law and Motion Cut-off May 24, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. The Court orders that any settlement discussions shall be completed not later than May 21, 2021. (See document for details and deadlines.) The Scheduling Conference set for July 13, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. is VACATED. (es) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL SETTING DATES; PREPARATION FOR TRIAL; AND GOVERNING ATTORNEY AND PARTY CONDUCT AT TRIAL before Judge James V. Selna. (See Document for Details and Deadlines) (lb) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#10

(#10) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-5 days, filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America.. (Boos, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#9

(#9) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 7/13/2020 at 11:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 7/6/2020. (lb) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

#8

(#8) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#5

(#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Boos, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America.. (Boos, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America, identifying Safeco Corporation. (Boos, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#2

(#2) DECLARATION of Corban J. Porter re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Boos, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit B - Answer to Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Orange County, case number 30-2019-01120003-CU-IC-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-26542798 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer to Complaint) (Attorney Nicholas J Boos added to party Safeco Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Boos, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ORDER [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER RE SCHEDULING DATES by Judge James V. Selna: The Court has read and considered the parties Rule 26(f) Report and sets the following dates: Jury Trial July 20, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. Final PreTrial Conference July 6, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. Discovery Cut-off January 22, 2021. Expert Discovery Cut-off March 26, 2021. Law and Motion Cut-off May 24, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. The Court orders that any settlement discussions shall be completed not later than May 21, 2021. (See document for details and deadlines.) The Scheduling Conference set for July 13, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. is VACATED. (es) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL SETTING DATES; PREPARATION FOR TRIAL; AND GOVERNING ATTORNEY AND PARTY CONDUCT AT TRIAL before Judge James V. Selna. (See Document for Details and Deadlines) (lb) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-5 days, filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America.. (Boos, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 7/13/2020 at 11:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 7/6/2020. (lb) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America. (submitted as document 1, attachment 2)(esa) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS executed by Plaintiff Robin Abari, upon Defendant Safeco Insurance Co. served on 3/23/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC, Agent for Service of Process by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 2) (esa) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Safeco Insurance Co., filed by plaintiff Robin Abari. (submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 5) (esa) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Boos, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America.. (Boos, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America, identifying Safeco Corporation. (Boos, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION of Corban J. Porter re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Boos, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Orange County, case number 30-2019-01120003-CU-IC-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-26542798 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer to Complaint) (Attorney Nicholas J Boos added to party Safeco Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Boos, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Safeco Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sassoon Sales