This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:03:29 (UTC).

Abante Rooter and Plumbing Inc v. MSC Merchant Service Center, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Abante Rooter and Plumbing Inc filed an Other lawsuit against MSC Merchant Service Center, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard Seeborg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-07965

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard Seeborg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Abante Rooter and Plumbing Inc

Defendant

MSC Merchant Service Center, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven L Weinstein

P.O. Box 27414

Oakland, CA 94602

Taylor True Smith

Attorney at Woodrow and Peluso, LLC

3900 East Mexico Avenue, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80210

Patrick Harry Peluso

Attorney at Woodrow & Peluso, LLC

3900 East Mexico Avenue, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80210

Defendant Attorney

Bety Javidzad

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

601 South Figueroa Street, Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/27/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#7

(#12) ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Patrick Peluso. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2019) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Patrick Peluso. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2019) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#18

(#18) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by MSC Merchant Service Center, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 2/13/2020. Replies due by 2/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Javidzad, Bety) (Filed on 1/30/2020) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#15

(#15) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by MSC Merchant Service Center, LLC. (Javidzad, Bety) (Filed on 12/26/2019) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to MSC Merchant Service Center, LLC. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Weinstein, Steven) (Filed on 12/4/2019) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#21

(#21) ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/31/2020. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2020) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

18 #1

Proposed Order

#17

(#17) STIPULATION to Extend Time To Respond to Initial Complaint filed by MSC Merchant Service Center, LLC and Abante Rooter and Plumbing Inc. (Javidzad, Bety) (Filed on 1/30/2020) Modified on 1/30/2020 (amgS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/30/2020)

8 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#6

(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Abante Rooter and Plumbing Inc.. (Weinstein, Steven) (Filed on 12/9/2019) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Taylor T. Smith. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2019) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

7 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#1

(#15) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by MSC Merchant Service Center, LLC. (Javidzad, Bety) (Filed on 12/26/2019) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abante Rooter and Plumbing Inc. MSC Merchant Service Center, LLC served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Smith, Taylor) (Filed on 12/18/2019) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#20

(#20) Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Amended) filed by MSC Merchant Service Center, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 2/13/2020. Replies due by 2/20/2020. (Javidzad, Bety) (Filed on 1/30/2020) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/31/2020. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2020) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Amended) filed by MSC Merchant Service Center, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 2/13/2020. Replies due by 2/20/2020. (Javidzad, Bety) (Filed on 1/30/2020) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #18 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . Motion Hearing previously set for 2/6/2020 has been continued to 3/12/2020 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2020) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by MSC Merchant Service Center, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 2/13/2020. Replies due by 2/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Javidzad, Bety) (Filed on 1/30/2020) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION to Extend Time To Respond to Initial Complaint filed by MSC Merchant Service Center, LLC and Abante Rooter and Plumbing Inc. (Javidzad, Bety) (Filed on 1/30/2020) Modified on 1/30/2020 (amgS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • Docket(#16) CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 3/26/2020. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 3/5/2020 has been continued to 4/2/2020 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2020) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by MSC Merchant Service Center, LLC. (Javidzad, Bety) (Filed on 12/26/2019) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abante Rooter and Plumbing Inc. MSC Merchant Service Center, LLC served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Smith, Taylor) (Filed on 12/18/2019) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Taylor T. Smith. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2019) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Patrick Peluso. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2019) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 12/11/19. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2019) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2019) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Taylor T. Smith ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13964090.) filed by Abante Rooter and Plumbing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Weinstein, Steven) (Filed on 12/9/2019) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Patrick H. Peluso ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13964086.) filed by Abante Rooter and Plumbing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Weinstein, Steven) (Filed on 12/9/2019) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Abante Rooter and Plumbing Inc.. (Weinstein, Steven) (Filed on 12/9/2019) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to MSC Merchant Service Center, LLC. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/27/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/19/2019. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Weinstein, Steven) (Filed on 12/4/2019) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against MSC Merchant Service Center, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13950405). Filed by Abante Rooter and Plumbing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weinstein, Steven) (Filed on 12/4/2019) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less