This case was last updated from PACER on 11/21/2020 at 10:24:25 (UTC).

A.B.A.G. et al v. Doe Run Resources Corporation, The et al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 A B A G filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Doe Run Resources Corporation, The. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Henry Edward Autrey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01309

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Henry Edward Autrey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chris Collins

A.B.A.G.

Defendants

Renco Holdings, Inc.

Jerry Pyatt

Ira L. Rennert

Doe Run Resources Corporation, The

Marvin K. Kaiser

D.R. Acquisition Corp.

Theodore P. Fox, III

Jeffrey L. Zelms

Renco Group, Inc., The

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew V. Tramont

Attorney at RODRIGUEZ AND TRAMONT

255 Alhambra Circle, Suite 1150

Coral Gables, FL 33134

D. Todd Mathews

Attorney at THE GORI LAW FIRM

156 N. Main St.

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Edward L. Dowd, Jr.

Attorney at DOWD BENNETT LLP Clayton

7733 Forsyth Boulevard, Suite 1900

Clayton, MO 63105

Jeffrey R. Hoops

Attorney at DOWD BENNETT LLP Clayton

7733 Forsyth Boulevard, Suite 1900

Clayton, MO 63105

Thomas P. Berra, Jr.

Attorney at LEWIS RICE LLC - St Louis

600 Washington, Suite 2500

St. Louis, MO 63101

Michael J. Hickey

Attorney at LEWIS RICE LLC - St Louis

600 Washington, Suite 2500

St. Louis, MO 63101

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER [Copy As Entered In Case 4:15-CV-1704 RWS] - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' agreed motion to consolidate case N.F.A.P. v. Doe Run Resources Corp., 4:20 CV 964 CDP with the present case 401 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall open and randomly assign a new case for each Plaintiff (or two related Plaintiffs) using the complaint filed in the case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that after this case is severed, each of the severed cases shall be consolidated with this Lead Case before me for all pretrial proceedings. Once the cases are ready for trial, they will be returned to the docket of the District Judge in this district to whom they were assigned before consolidation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future filings shall be made only in this Lead Case and should only reference the case number of this Lead Case in the caption of the filing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file a copy of this order in the case listed above and in the new severed cases. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 8/14/2020. (MRC) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by D.R. Acquisition Corp., Renco Group, Inc., The, Renco Holdings, Inc., Ira L. Rennert.(BAK) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Doe Run Resources Corporation, The, Theodore P. Fox, III, Marvin K. Kaiser, Jerry Pyatt, Jeffrey L. Zelms.(BAK) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#2

(#2) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Plaintiffs, Chris Collins.(BAK) [Docket text entry modified to correct party filer. Modified on 10/1/2020 (MRC).] (Entered: 09/22/2020)

1 #10

Supplement State Court File Part 4

1 #9

Supplement State Court File Part 3

1 #8

Supplement State Court File Part 2

1 #7

Supplement State Court File Part 1

1 #6

Original Filing Form

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 2

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the City of State Louis, case number 1822-cc02925, with receipt number AMOEDC-8038262, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Renco Group, Inc., The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Original Filing Form, #7 Supplement State Court File Part 1, #8 Supplement State Court File Part 2, #9 Supplement State Court File Part 3, #10 Supplement State Court File Part 4)(Dowd, Edward) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Henry E. Autrey. (BAK) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER [Copy As Entered In Case 4:15-CV-1704 RWS] - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' agreed motion to consolidate case N.F.A.P. v. Doe Run Resources Corp., 4:20 CV 964 CDP with the present case 401 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall open and randomly assign a new case for each Plaintiff (or two related Plaintiffs) using the complaint filed in the case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that after this case is severed, each of the severed cases shall be consolidated with this Lead Case before me for all pretrial proceedings. Once the cases are ready for trial, they will be returned to the docket of the District Judge in this district to whom they were assigned before consolidation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future filings shall be made only in this Lead Case and should only reference the case number of this Lead Case in the caption of the filing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file a copy of this order in the case listed above and in the new severed cases. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 8/14/2020. (MRC) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by D.R. Acquisition Corp., Renco Group, Inc., The, Renco Holdings, Inc., Ira L. Rennert.(BAK) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Doe Run Resources Corporation, The, Theodore P. Fox, III, Marvin K. Kaiser, Jerry Pyatt, Jeffrey L. Zelms.(BAK) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Plaintiffs, Chris Collins.(BAK) [Docket text entry modified to correct party filer. Modified on 10/1/2020 (MRC).] (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the City of State Louis, case number 1822-cc02925, with receipt number AMOEDC-8038262, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Renco Group, Inc., The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Original Filing Form, #7 Supplement State Court File Part 1, #8 Supplement State Court File Part 2, #9 Supplement State Court File Part 3, #10 Supplement State Court File Part 4)(Dowd, Edward) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Renco Holdings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Renco Group, Inc., The is a litigant

Latest cases where D.R. Acquisition Corp. is a litigant