This case was last updated from PACER on 11/29/2020 at 08:32:43 (UTC).

A.B. v. Facebook, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2020 A B filed an Other lawsuit against Facebook, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Maria A. Audero and Consuelo B. Marshall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-09012

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

Presiding Judge

Consuelo B. Marshall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A.B.

Defendants

247FOREXTRADE Also Known As 4REXTRADE

WhatsApp, Inc.

LUND ROSE

Facebook, Inc.

Rose Lund

247Forextrade doing business as 4Forextrade

DOES 1 through 100, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roger E Naghash

Attorney at Law Offices Of Roger E Naghash

19900 Macarthur Boulevard Suite 1100

Irvine, CA 92612-2440

Defendant Attorneys

Kristin A Linsley

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP

555 Mission Street Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105-0921

Bradley Joseph Hamburger

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bradley Joseph Hamburger on behalf of Defendants Facebook, Inc., WhatsApp, Inc. (Attorney Bradley Joseph Hamburger added to party Facebook, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley Joseph Hamburger added to party WhatsApp, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hamburger, Bradley) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#17

(#17) ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS FACEBOOK, INC. AND WHATSAPP, INC. FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #11 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: Upon consideration of the application, and for good cause shown, Defendants' ex parte application is hereby GRANTED as follows: The deadline for Defendants Facebook and WhatsApp to answer or respond to the Complaint will be 12/9/2020. (jp) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#16

(#16) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#15

(#15) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., WhatsApp, Inc., (Linsley, Kristin) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#14

(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant WhatsApp, Inc. identifying Facebook Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Linsley, Kristin) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#13

(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (No Parent Corporation) filed by Defendant Facebook, Inc. (Linsley, Kristin) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kristin A Linsley on behalf of Defendants Facebook, Inc., WhatsApp, Inc. (Linsley, Kristin) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

11 #5

Proposed Order

11 #4

Exhibit C

11 #3

Exhibit B

11 #2

Exhibit A

11 #1

Declaration K. Linsley

#11

(#11) EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 12/9/2020 filed by Defendant Facebook, Inc., WhatsApp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration K. Linsley, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kristin A Linsley added to party Facebook, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kristin A Linsley added to party WhatsApp, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Linsley, Kristin) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#10

(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant WhatsApp, Inc.. (shb) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

1 #3

Summons WA

1 #2

Summon FB

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-28324521 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff A.B.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon FB, #3 Summons WA) (Attorney Roger E Naghash added to party A.B.(pty:pla))(Naghash, Roger) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bradley Joseph Hamburger on behalf of Defendants Facebook, Inc., WhatsApp, Inc. (Attorney Bradley Joseph Hamburger added to party Facebook, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley Joseph Hamburger added to party WhatsApp, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hamburger, Bradley) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS FACEBOOK, INC. AND WHATSAPP, INC. FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #11 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: Upon consideration of the application, and for good cause shown, Defendants' ex parte application is hereby GRANTED as follows: The deadline for Defendants Facebook and WhatsApp to answer or respond to the Complaint will be 12/9/2020. (jp) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., WhatsApp, Inc., (Linsley, Kristin) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant WhatsApp, Inc. identifying Facebook Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Linsley, Kristin) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (No Parent Corporation) filed by Defendant Facebook, Inc. (Linsley, Kristin) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kristin A Linsley on behalf of Defendants Facebook, Inc., WhatsApp, Inc. (Linsley, Kristin) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 12/9/2020 filed by Defendant Facebook, Inc., WhatsApp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration K. Linsley, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kristin A Linsley added to party Facebook, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kristin A Linsley added to party WhatsApp, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Linsley, Kristin) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant WhatsApp, Inc.. (shb) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Facebook, Inc.. (shb) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:20-cv-09012 CBM(MAAx). (rn) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE re Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form,, #3 Plaintiff's Initial Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff A.B. (Naghash, Roger) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff A.B.. (Naghash, Roger) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #4 filed by Plaintiff A.B.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Request)(Naghash, Roger) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The Summons Request was filed under the incorrect event. The correct event is: Civil Events > Service Documents > Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints > Summons Request.. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. The case initiating documents were incorrectly filed as attachments. Please utilize CM/ECF resources such as the search tool to locate the appropriate events for filing. No further action is required unless directed by the Court. (jtil) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (jtil) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-28324521 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff A.B.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon FB, #3 Summons WA) (Attorney Roger E Naghash added to party A.B.(pty:pla))(Naghash, Roger) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WhatsApp Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where A.B. is a litigant

Latest cases where Facebook is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roger E. Naghash