This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/31/2020 at 08:20:01 (UTC).

A.B.-B et al v. MORGAN et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2020 A B -B filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against MORGAN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard J. Leon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00846

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard J. Leon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

M.A.G.-M

D.G.M.-G

W.G.L.-S

E.L.R.-S

S.B.-B

A.P.-S

B.J.R.-S

L.E.-L

I.I.E-L

A.A.R.-S

A.B.-B

Defendants

WILLIAM P. BARR

ANDREW J. DAVIDSON

CHAD F. WOLF

KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI

MARK A. MORGAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Julie M. Carpenter

Attorney at TAHIRIH JUSTICE CENTER

6402 Arlington Blvd, Suite 300

Falls Church, VA 22042

Brian Rene Frazelle

Attorney at CONSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNTABILITY CENTER

1200 18Th Street, Nw, Suite 501

Washington, DC 20036

Brianne Jenna Gorod

Attorney at CONSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNTABILITY CENTER

1200 18Th Street, Nw, Suite 501

Washington, DC 20036

Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra

Attorney at CONSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNTABILITY CENTER

1200 18Th Street, Nw, Suite 501

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant Attorneys

Rebecca Marie Cutri-Kohart

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

1100 L Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Christopher Charles Hair

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

555 Fourth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#23

RESTRICTED

#21

RESTRICTED

#20

RESTRICTED

#19

RESTRICTED

#6

#5

#4

RESTRICTED

3 #4

Summons

3 #3

*Restricted*

3 #2

*Restricted*

3 #1

*Restricted*

#3

#2

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Entry for Proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Hearing on Plaintiffs' #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction held on 5/12/2020. The #12 Motion was Heard and Taken under Advisement. The parties may file supplemental pleadings (not to exceed 15 pages) based only on issues raised during argument, within ten (10) days of their receipt of the transcript. No responses or replies to the supplemental pleadings are to be filed. (Court Reporter: William P. Zaremba) (jth) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER. The Telephonic Preliminary Injunction Hearing currently scheduled for Thursday, May 7, 2020 at 3:00 PM is CONTINUED to Tuesday, May 12, 2020 at 3:00 PM before Judge Richard J. Leon. In a separate email, counsel for the parties will be provided with instructions regarding the conference call. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/7/2020. (lcrjl2) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) RESPONSE re #22 Notice (Other), filed by A.A.R.-S, A.B.-B, A.P.-S, B.J.R.-S, D.G.M.-G, E.L.R.-S, I.I.E-L, L.E.-L, M.A.G.-M, S.B.-B, W.G.L.-S. (Carpenter, Julie) Modified event on 5/7/2020 (znmw). (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY AND RATIFICATION by WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, ANDREW J. DAVIDSON, MARK A. MORGAN, CHAD F. WOLF re #17 Memorandum in Opposition,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cutri-Kohart, Rebecca) Modified event on 5/7/2020 (znmw). (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Rene Frazelle on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Frazelle, Brian) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Brianne Jenna Gorod on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gorod, Brianne) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wydra, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER. A Telephonic Preliminary Injunction Hearing is set for Thursday, May 7, 2020 at 3:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard J. Leon. In a separate email, counsel for the parties will be provided with instructions regarding the conference call. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 4/29/2020. (lcrjl2) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPLY to opposition to motion re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by A.A.R.-S, A.B.-B, A.P.-S, B.J.R.-S, D.G.M.-G, E.L.R.-S, I.I.E-L, L.E.-L, M.A.G.-M, S.B.-B, W.G.L.-S. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Relating to Documentary Exhibits, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Carpenter, Julie) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Memorandum in opposition to re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, ANDREW J. DAVIDSON, MARK A. MORGAN, CHAD F. WOLF. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Juliana Blackwell and Exhibits, #2 Declaration of Wayne Winterling and Exhibits, #3 Declaration of Michelle Burton, #4 Declaration of Stephen Dove and Exhibits, #5 Declaration of Craig J. Heintz and Exhibits, #6 Declaration of Ashley B. Caudill-Mirillo)(Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Charles Hair on behalf of All Defendants (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that defendants are temporarily enjoined from removing plaintiffs from the United States, pending a hearing tomorrow on #8 plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Related Administrative Stay where the government's interests may be represented. A telephonic hearing is set for April 2, 2020 at 3:00 PM before Judge Richard J. Leon. The Court will provide instructions regarding the conference call to counsel by email. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 4/1/2020. (lcrjl2) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Administrative Stay by A.A.R.-S, A.B.-B, A.P.-S, B.J.R.-S, D.G.M.-G, E.L.R.-S, I.I.E-L, L.E.-L, M.A.G.-M, S.B.-B, W.G.L.-S (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of ABB, #2 Affidavit Declaration of APS, #3 Affidavit Declaration of LEL, #4 Affidavit Declaration of MAGM, #5 Affidavit Declaration of Allison Herre, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order TRO, #7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Admin Stay)(Carpenter, Julie). Added MOTION to Stay on 4/2/2020 (jf). (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case randomly reassigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. Judge Amy Berman Jackson is no longer assigned to the case as deemed not related. (ztnr) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER. It is ORDERED that this case shall be sent to the Calendar and Case Management Committee for random reassignment. See Order for complete details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/1/2020. (lcabj2) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, ANDREW J. DAVIDSON, MARK A. MORGAN, CHAD F. WOLF, and U.S. Attorney (jf) Modified on 4/1/2020 to correct docket text (zsb) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 19-2773. (jf) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, ANDREW J. DAVIDSON, MARK A. MORGAN, CHAD F. WOLF ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616102799) with Jury Demand filed by W.G.L.-S, A.P.-S, S.B.-B, A.B.-B, I.I.E-L, M.A.G.-M, A.A.R.-S, E.L.R.-S, D.G.M.-G, B.J.R.-S, L.E.-L. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(zjf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/1/2020: #3 Appendix Sealed) (zjf). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/1/2020: #4 Summons) (zsb). (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 03/27/2020. (zjf) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym by A.A.R.-S, A.B.-B, A.P.-S, B.J.R.-S, D.G.M.-G, E.L.R.-S, I.I.E-L, L.E.-L, M.A.G.-M, S.B.-B, W.G.L.-S (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(zjf) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S.B.B. is a litigant

Latest cases where A.P.S. is a litigant

Latest cases where ABB INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca Marie Cutri-Kohart