This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/13/2021 at 10:22:51 (UTC).

Ashley Aarons et al v. Lexington Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Ashley Aarons filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Lexington Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen V. Wilson and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03200

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen V. Wilson

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Trustee of the Ashley Aarons 2015 Trust

Ashley Aarons

Defendants

Lexington Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation

DOES 1 though 25 inclusive

Does 1 to 25, inclusive

Lexington Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David J Furtado

Attorney at Furtado Law Firm LLC

3773 Cherry Creek North Drive No 755

Denver, CO 80209

Defendant Attorneys

Jordon Edward Harriman

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard and Smith LLP

633 West 5Th Street Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Rebecca R Weinreich

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard and Smith LLP

633 West 5Th Street Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) NEW CASE STATUS CONFERENCE; and #12 MOTION to Stay Case pending Completion of the appraisal of the amount of Plaintiff's dwelling loss under the terms and conditions of the Lexington policy filed by Defendant Lexington Insurance Company by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The initial status conference set for June 14, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. The motion to stay is granted. The case is moved to the Court's inactive calendar. The parties will notify the Court, in writing, when the matter should be restored to the active calendar. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (mrgo) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docket(#12) Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Completion of the appraisal of the amount of Plaintiff's dwelling loss under the terms and conditions of the Lexington policy filed by Defendant Lexington Insurance Company Lexington Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 6/28/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Joint Motion to Stay, #2 Declaration Declaration of Jordon E. Harriman in support of Joint Motion to Stay) (Harriman, Jordon) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • Docket(#11) Joint STIPULATION to Clarify STIPULATION TO WITHDRAW PUNITIVE DAMAGE ALLEGATIONS filed by Defendant Lexington Insurance Company.(Harriman, Jordon) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 6/14/2021 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Docket(#9) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ashley Aarons, identifying Lexington Insurance Company. (Furtado, David) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docket(#7) DECLARATION of David J. Furtado filed by Plaintiff Ashley Aarons. (Furtado, David) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David J Furtado on behalf of Plaintiff Ashley Aarons (Furtado, David) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Lexington Insurance Company. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 4/12/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Lexington Insurance Company. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Ashley Aarons. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/05/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Lexington Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation, identifying Subsidiary of AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., which is a wholly-owned (100%) subsidiary of AIG Property Casualty Inc., which is a wholly owned (100%) subsidiary of American International Group, Inc., which is a publicly-held corporation. No parent entity or publicly held entity owns 10% or more of the stock of American International Group, Inc.. (Harriman, Jordon) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Lexington Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation. (Harriman, Jordon) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court - Central District, case number 20STCV42487 Receipt No: ACACDC-31113101 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Lexington Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Attorney Jordon Edward Harriman added to party Lexington Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (pty:dft))(Harriman, Jordon) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lexington Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordon Edward Harriman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca R Weinreich