This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:39:18 (UTC).

Aaron Lambert v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Aaron Lambert filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen E. Scott and Jesus G. Bernal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-04969

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

Presiding Judge

Jesus G. Bernal

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Aaron Lambert

Los Angeles, CA 90053

Respondent

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

312 North Spring Street 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90012-4700

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Mail Returned addressed to Aaron Lambert, REG 07751-095, PO Box 1500, Los Angeles, CA. 90053 re Minutes of In Chambers Order #3 . (et) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

#4

(#4) Mail Returned addressed to Aaron Lambert re Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (Habeas Corpus) #2 (twdb) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111) (lh) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

2 #1

CV-111

#5

(#5) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): Order Extending Deadline to Respond to Dkt. #3 by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. The Clerk is directed to correct Petitioner's Register Number in CM/ECF to 07751-095 and resend Petitioner the Court's June 11, 2019 Order (Dkt. #3 ). The Court sua sponte extends Petitioner's deadline to respond to the Order to July 29, 2019. (See document for details.) (sbou) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#3

(#3) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER Requesting Clarification reNature of Relief Sought by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. On or before July 11, 2019, Petitioner shall file a Notice with this Court advising whether he intended to file a 2241 petition or a motion for a judicial recommendation for RRC placement. (See document for details.) (sbou) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241). Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (Filing Fee $ 5 Due), filed by Petitioner Aaron Lambert. (lh) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Mail Returned addressed to Aaron Lambert, REG 07751-095, PO Box 1500, Los Angeles, CA. 90053 re Minutes of In Chambers Order #3 . (et) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): Order Extending Deadline to Respond to Dkt. #3 by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. The Clerk is directed to correct Petitioner's Register Number in CM/ECF to 07751-095 and resend Petitioner the Court's June 11, 2019 Order (Dkt. #3 ). The Court sua sponte extends Petitioner's deadline to respond to the Order to July 29, 2019. (See document for details.) (sbou) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Mail Returned addressed to Aaron Lambert re Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (Habeas Corpus) #2 (twdb) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER Requesting Clarification reNature of Relief Sought by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. On or before July 11, 2019, Petitioner shall file a Notice with this Court advising whether he intended to file a 2241 petition or a motion for a judicial recommendation for RRC placement. (See document for details.) (sbou) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111) (lh) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241). Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (Filing Fee $ 5 Due), filed by Petitioner Aaron Lambert. (lh) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.