This case was last updated from PACER on 12/31/2019 at 07:50:52 (UTC).

AARA, Inc. d/b/a A&L Market v. Michigan Laborers' Vacation Fund

Case Summary

On 11/01/2019 AARA, Inc d/b/a A L Market filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Michigan Laborers' Vacation Fund. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gershwin A. Drain and Elizabeth A. Stafford. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-13221

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gershwin A. Drain

Referral Judge

Elizabeth A. Stafford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

AARA, Inc.

3Rd Party Plaintiff, Defendant and Counter Claimant

Michigan Laborers' Vacation Fund

3Rd Party Defendant

Jeffrey McCarver

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Dalen P. Hanna

Attorney at Hanna, LLP

33717 Woodward Avenue, Suite 560

Birmingham, MI 48009

3Rd Party Plaintiff, Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Lauren E. Crummel

Attorney at Legghio & Israel, P.C.

306 South Washington Avenue, Suite 600, Royal Oak

Royal Oak, MI 48067-3837

Christopher P. Legghio

Attorney at Legghio & Israel, P.C.

306 S. Washington, Suite 600

Royal Oak, MI 48067

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#9

(#9) THIRD-PARTY SUMMONS Issued for *Jeffrey McCarver* (DAll) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#8

(#8) THIRD-PARTY SUMMONS Issued for *Jeffrey McCarver* (DAll) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#7

(#7) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT Against Jeffrey McCarver filed by Michigan Laborers' Vacation Fund against Jeffrey McCarver (Crummel, Lauren) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#6

(#6) COUNTERCLAIM Against AARA, INC d/b/a A&L Market filed by Michigan Laborers' Vacation Fund against AARA, Inc. (Crummel, Lauren) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint by Michigan Laborers' Vacation Fund. (Crummel, Lauren) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#4

(#4) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Michigan Laborers' Vacation Fund (Crummel, Lauren) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren E. Crummel on behalf of Michigan Laborers' Vacation Fund. (Crummel, Lauren) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher P. Legghio on behalf of Michigan Laborers' Vacation Fund. (Legghio, Christopher) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michigan Laborers' Vacation Fund from Michigan 36th District Court, case number 19-169688. Receipt No: 0645-7470697 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Legghio, Christopher) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) THIRD-PARTY SUMMONS Issued for *Jeffrey McCarver* (DAll) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) THIRD-PARTY SUMMONS Issued for *Jeffrey McCarver* (DAll) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • REQUEST for SUMMONS for Jeffrey McCarver. (Crummel, Lauren) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT Against Jeffrey McCarver filed by Michigan Laborers' Vacation Fund against Jeffrey McCarver (Crummel, Lauren) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) COUNTERCLAIM Against AARA, INC d/b/a A&L Market filed by Michigan Laborers' Vacation Fund against AARA, Inc. (Crummel, Lauren) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint by Michigan Laborers' Vacation Fund. (Crummel, Lauren) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Michigan Laborers' Vacation Fund (Crummel, Lauren) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren E. Crummel on behalf of Michigan Laborers' Vacation Fund. (Crummel, Lauren) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher P. Legghio on behalf of Michigan Laborers' Vacation Fund. (Legghio, Christopher) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michigan Laborers' Vacation Fund from Michigan 36th District Court, case number 19-169688. Receipt No: 0645-7470697 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Legghio, Christopher) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.