This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/24/2021 at 10:43:13 (UTC).

AAA Alarm & Security Incorporated v. A3 Smart Home LP

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 AAA Alarm Security Incorporated filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against A3 Smart Home LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is G Murray Snow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00321

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

G Murray Snow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AAA Alarm & Security Incorporated

Defendant

A3 Smart Home LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Maria Crimi Speth

Attorney at Jaburg & Wilk PC - Phoenix, AZ

3200 N Central Ave., Ste. 2000

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Aaron K Haar

Attorney at Jaburg & Wilk PC - Phoenix, AZ

3200 N Central Ave., Ste. 2000

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Defendant Attorneys

Diamond Zambrano

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP - Phoenix, AZ

1 Arizona Center, 400 E Van Buren

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

Joseph G Adams

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP

1 Arizona Center, 400 E Van Buren

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

Rachael Marie Peters Pugel

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP - Phoenix, AZ

1 Arizona Center, 400 E Van Buren

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

 

Court Documents

27 #3

Exhibit 3

27 #2

Exhibit 2

27 #1

Exhibit 1

#27

18 #5

Text of Proposed Order

18 #4

Exhibit D - Declaration of Maxie Livingston REDACTED

18 #2

Exhibit B - Trademark

18 #1

Exhibit A - Declaration of James Livingston REDACTED

#18

#7

#6

5 #1

AO 121

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) RESPONSE in Opposition re: #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction filed by A3 Smart Home LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Adams, Joseph) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by A3 Smart Home LP. (Pugel, Rachael) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER granting the parties' Stipulated Request. Defendant A3 Smart Home LP shall have an extension to April 21, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 4/12/2021. (REK) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction by A3 Smart Home LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Joseph) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting #19 Motion to Seal Certain Exhibits to Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction. FURTHER ORDERED The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal the following documents from the public record: Doc. 14-1 Exhibit A Part 1 Declaration of Jim Livingston; Doc. 14-2 Exhibit A Part 2 Declaration of Jim Livingston; Doc. 14-3 Exhibit A Part 3 Declaration of Jim Livingston; Doc. 14-8 Exhibit D Declaration of Maxie Livingston. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 4/9/21. (MAP) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading #20 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header (REK) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Corporate Disclosure Statement by A3 Smart Home LP identifying Corporate Parent American Automobile Association of Northern California, Nevada & Utah for A3 Smart Home LP. (Adams, Joseph) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by A3 Smart Home LP.(Adams, Joseph) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Seal Document Unopposed Motion to Seal Certain Exhibits to Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction Filed at Docket 14 by AAA Alarm & Security Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haar, Aaron) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction by AAA Alarm & Security Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of James Livingston REDACTED, #2 Exhibit B - Trademark, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Giovanna Marinelli, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Maxie Livingston REDACTED, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Haar, Aaron) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by A3 Smart Home LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pugel, Rachael) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Rachael Marie Peters Pugel on behalf of A3 Smart Home LP. (Pugel, Rachael) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by AAA Alarm & Security Incorporated: Acceptance of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement and Magistrate Availability upon A3 Smart Home LP on March 4, 2021. (Speth, Maria) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(m) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on May 27, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 2/24/2021. (WLP) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to A3 Smart Home LP. (JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(JAM) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19191675. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-321-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Submitted by AAA Alarm & Security Incorporated.(Haar, Aaron) (JAM) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AAA Alarm & Security Incorporated. (JAM) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19191675 filed by AAA Alarm & Security Incorporated.(Haar, Aaron) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph G. Adams