This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:23:53 (UTC).

A Santini Moving & Storage Co. v. Capital One Financial Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 A Santini Moving Storage Co filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against Capital One Financial Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John G. Koeltl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11112

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John G. Koeltl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A Santini Moving & Storage Co.

Defendant

Capital One Financial Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven Andrew Feldman

Attorney at Solo Practitioner

763 Dogwood Avenue

West Hempstead, NY 11552

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Feldman, Steven) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #17

Exhibit 3

1 #16

Exhibit 2

1 #15

Exhibit N

1 #14

Exhibit M

1 #13

Exhibit L

1 #12

Exhibit K

1 #11

Exhibit J

1 #10

Exhibit I

1 #9

Exhibit H

1 #8

Exhibit G

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A. Outstanding Invoices

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1. Declaration of Joseph J. McGuire

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Capital One Financial Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18203215)Document filed by A Santini Moving & Storage Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1. Declaration of Joseph J. McGuire, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A. Outstanding Invoices, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit 2, #17 Exhibit 3)(Feldman, Steven) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 3/9/2020 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Fletcher, Donnie) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Feldman, Steven) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (jgo) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Steven Andrew Feldman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $115517000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9999000;. (jgo) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Steven Andrew Feldman. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Capital One Financial Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18203215)Document filed by A Santini Moving & Storage Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1. Declaration of Joseph J. McGuire, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A. Outstanding Invoices, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit 2, #17 Exhibit 3)(Feldman, Steven) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.