This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 17:23:48 (UTC).

A. et al v. University Hospitals Health System, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/03/2019 A filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against University Hospitals Health System, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Pamela A. Barker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02026

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela A. Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

David Novak

Rebecca Novak

Melinda Brown

S. T.

V. M.

D. T.

Renee Cottrill

B. R.

P. P.

A. H.

Bill Fenell

Stacy Bayus

T. W.

K. M. L.

P. T.

A. A.

Daniel Bayus

Defendants

University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, Inc.

University Hospitals Cleveland Medical Center

University Hospitals Health System, Inc.

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Kenneth P. Abbarno

Attorney at DiCello Levitt & Gutzler

7556 Mentor Avenue

Mentor, OH 44060

Robert F. DiCello

7556 Mentor Avenue

Mentor, OH 44060

Mark A. DiCello

Attorney at DiCello Levitt & Gutzler

7556 Mentor Avenue

Mentor, OH 44060

Mark M. Abramowitz

Attorney at DiCello Levitt & Gutzler

7556 Mentor Avenue

Mentor, OH 44060

Chelsea R. Mikula

Attorney at Tucker Ellis - Cleveland

950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

Edward E. Taber

Attorney at Tucker Ellis - Cleveland

950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

Michael C. Zellers

Attorney at Tucker Ellis - Los Angeles

42Nd Floor, 515 South Flower Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Rita A. Maimbourg

Attorney at Tucker Ellis - Cleveland

950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Attorney Appearance by Chelsea R. Mikula filed by on behalf of University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, Inc., University Hospitals Cleveland Medical Center, University Hospitals Health System, Inc., University Hospitals Medical Practice. (Mikula, Chelsea) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#9

(#9) Attorney Appearance by Michael C. Zellers filed by on behalf of University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, Inc., University Hospitals Cleveland Medical Center, University Hospitals Health System, Inc., University Hospitals Medical Practice. (Zellers, Michael) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#8

(#8) Attorney Appearance by Edward E. Taber filed by on behalf of University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, Inc., University Hospitals Cleveland Medical Center, University Hospitals Health System, Inc., University Hospitals Medical Practice. (Taber, Edward) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#7

(#7) Attorney Appearance by Rita A. Maimbourg filed by on behalf of University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, Inc., University Hospitals Cleveland Medical Center, University Hospitals Health System, Inc., University Hospitals Medical Practice. (Maimbourg, Rita) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#6

(#6) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. University Hospitals Medical Practice waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Abbarno, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#5

(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, Inc. waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Abbarno, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#4

(#4) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. University Hospitals Cleveland Medical Center waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Abbarno, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#3

(#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. University Hospitals Health System, Inc. waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Abbarno, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#2

(#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided therefore were not issued. (Y,A) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $400, receipt number 0647-9502994. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:19-cv-00180. Filed by K. M. L., P. P., Renee Cottrill, V. M., E. T., D. T., K. P., A. A., S. T., C. W., David Novak, A. M., P. T., Peter Brown, Stacy Bayus, Hillary Fenell, M. L., Rebecca Novak, A. H., W. M., Larry Cottrill, Daniel Bayus, T. W., B. R., Bill Fenell, Melinda Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Abbarno, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Attorney Appearance by Chelsea R. Mikula filed by on behalf of University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, Inc., University Hospitals Cleveland Medical Center, University Hospitals Health System, Inc., University Hospitals Medical Practice. (Mikula, Chelsea) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Attorney Appearance by Michael C. Zellers filed by on behalf of University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, Inc., University Hospitals Cleveland Medical Center, University Hospitals Health System, Inc., University Hospitals Medical Practice. (Zellers, Michael) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Attorney Appearance by Edward E. Taber filed by on behalf of University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, Inc., University Hospitals Cleveland Medical Center, University Hospitals Health System, Inc., University Hospitals Medical Practice. (Taber, Edward) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Attorney Appearance by Rita A. Maimbourg filed by on behalf of University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, Inc., University Hospitals Cleveland Medical Center, University Hospitals Health System, Inc., University Hospitals Medical Practice. (Maimbourg, Rita) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. University Hospitals Medical Practice waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Abbarno, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, Inc. waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Abbarno, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. University Hospitals Cleveland Medical Center waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Abbarno, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. University Hospitals Health System, Inc. waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Abbarno, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided therefore were not issued. (Y,A) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (Y,A) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, (Y,A) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $400, receipt number 0647-9502994. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:19-cv-00180. Filed by K. M. L., P. P., Renee Cottrill, V. M., E. T., D. T., K. P., A. A., S. T., C. W., David Novak, A. M., P. T., Peter Brown, Stacy Bayus, Hillary Fenell, M. L., Rebecca Novak, A. H., W. M., Larry Cottrill, Daniel Bayus, T. W., B. R., Bill Fenell, Melinda Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Abbarno, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where University Hospitals of Cleveland Inc. OH is a litigant

Latest cases where University Hospitals Health System, Inc. is a litigant