2:21-CV-01193
06/24/2021
Pending - Other Pending
Property - Other Real Property
Elayna J. Youchah
Jennifer A. Dorsey
7321 Wandering Street Trust
Nationstar Mortgage LLC
First American Trustee Servicing Solutions, LLC
Nevada Legal News, LLC
Joseph Y Hong
Scott Robert Lachman
Melanie D Morgan
Aaron R. Maurice
Brittany Wood
Elizabeth Aronson
Kerry P. Faughnan
Exhibit Exhibit 8
Exhibit Exhibit 7
Exhibit Exhibit 5
Exhibit Exhibit 3
Exhibit Exhibit 2
Exhibit Exhibit 1
Exhibit A
Docket(#33) REPLY to Response to #27 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Lachman, Scott) (Entered: 08/23/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#32) NOTICE of Docket Correction to #31 filed by attorney Kerry Faughnan. The Court has corrected and changed the event from Motion Miscellaneous to Motion Quash. No further action is required. Do not refile document. (no image attached) (SLD) (Entered: 08/23/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#31) MOTION to Quash Summons on Nevada Legal News re #28 Summons Returned Executed by Defendant Nevada Legal News, LLC. Responses due by 9/4/2021. (Faughnan, Kerry) Modified event on 8/23/2021. (SLD) (Entered: 08/21/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#30) RESPONSE to #27 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff 7321 Wandering Street Trust. Replies due by 8/23/2021. (Hong, Joseph) (Entered: 08/16/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#29) REPLY to Response to #21 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff 7321 Wandering Street Trust. (Hong, Joseph) (Entered: 08/09/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#28) SUMMONS Returned Executed by 7321 Wandering Street Trust. Nevada Legal News, LLC served on 8/2/2021. (Hong, Joseph) (Entered: 08/06/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#27) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Responses due by 8/16/2021. (Lachman, Scott) (Entered: 08/02/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#26) RESPONSE to #21 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Replies due by 8/9/2021. (Lachman, Scott) (Entered: 08/02/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#25) NOTICE Setting Hearing on #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court: Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2021 at 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey.The hearing will be conducted using Zoom video conference. The courtroom administrator will provide counsel with the Zoom link to attend the video conference. Counsel is instructed not to forward the link to others. If additional participants need to appear, counsel is directed to contact Courtroom Administrator Danielle Cacciabaudo at danielle_cacciabaudo@nvd.uscourts.gov.For clarity of the record and best participation, the Court strongly recommends that all participants use a headset with a microphone during the hearing.Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court.Members of the public may access and listen to the hearing by calling 888-808-6929 and entering access code 2178469 no later than five minutes before the scheduled hearing start time. (no image attached) (DC) (Entered: 07/29/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#24) ORDER granting #23 Stipulation Re: #1 Petition for Removal, Nationstar Mortgage LLC answer due 8/25/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 7/26/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 07/26/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) MOTION for Demand for Security of Costs Pursuant to NRS 18.130(1) by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Responses due by 7/15/2021. (Lachman, Scott) (Entered: 07/01/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) CERTIFICATE of Cash Deposit as to 7321 Wandering Street Trust: $1,000.00, receipt number NVLAS076185 Re #7 Order. (HAM) (Entered: 06/30/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Shorten Time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this temporary restraining order will automatically EXPIRE at 5:00 p.m. on July 14, 2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Wandering Street must post a bond by the court in the amount of $1,000 by 5:00 p.m. on June 30, 2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Wandering Street's motion for a preliminary injunction (ECF No. #4 ) will be heard at 11:00 a.m. on July 14, 2021, in Courtroom 6D of the Lloyd D. George Federal Courthouse, 333 Las Vegas Blvd. So., Las Vegas, Nevada 89101. Defendants have until noon on July 7, 2021, to file any response to the motion for preliminary injunction. Wandering Street has until noon on July 12, 2021, to file any reply. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/30/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 06/30/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) DECLARATION of Nonmonetary Status of First American Trustee Servicing Solutions, LLC Pursuant to NRS 107.029 re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant First American Trustee Servicing Solutions, LLC. (Wood, Brittany) (Entered: 06/29/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) MOTION to Shorten Time Pursuant To LR IA 6-1 re #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Plaintiff 7321 Wandering Street Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9) (Hong, Joseph) (Entered: 06/28/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff 7321 Wandering Street Trust. Responses due by 7/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9) (Hong, Joseph) (Entered: 06/28/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Nationstar Mortgage LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper, Other Affiliate Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Other Affiliate Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Other Affiliate Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate KKR Wand Investors Corporation, Other Affiliate Mr. Cooper Group Inc. for Nationstar Mortgage LLC added. (Lachman, Scott) (Entered: 06/24/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/24/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/9/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/24/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 06/24/2021)
[-] Read LessDocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (HAM) (Entered: 06/24/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-832615-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6535100) by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Lachman, Scott) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 06/24/2021)
[-] Read Less