Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/19/2021 at 10:19:40 (UTC).

68th Street Site Work Group v. 7-Eleven, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 68th Street Site Work Group filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against 7-Eleven, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephanie A. Gallagher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03385

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephanie A. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Defendants

Graybar Electric Company Inc.

Lear Corporation

Norris Automotive Holdings LLC

Cloverland Dairy Limited Partnership

Ridgeway Manor, Inc.

Solo Cup Company

Mondelez International, Inc.

Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc.

Schmidt Baking Company, Inc.

Batesville Casket Company, Inc.

Asarco LLC

Ally Financial Inc.

Brink's Inc.

Universal Music Group, Inc.

Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC

Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.

Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company

Kohlberg Kravis Roberts & Co. L.P.

National Institutes of Health

Visual Marking Systems, Inc.

137 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

James Kelly-Lieb

Attorney at Kenny Law Group, LLC

11426 York Rd., First Floor

Cockeysville, MD 21030

Stuart David Kaplow

Attorney at Stuart D. Kaplow PA

11426 York Road Flr 1

Cockeysville, MD 21030

Rachel D. Guthrie

Attorney at The Justis Law Firm LLC

10955 Lowell Ave. Ste. 520

Overland Park, KS 66210

Ambereen K Shaffie

Attorney at The Justis Law Firm LLC

10955 Lowell Ave. Ste. 520

Overland Park, KS 66210

Matthew Travers Merryman

Attorney at The Justis Law Firm LLC

10955 Lowell Ave. Ste. 520

Overland Park, KS 66210

 

Court Documents

#68

(#68) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Len Stoler, Inc. waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#67

(#67) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Batesville Casket Company, Inc. waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#63

(#63) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#58

No Description Available

#56

No Description Available

#47

No Description Available

#45

No Description Available

#42

No Description Available

#41

No Description Available

#38

No Description Available

#34

No Description Available

#29

No Description Available

#27

No Description Available

#26

No Description Available

#22

No Description Available

#20

No Description Available

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Kaplow, Stuart) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#1

(#4) QC NOTICE re: #1 Complaint filed by 68th Street Site Work Group **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Prepared Summons. To correct this problem, file Prepared Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Prepared Summons to #1 Complaint. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Len Stoler, Inc. waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Batesville Casket Company, Inc. waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) PAPERLESS ORDER approving #63 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Fuchs Lubricants Co. filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/15/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. New Ridge Associates, Inc. waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Shaffie, Ambereen) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) PAPERLESS ORDER approving #62 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Avis Rent a Car System, LLC filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/15/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Quikrete Holdings, Inc. waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Shaffie, Ambereen) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Pabst Brewing Co. waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rachel D. Guthrie (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8988037.) by 68th Street Site Work Group(Kaplow, Stuart) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew T. Merryman (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8988024.) by 68th Street Site Work Group(Kaplow, Stuart) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Kaplow, Stuart) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by 68th Street Site Work Group identifying Other Affiliate Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Other Affiliate Brunswick Corporation, Other Affiliate Acme Markets, Inc., Other Affiliate Illinois Tool Works, Inc., Other Affiliate Exxon Mobil Corporation, Other Affiliate AK Steel Corporation, Other Affiliate CSX Realty Development, LLC., Other Affiliate ConAgra Grocery Products Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Signode and Vulcan-Hart, Other Affiliate Black & Decker (U.S.) Inc., Other Affiliate Browning-Ferris, Inc., Other Affiliate AAI Corporation, Other Affiliate CSX Transportation, Inc. for 68th Street Site Work Group.(Kaplow, Stuart) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) QC NOTICE: #3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by 68th Street Site Work Group was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file the 103.3 Disclosure and enter the each of the affiliations listed on your document into the CM/ECF system when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) QC NOTICE re: #1 Complaint filed by 68th Street Site Work Group **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Prepared Summons. To correct this problem, file Prepared Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Prepared Summons to #1 Complaint. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by 68th Street Site Work Group (Kaplow, Stuart) Modified on 11/20/2020 (dass, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by 68th Street Site Work Group Civil Cover Sheet (Kaplow, Stuart) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against 7-Eleven, Inc., A&M (2015) LLC, Aaron's, Inc., Abacus Corporation, Airgas, Inc., Alban Tractor Co., Inc., Albert S. Smyth Co., Inc., Ally Financial Inc., American Express Company, American Premier Underwriters, Inc., American Sugar Refining, Inc., Amtote International, Inc., Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc., Armacell, LLC, Asarco LLC, Ascension St. Agnes Hospital, Avis Rent A Car System, LLC, Batesville Casket Company, Inc., Bell and Howell, LLC, Benjamin Moore & Co., Berwind Corporation, Bob Bell Automotive Group, Inc., Bob Davidson Ford, Inc., Brand Industrial Services, Inc., Brink's Inc., Bunge North America (East), L.L.C., Burt Rigid Box, Inc., C&I Leasing, Inc., CRW Parts Inc., Caplan Brothers, Inc., Caraustar Industries, Inc., Carisam-Samuel Meisel (MD), Inc., Ceres Marine Terminals Inc., Chiquita Brands LLC, CitiFinancial Credit Company, Clark Equipment Company, Cloverland Dairy Limited Partnership, Coach USA, Inc., Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC, Cowan Systems, Inc., Crown Central LLC, Dayton Superior Corporation, Detroit Royalty, Inc., Donohoe Real Estate Services, Drug City Pharmacy, LLC, Eagle Group, Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Eclipse International, Inc., Elg Metals, Inc., Enterprise Electric Company, F.N.B. Corporation, Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., First National Bank of Pennsylvania, Foot Locker Specialty, Inc., Froehling & Robertson, Inc., Fuchs Lubricants Co., Genesco Inc., Givaudan Flavors Corporation, Glen-Gery Corporation, Graul's Market, Inc., Graybar Electric Company Inc., Greif, Inc., H&R Block, Inc., HMS Host Family Restaurants, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., Hampshire Industries, Inc., Harland Clarke Corp., Heritage Chevrolet-Buick, Inc., High's of Baltimore, LLC, Hilton Worldwide, Inc., Hohmann & Barnard, Inc., Holly Poultry, Inc., Host Hotels and Resorts, Inc., Illinois Sleep Products, Inc., Industrial Container Services, LLC, Jerry's Chevrolet, Inc., Jotun Paints, Inc., Keurig Dr. Pepper, Inc., King David at Autumn Lake LLC, Kmart Corporation, Kohlberg Kravis Roberts & Co. L.P., Koros, LLC, Laird Plastics, Inc., Lane Bryant, Inc., Lear Corporation, Lebanon Seaboard Corporation, Legg Mason, Inc., Len Stoler, Inc., Lifestar Response Corporation, Lifetouch National School Studios, LLC, Lifoam Industries, LLC, Lion Brothers Company, Inc., Long & Foster Real Estate, Inc., M. Weinman Company, Inc., MacDermid, Inc., Master-Halco, Inc., Mawson and Mawson, Inc., McCormick & Company, Inc., Melibelle USA, Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Mondelez International, Inc., Morgan Properties Management Company, LLC, Mount Vernon Mills, Inc., NCR Corporation, NL Industries, Inc., National Institutes of Health, Nationwide Auto Sales Corp., New Ridge Associates, Inc., Norris Automotive Holdings LLC, PQ Corporation, PVH Corp., Pabst Brewing Co., Pactiv LLC, Penske Logistics LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., Poly-Seal LLC, Powercon Corporation, Premier Technology Inc., Prince Minerals, LLC, Quikrete Holdings, Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Ridgeway Manor, Inc., Roca USA Inc., Roper Corporation, Russell T. Bundy Associates, Inc., Schmidt Baking Company, Inc., Schumacher & Seiler, Inc., Service America Corporation, Shell Oil Company, Smyth Jewelers Inc., Solo Cup Company, State Farm Life Insurance Company, Stella Maris Operating Corp., Tektronix, Inc., The Maryland Management Company, The Rukert Terminals Corporation, The Victory Racing Plate Company, The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company, Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company, Treehouse Private Brands, Inc., Tri-Star Realty, LLP, Truist Financial Corporation, US Foods, Inc., USF Redstar LLC, Unilever United States, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Unisys Corporation, Universal Music Group, Inc., Valley Motors, Inc., ViacomCBS, Inc., Viad Corp., Visual Marking Systems, Inc., Vornado Realty Trust, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, YRC Worldwide Inc., Zurich American Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8975410.), filed by 68th Street Site Work Group.(Kaplow, Stuart) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lear Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where MONDELEZ INTERNATIONAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where APPLIED INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ASARCO LLC. SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO ASARCO, INC. is a litigant