This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/30/2022 at 08:44:02 (UTC).

6600 Plaza Square LLC et al v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London et al

Case Summary

On 12/01/2021 6600 Plaza Square LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lance M Africk and Janis van Meerveld. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02205

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lance M Africk

Referral Judge

Janis van Meerveld

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

6600 Plaza Square LLC

6600 Plaza, a Condominium Owners Association, Inc.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London

Indian Harbor Insurance Company

QBE Specialty Insurance Company

Steadfast Insurance Company

General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona

United Specialty Insurance Company

Lexington Insurance Company

Safety Specialty Insurance Company

HDI Global Specialty SE

Old Republic Union Insurance Company

AmRisc, LLC

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

James McClendon Williams

Attorney at Chehardy, Sherman, Williams, Murray, Recile, Stakelum, & Hay

One Galleria Boulevard, Suite 1100

Metairie, LA 70001

Inemesit U. O'Boyle

Attorney at Chehardy,Sherman,Williams,Murray,Recile,Stakelum&Hayes, LLC

One Galleria Blvd., Suite 1100

Metairie, LA 70001

Matthew Arthur Sherman

Attorney at Chehardy,Sherman,Williams,Murray,Recile,Stakelum&Hayes, LLC

One Galleria Blvd., Suite 1100

Metairie, LA 70001

Patrick R Follette

Attorney at Chehardy,Sherman,Williams,Murray,Recile,Stakelum&Hayes, LLC

One Galleria Blvd., Suite 1100

Metairie, LA 70001

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

D. Russell Holwadel

Attorney at Adams, Hoefer, Holwadel, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.

Attorney at Adams, Hoefer, Holwadel, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Heather England Reznik

Attorney at Adams, Hoefer, Holwadel, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Kyle M. Truxillo

Attorney at Adams Hoefer Holwadel, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Ste 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Phillip J. Rew

Attorney at Adams, Hoefer, Holwadel, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Richard R. Stedman, II

Attorney at Adams Hoefer Holwadel, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Ste 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Leopoldo J Yanez

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70170

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9129369) filed by HDI Global Specialty SE, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party HDI Global Specialty SE(pty:dft).(Rew, Phillip) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #5

Exhibit D

#2

(#2) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against 6600 Plaza Square LLC, 6600 Plaza, a Condominium Owners Association, Inc. by Steadfast Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party Indian Harbor Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party Lexington Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party Old Republic Union Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party QBE Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party Safety Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party Steadfast Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party United Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Rew, Phillip) Modified text on 12/2/2021 (ko). (Entered: 12/01/2021)

2 #1

Exhibit 1

2 #2

Exhibit 2

#5

(#5) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by HDI Global Specialty SE, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London. By Clerk.(ko) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#6

(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, by 6600 Plaza Square LLC, 6600 Plaza, a Condominium Owners Association, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sherman, Matthew) Modified text on 1/7/2022 (cwa). Modified event on 1/11/2022 (ko). (Entered: 01/06/2022)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #2 Defendants' Counterclaim by 6600 Plaza Square LLC, 6600 Plaza, a Condominium Owners Association, Inc.(Sherman, Matthew) Modified text on 1/11/2022 (sa). (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Counterclaim as to 6600 Plaza Square LLC, 6600 Plaza, a Condominium Owners Association, Inc. answer due 1/12/2022. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 01/11/2022. (ko) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Counterclaim as to 6600 Plaza Square LLC, 6600 Plaza, a Condominium Owners Association, Inc. answer due 1/12/2022. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 01/11/2022. (ko) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #2 Defendants' Counterclaim by 6600 Plaza Square LLC, 6600 Plaza, a Condominium Owners Association, Inc.(Sherman, Matthew) Modified text on 1/11/2022 (sa). (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, by 6600 Plaza Square LLC, 6600 Plaza, a Condominium Owners Association, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sherman, Matthew) Modified text on 1/7/2022 (cwa). Modified event on 1/11/2022 (ko). (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by HDI Global Specialty SE, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London. By Clerk.(ko) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #2 Answer to Complaint and Counterclaim: **(1) Filing attorney incorrectly selected all defendants as applicable defendant's for this filing. This answer does not pertain to AmRisc, LLC. Clerk took corrective action. For future filings, please click on the + 'plus' sign to see all defendants and only select the applicable defendant(s). (2) Filing attorney incorrectly created association with defendant AmRisc, LLC when filing Answer and Counterclaim. Clerk took corrective action. (3) Filing attorney should have linked document to Complaint. Clerk properlylinked document to additional document 1.**(ko) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (aj) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against 6600 Plaza Square LLC, 6600 Plaza, a Condominium Owners Association, Inc. by Steadfast Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party Indian Harbor Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party Lexington Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party Old Republic Union Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party QBE Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party Safety Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party Steadfast Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party United Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Rew, Phillip) Modified text on 12/2/2021 (ko). (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9129369) filed by HDI Global Specialty SE, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party HDI Global Specialty SE(pty:dft).(Rew, Phillip) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMRISC LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC UNION INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GENERAL SECURITY AND INDEMNITY is a litigant

Latest cases where Steadfast Insurance Company aso H & M Hennes & Ma is a litigant