This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/07/2022 at 08:03:33 (UTC).

6600 Plaza Square, LLC et al v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London et al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 6600 Plaza Square, LLC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. deGravelles and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00649

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. deGravelles

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

6600 Plaza Square, LLC

6600 Plaza, a Condominium Owners Association, Inc.

6600 Plaza

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London

Indian Harbor Insurance Company

QBE Specialty Insurance Company

Steadfast Insurance Company

General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona

United Specialty Insurance Company

Lexington Insurance Company

Safety Specialty Insurance Company

HDI Global Specialty SE

Old Republic Union Insurance

Amrisc, LLC

Old Republic Union Insurance Company

Not Classified By Court

Leopoldo J. Yanez

New Orleans, LA 70170

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

James McClendon Williams

Attorney at Chehardy, Sherman, Williams, Murray, Recile, Stakelum, & Hay

One Galleria Boulevard, Suite 1100

Metairie, LA 70001

Inemesit U. O'Boyle

Attorney at Chehardy Sherman Williams Murray Recile Stakelum & Hayes

One Galleria Blvd., Suite 1100

Metairie, LA 70001

Matthew Arthur Sherman

Attorney at Chehary, Sherman, Williams

One Galleria Blvd., Suite 1100

Metairie, LA 70001

Patrick Roger Follette

Attorney at Chehardy Sherman Williams Murray Recile Stakelum and Hayes

1 Galleria Blvd Suite 1100

Metairie, LA 70001

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

D. Russell Holwadel

Attorney at Adams Hoefer Holwadel, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Heather England Reznik, Femal

Attorney at Adams Hoefer Holwadel, LLC

400 Poydas Street, Suite 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Kyle Matthew Truxillo

Attorney at Adams Hoefer Holwadel, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Ste 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Phillip J. Rew

Attorney at Adams Hoefer Holwadel, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Richard R. Stedman, II

Attorney at Hailey, Mcnamara, Hall, Larman, & Papale

One Galleria Boulevard, Suite 1400

Metairie, LA 70001

Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.

Attorney at Adams Hoefer Holwadel, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Nancy Scott Degan

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz

201 St. Charles Avenue, Ste 3600

New Orleans, LA 70170

Leopoldo Joaquin Yanez

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70170

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) REPLY in Support of #5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Rew, Phillip) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#18

(#18) ORDER granting #17 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by 6600 Plaza, 6600 Plaza Square, LLC. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 1/4/2022. (SWE) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

17 #3

Attachment

17 #2

Proposed Pleading;

17 #1

Proposed Order

#17

(#17) Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Attachment)(Follette, Patrick) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

16 #1

Exhibit

#16

(#16) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Follette, Patrick) (Main Document 16 and Attachment 1 replaced on 1/5/2022 in accordance with RD 18) (SWE). (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#14

(#14) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, by Amrisc, LLC. (Yanez, Leopoldo) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Policy

2 #1

Exhibit 1- Arbitration Clause

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against 6600 Plaza Square, LLC, 6600 Plaza, a Condominium Owners Association, Inc. by Steadfast Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance, United Specialty Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Arbitration Clause, #2 Exhibit 2 - Policy)(Hoefer, Bruce) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D - Consents

1 #3

Exhibit C - Policy

1 #2

Exhibit B - Arbitration Clause

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings

#1

(#14) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, by Amrisc, LLC. (Yanez, Leopoldo) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REPLY in Support of #5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Rew, Phillip) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 1/20/2022 is CANCELED pending resolution of the #5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. No Status Report is due at this time. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #17 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by 6600 Plaza, 6600 Plaza Square, LLC. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 1/4/2022. (SWE) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Attachment)(Follette, Patrick) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Follette, Patrick) (Main Document 16 and Attachment 1 replaced on 1/5/2022 in accordance with RD 18) (SWE). (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting for good cause shown #14 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Plead, filed by Defendant AmRisc, LLC. AmRisc's responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint due no later than ten days from this Court's entry of a ruling on the #5 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/22/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, by Amrisc, LLC. (Yanez, Leopoldo) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to Defendants' Counterclaim for Declaratory Judgment, filed by Plaintiffs 6600 Plaza Square, LLC and 6600 Plaza, a Condominium Owners Association, Inc. for good cause shown. Plaintiffs' responsive pleadings to Defendants' Counterclaim for Declaratory Judgment due no later than ten days from this Court's entry of a ruling on #5 Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/17/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #8 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Plead, filed by Defendant AmRisc, LLC. Responsive pleadings for AmRisc, LLC due 12/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/16/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amrisc, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Truist Insurance Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Truist Bank, Other Affiliate Truist Financial Corporation for Amrisc, LLC.. (Yanez, Leopoldo) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, by Amrisc, LLC. (Yanez, Leopoldo) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Extension of Time TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS TO DEFENDANTS COUNTERCLAIM FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to Defendant's Counterclaim by 6600 Plaza, 6600 Plaza Square, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Follette, Patrick) Modified on 12/8/2021 to edit text (LLH). (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 25 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 10 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1-Case law)(Rew, Phillip). Added MOTION to Stay on 12/3/2021 (EDC). (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/20/2022 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/6/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/15/2021. (BLR) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter to Attorney Leopoldo Yanez who is lead counsel for party Amrisc, LLC. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (NLT) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against 6600 Plaza Square, LLC, 6600 Plaza, a Condominium Owners Association, Inc. by Steadfast Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance, United Specialty Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Arbitration Clause, #2 Exhibit 2 - Policy)(Hoefer, Bruce) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District, Case Number 712775. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2362189), filed by HDI Global Specialty SE, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Arbitration Clause, #3 Exhibit C - Policy, #4 Exhibit D - Consents, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hoefer, Bruce) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMRISC LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC UNION INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant